Hendrickson v. Qualia Collection Services et al
Plaintiff: Renee M Hendrickson and Renee M. Hendrickson
Defendant: Kohls Department Stores, Inc., Qualia Collection Services, Capital One Financial Corporation and Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2021cv00242
Filed: January 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2021 Filing 18 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: #12 MOTION to Dismiss/General for Failure to State a Claim : Motion Hearing set for 7/12/2021 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 14E (MPLS) before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (Newman, Patrick)
March 22, 2021 Filing 17 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. (Newman, Patrick) Modified text on 3/23/2021 (CLK).
March 22, 2021 Filing 16 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant Capital One Financial Corporation. (Newman, Patrick)
March 22, 2021 Filing 15 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Dismissing Plaintiff's Complaint as to Defendants Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. and Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. #12 Motion to Dismiss/General. (Newman, Patrick)
March 22, 2021 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support re #12 MOTION to Dismiss/General for Failure to State a Claim filed by Capital One Financial Corporation, Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Newman, Patrick)
March 22, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #12 MOTION to Dismiss/General for Failure to State a Claim : Motion Hearing set for 7/12/2021 at 08:30 AM in Judge's Chambers 14W (MPLS) before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (Newman, Patrick)
March 22, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss/General for Failure to State a Claim filed by Capital One Financial Corporation, Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.. (Newman, Patrick)
March 22, 2021 Filing 11 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-WILL REFILE. MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution filed by Capital One Financial Corporation, Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.. (Newman, Patrick) Modified text on 3/22/2021 (MKB).
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Brendan H Little for Qualia Collection Services. Approved by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 2/24/2021. (NAH)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER on #7 Stipulation. Capital One Financial Corporation answer due 3/22/2021; Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. answer due 3/22/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 2/24/2021.(JLB)
February 23, 2021 Filing 8 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #7 Stipulation. (Newman, Patrick)
February 23, 2021 Filing 7 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by Capital One Financial Corporation, Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.. Jointly Signed by Renee M. Hendrickson. (Newman, Patrick)
February 23, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Brendan H. Little. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8527222 filed by Qualia Collection Services. (Warner, George)
February 23, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Qualia Collection Services. (Warner, George)
February 16, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Renee M. Hendrickson. Capital One Financial Corporation served on 2/2/2021, answer due 2/23/2021. (Lyons, Thomas)
February 1, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Capital One Financial Corporation, Kohl's Department Stores, Inc., Qualia Collection Services. (KDS)
February 1, 2021 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per Civil 6th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 21-cv-242 PJS/LIB. (KDS)
January 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Trial Demanded against Capital One Financial Corporation, Kohls Department Stores, Inc., Qualia Collection Services (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8447153) filed by Renee M Hendrickson. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Lyons, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hendrickson v. Qualia Collection Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee M Hendrickson
Represented By: Thomas J Lyons, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee M. Hendrickson
Represented By: Thomas J Lyons, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kohls Department Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qualia Collection Services
Represented By: Brendan H Little
Represented By: George E. Warner, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Financial Corporation
Represented By: Patrick D Newman
Represented By: Tal Aaron Bakke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick D Newman
Represented By: Tal Aaron Bakke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?