Stormo-Parsons v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Wendy Stormo-Parsons
Defendant: TCF National Bank, Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Trans Union LLC
Case Number: 0:2020cv02466
Filed: December 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2021 Filing 23 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #22 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #20 Order on Stipulation filed by TCF National Bank.(Melendez, Brian)
February 1, 2021 Filing 22 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #20 Order on Stipulation filed by TCF National Bank. (Melendez, Brian)
January 11, 2021 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Myers, Gregory)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER on #18 Stipulation for Second Extension of Time for Defendant TCF National Bank to Answer or Otherwise Respond. TCF National Bank answer due 2/1/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 1/8/2021.(JMK)
January 8, 2021 Filing 19 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #18 Stipulation. (Melendez, Brian)
January 8, 2021 Filing 18 STIPULATION re #12 Order on Stipulation for Second Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Defend by TCF National Bank. Jointly Signed by Wendy Stormo-Parsons. (Melendez, Brian)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #15 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Peter Wickard for Trans Union LLC. Approved by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 12/14/2020. (NAH)
December 11, 2020 Filing 16 Trans Union, LLC's ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses filed by Trans Union LLC. (Fisher, Bradley)
December 9, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Peter R. Wickard. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8294677 filed by Trans Union LLC. (Fisher, Bradley)
December 9, 2020 Filing 14 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant Trans Union LLC. (Fisher, Bradley)
December 9, 2020 Filing 13 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant TCF National Bank. (Melendez, Brian)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER on #9 Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendant TCF National Bank to Answer or Otherwise Defend. TCF National Bank answer due 1/11/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 12/8/2020.(JMK)
December 8, 2020 Filing 11 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have been recently revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (JMK)
December 8, 2020 Filing 10 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #9 Stipulation. (Melendez, Brian)
December 8, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Defend by TCF National Bank. Jointly Signed by Wendy Stormo-Parsons. (Melendez, Brian)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Emma Julia Lanzon for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Approved by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 12/8/2020. (JGK)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER on #3 Stipulation. Experian Information Solutions, Inc.'s answer is due 1/11/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 12/4/2020. (ERE)
December 4, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Emma Lanzon. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8279826 filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Myers, Gregory)
December 4, 2020 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Myers, Gregory)
December 4, 2020 Filing 4 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #3 Stipulation. (Myers, Gregory)
December 4, 2020 Filing 3 STIPULATION of Extension of Time for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Plead by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Jointly Signed by Wendy Stormo-Parsons. (Myers, Gregory)
December 4, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 20-cv-02466 SRN/HB. (MTP)
December 4, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County District Court (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8277974) filed by Trans Union LLC. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Summons, #2 Exhibit(s) B - Complaint, #3 Exhibit(s) C - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit(s) D - Experian Consent to Removal, #5 Exhibit(s) E - TCF Consent to Removal, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Certificate of Service) (Fisher, Bradley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stormo-Parsons v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Stormo-Parsons
Represented By: Anthony P Chester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TCF National Bank
Represented By: Brian Melendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory John Myers
Represented By: Emma Julia Lanzon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Represented By: Bradley D Fisher
Represented By: Amy M Sieben
Represented By: Peter Wickard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?