BLH Motors, LLC, v Genesis Motor America LLC
Plaintiff: BLH Motors, LLC, d/b/a Genesis of Bloomington and BLH Motors, LLC doing business as Genesis of Bloomington
Defendant: Genesis Motor America LLC
Case Number: 0:2021cv00134
Filed: January 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Tony N Leung
Referring Judge: Paul A Magnuson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2021 Filing 27 JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Civil Notice - appeal)(MTP)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice, with each party to bear its own attorney's fees and costs. LET JUDGMENT BE ENTERED ACCORDINGLY. Signed by Judge Paul A. Magnuson on 6/14/2021. (ALT)
June 11, 2021 Filing 25 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Dismissal #24 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (Andrews, Micah)
June 11, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by BLH Motors, LLC (Andrews, Micah)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 6/22/2021. Fact Discovery due by 12/1/2021. Expert Discovery due by 4/15/2022. Motions (non-disp) due 12/1/2021. Motions (disp) due by 7/1/2022. Ready for trial due by 10/1/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 4/22/2021. (HAM)
April 22, 2021 Filing 22 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 4/22/2021. Pretrial scheduling order will be issued. (HAM)
April 15, 2021 Filing 21 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by BLH Motors, LLC. Jointly Signed by General Motors America, LLC.(Andrews, Micah)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #19 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Elizabeth A McNellie for Genesis Motor America LLC. Approved by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 3/26/2021. (NAH)
March 25, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Elizabeth McNellie. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8633534 filed by Genesis Motor America LLC. (Bullard, Jennifer)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 (Text-Only) ORDER/NOTICE TO ATTORNEY. In recognition of the current efforts locally and nationally to protect persons from unnecessary potential exposure to COVID-19, the Pretrial Scheduling Conference in this case will be held by telephone. A call-in number will be provided by the Court. The parties are not required to conduct any applicable meet and confers in person. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 3/19/2021. (HAM)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE OF AND ORDER FOR PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 4/22/2021 at 10:00 AM in Judge's Chambers 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 3/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (HAM)
March 2, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney and Substitution of Counsel (Bullard, Jennifer)
March 1, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Genesis Motor America LLC. (Bullard, Jennifer)
February 12, 2021 Filing 14 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant Genesis Motor America LLC. (Kerwin, Sheila)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER on #11 Stipulation. Genesis Motor America LLC answer due 3/1/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 2/12/2021. (HAM)
February 11, 2021 Filing 12 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #11 Stipulation. (Kerwin, Sheila)
February 11, 2021 Filing 11 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Genesis Motor America LLC. Jointly Signed by BLH Motors, LLC. (Kerwin, Sheila)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Micah Allen Andrews for BLH Motors, LLC; granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jason T Allen for BLH Motors, LLC. Approved by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 2/1/2021. (NAH)
January 29, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jason T. Allen. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8446704 filed by BLH Motors, LLC. (Maier, Charles)
January 29, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Micah A. Andrews. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8446682 filed by BLH Motors, LLC. (Maier, Charles)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER in re Dispositive Motion Practice in cases assigned to The Hon. Paul A. Magnuson. (LLM)
January 26, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BLH Motors, LLC. Genesis Motor America LLC served on 1/25/2021, answer due 2/16/2021. (Brown, Eric)
January 22, 2021 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff BLH Motors, LLC. (Brown, Eric)
January 20, 2021 Filing 4 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Jason T. Allen, Micah A. Andrews as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (KNK)
January 20, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Genesis Motor America LLC. (KNK)
January 20, 2021 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Paul A. Magnuson per 3rd, 4th - Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 21-cv-134 (PAM/TNL). (KNK)
January 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Genesis Motor America LLC (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8408361) filed by BLH Motors, LLC, d/b/a Genesis of Bloomington. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A and B, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Maier, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BLH Motors, LLC, v Genesis Motor America LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesis Motor America LLC
Represented By: Jennifer L Bullard
Represented By: Sheila T Kerwin
Represented By: Elizabeth A McNellie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BLH Motors, LLC, d/b/a Genesis of Bloomington
Represented By: Charles K Maier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BLH Motors, LLC doing business as Genesis of Bloomington
Represented By: Charles K Maier
Represented By: Eric V Brown
Represented By: Micah Allen Andrews
Represented By: Jason T Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?