Saint-Gobain Adfors S.A.S. v. 3M Company
Petitioner: Saint-Gobain Adfors S.A.S.
Respondent: 3M Company
Case Number: 0:2020mc00052
Filed: July 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Michael J Davis
Referring Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Nature of Suit: Invalid
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2020 Filing 27 DECLARATION of Sara Louise Ashby re #24 Response, by 3M Company . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) SLA-1, #2 Exhibit(s) SLA-2, #3 Exhibit(s) SLA-3, #4 Exhibit(s) SLA-4, #5 Exhibit(s) SLA-5)(Reichel, Deanna)
August 21, 2020 Filing 26 DECLARATION of Dwight D. Erickson re #24 Response, by 3M Company . (Reichel, Deanna)
August 21, 2020 Filing 25 DECLARATION of Deanna J. Reichel re #24 Response, by 3M Company . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2)(Reichel, Deanna)
August 21, 2020 Filing 24 RESPONSE re #1 Initiating Document in a Miscellaneous Case, Opposition to Petitioner's Application for Order to Take Discovery for Use in Foreign Proceedings Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1782 filed by 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Reichel, Deanna)
August 15, 2020 Filing 23 EXHIBIT 1 (Corrected Version) re #1 Initiating Document in a Miscellaneous Case, filed by Saint-Gobain Adfors S.A.S.. (Lawrence, Joseph)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #20 Joint Request to Modify the Briefing Schedule: 3M Company's Opposition is due August 21, 2020; Saint-Gobain Adfors S.A.S.'s reply is due September 4, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 8/11/2020. (KAT)
August 11, 2020 Filing 21 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Modifying Briefing Schedule #20 Motion for Extension of Time (General). (Chamberlin, Brianna)
August 11, 2020 Filing 20 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time filed by 3M Company. (Chamberlin, Brianna)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER on #17 Joint Stipulation Setting Briefing Schedule. Response due by 8/19/2020. Reply due by 9/2/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 7/21/2020.(KAT)
July 20, 2020 Filing 18 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #17 Stipulation. (Chamberlin, Brianna)
July 20, 2020 Filing 17 STIPULATION to Briefing Schedule by 3M Company. Jointly Signed by Saint-Gobain Adfors S.A.S.. (Chamberlin, Brianna)
July 20, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE by Saint-Gobain Adfors S.A.S. Petitioner's Notice of Hearing on Application for an Order to Take Discovery for Use in Foreign Proceedings Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1782. Hearing set for 9/15/2020 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 8E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez (Norgard, Tara) Modified text on 7/21/2020 (CLK).
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Douglas E. McCann for 3M Company. Approved by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 7/17/2020. (NAH)
July 16, 2020 Filing 14 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Respondent 3M Company. (Chamberlin, Brianna)
July 15, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Deanna J Reichel on behalf of 3M Company. (Reichel, Deanna)
July 15, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Douglas E. McCann. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7884489 filed by 3M Company. (Chamberlin, Brianna)
July 15, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Brianna Lee Chamberlin on behalf of 3M Company. (Chamberlin, Brianna)
July 9, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Saint-Gobain Adfors S.A.S. re #2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement, #3 Memorandum, #1 Initiating Document in a Miscellaneous Case, #4 Declaration, #5 Proposed Order to Judge - Other (Lawrence, Joseph)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Joseph Alexander Lawrence for Saint-Gobain Adfors S.A.S.; granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jack W Londen for Saint-Gobain Adfors S.A.S. Approved by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 7/8/2020. (NAH)
July 7, 2020 Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Michael J. Davis per Civil (Miscellaneous) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 20-mc-52 MJD/KMM. (KDS)
July 2, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jack W. Londen. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7851167 filed by Saint-Gobain Adfors S.A.S.. (Norgard, Tara)
July 2, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney J. Alexander Lawrence. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7851128 filed by Saint-Gobain Adfors S.A.S.. (Norgard, Tara)
July 2, 2020 Filing 5 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #3 Memorandum, #1 Initiating Document in a Miscellaneous Case, #4 Declaration,. (Norgard, Tara)
July 2, 2020 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Alexander John Diebler Wilson re #3 Memorandum, #1 Initiating Document in a Miscellaneous Case, by Saint-Gobain Adfors S.A.S. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F, #7 Exhibit(s) G, #8 Exhibit(s) H, #9 Exhibit(s) I, #10 Exhibit(s) J, #11 Exhibit(s) K, #12 Exhibit(s) L, #13 Exhibit(s) M, #14 Exhibit(s) N)(Norgard, Tara)
July 2, 2020 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM re #1 Initiating Document in a Miscellaneous Case, filed by Saint-Gobain Adfors S.A.S.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Norgard, Tara)
July 2, 2020 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Petitioner Saint-Gobain Adfors S.A.S.. (Norgard, Tara)
July 2, 2020 Filing 1 Application of Saint-Gobain Adfors S.A.S. For An Order to Take Discovery For Use In Foreign Proceedings Pursuant to 28 U.S.C 1782 (filing fee $ 47, receipt number AMNDC-7850845). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Norgard, Tara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saint-Gobain Adfors S.A.S. v. 3M Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: 3M Company
Represented By: Douglas E. McCann
Represented By: Brianna Lee Chamberlin
Represented By: Deanna J Reichel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Saint-Gobain Adfors S.A.S.
Represented By: Tara C Norgard
Represented By: Joseph Alexander Lawrence
Represented By: Jack W Londen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?