Chevaillier v. Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Heather Chevaillier
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 0:2020cv02471
Filed: December 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Referring Judge: David T Schultz
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER/NOTICE FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Parties are directed to Meet and Confer by 2/16/2021. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/16/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 2/23/2021 at 08:30 AM before Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 12/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)Notice to Public: Please visit our website at #https://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/court-schedules for audio connection information for this hearing. Note that hearings may not appear on the kiosk until one week before the hearing date.(TJB)
December 22, 2020 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant Unum Life Insurance Company of America. (Wagener, Terrance)
December 22, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Unum Life Insurance Company of America. (Wagener, Terrance)
December 4, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Unum Life Insurance Company of America. (MMP)
December 4, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per 3rd 4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 20-cv-2471 (PJS/DTS). (MMP)
December 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Unum Life Insurance Company of America (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8279210) filed by Heather Chevaillier. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Leighton, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chevaillier v. Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Chevaillier
Represented By: Robert J Leighton, Jr
Represented By: Denise Yegge Tataryn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Lauren Hoglund
Represented By: Terrance J Wagener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?