Tetreault et al v. Cowan et al
Petitioner: Sara K Tetreault, Wilberto Conde Arenas and Sara Kiley Tetreault
Respondent: Chad Wolf, KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, Leslie Tritten, Robert Cowan and Kenneth Cuccinelli
Case Number: 0:2020cv02464
Filed: December 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2020 Filing 10 JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Civil Notice - appeal)(MKB)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 12/22/2020. (RJE)
December 18, 2020 Filing 8 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #7 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Repp, Liles)
December 18, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Robert Cowan, Kenneth Cuccinelli, Leslie Tritten, Chad Wolf. Jointly Signed by Sara Kelly Tetreault and Wilnerto Conde Arenas. (Repp, Liles)
December 15, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Liles Harvey Repp on behalf of Robert Cowan, Kenneth Cuccinelli, Leslie Tritten, Chad Wolf. (Repp, Liles)
December 4, 2020 Filing 5 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
December 4, 2020 Filing 4 Amended Summons Issued as to Robert Cowan, Kenneth Cuccinelli, Leslie Tritten, Chad Wolf. (MKB) Modified text on 12/4/2020 (MKB).
December 4, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Robert Cowan, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Leslie Tritten, Chad Wolf. (KNK)
December 4, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 3rd, 4th - Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 20-cv-2464 (WMW/KMM). (KNK)
December 3, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION against Kenneth Cuccinelli, Robert Cowan, Leslie Tritten, Chad Wolf (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8276268) filed by Sara K Tetreault, Wilberto Conde Arenas. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F, #7 Exhibit(s) G, #8 Exhibit(s) H, #9 Exhibit(s) I, #10 Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL COVER SHEET) (Wilson, David) Modified text on 12/4/2020 (KNK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tetreault et al v. Cowan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad Wolf
Represented By: Liles Harvey Repp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Leslie Tritten
Represented By: Liles Harvey Repp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert Cowan
Represented By: Liles Harvey Repp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kenneth Cuccinelli
Represented By: Liles Harvey Repp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sara K Tetreault
Represented By: David L Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Wilberto Conde Arenas
Represented By: David L Wilson
Represented By: Kelsey Friberg
Represented By: Hannah Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sara Kiley Tetreault
Represented By: David L Wilson
Represented By: Kelsey Friberg
Represented By: Hannah Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?