Spencer v. United States Department of Justice et al
Plaintiff: Antwoyn Terrell Spencer
Defendant: Michael L. Cheever, Erica H. McDonald, Jeffrey S Paulsen, William Barr and United States Department of Justice
Case Number: 0:2020mc00071
Filed: October 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:20-cv-02568. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per Miscellaneous List.
October 15, 2020 Filing 3 Case transferred to the USDC for the Minnesota, pursuant to the Court Order entered 9/25/2020. Sent to Court via Extraction. (ztd) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/16/2020.]
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER transferring case to the U.S. District Court for the District of Minnesota. See Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 09/25/20. (lctjk2) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/16/2020.]
September 9, 2020 SUMMONS (3) Issued as to WILLIAM BARR, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zrdj) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/16/2020.]
September 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against WILLIAM BARR, MICHAEL L. CHEEVER, ERICA H. MCDONALD, JEFFREY S. PAULSEN, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616104101) with Jury Demand filed by ANTWOYN TERRELL SPENCER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(zrdj) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/16/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spencer v. United States Department of Justice et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antwoyn Terrell Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael L. Cheever
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erica H. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey S Paulsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?