Howard v. Life Time Fitness, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Maura Howard
Defendant: LTF Yoga Comapny, LLC, Life Time Fitness, Inc., LTF Club Management Company, LLC, LTF Club Operations Company, Inc. and LTF Yoga Company, LLC
Case Number: 0:2021cv00574
Filed: February 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Becky R Thorson
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Daniel R. Karon. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8702632 filed by Maura Howard. (Bleichner, Bryan)
April 23, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Beau D. Hollowell. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8702592 filed by Maura Howard. (Bleichner, Bryan)
April 16, 2021 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant LTF Club Operations Company, Inc.. (Schmitt, Joseph)
April 16, 2021 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant Life Time Fitness, Inc.. (Schmitt, Joseph)
March 4, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Class Action Complaint filed by LTF Club Management Company, LLC, LTF Club Operations Company, Inc., LTF Yoga Company, LLC, Life Time Fitness, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-D) (Schmitt, Joseph)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER/NOTICE: Pretrial Conference set for 5/3/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 3/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(MSK)
March 1, 2021 Filing 4 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
February 26, 2021 Filing 3 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Daniel R. Karon, Beau D.Hollowell as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (MKB)
February 26, 2021 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 3rd, 4th - Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 21-cv-574 (WMW/BRT). (KNK)
February 25, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County, case number 27-cv-20-10513 (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8536619) filed by LTF Club Management Company, LLC, LTF Club Operations Company, Inc., Life Time Fitness, Inc., LTF Yoga Comapny, LLC. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - First Complaint, #2 Exhibit(s) B - Second Complaint, #3 Exhibit(s) C - 1-22-21 Order, #4 Exhibit(s) D Third Complaint, #5 Exhibit(s) E - State Court Pleadings, #6 Exhibit(s) F - Declaration of Matthew Lego, #7 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (Schmitt, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howard v. Life Time Fitness, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LTF Yoga Comapny, LLC
Represented By: Joseph G Schmitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Time Fitness, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph G Schmitt
Represented By: Jason Hungerford
Represented By: Courtney M. Blanchard
Represented By: Joel D O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LTF Club Management Company, LLC
Represented By: Joseph G Schmitt
Represented By: Jason Hungerford
Represented By: Courtney M. Blanchard
Represented By: Joel D O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LTF Club Operations Company, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph G Schmitt
Represented By: Jason Hungerford
Represented By: Courtney M. Blanchard
Represented By: Joel D O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LTF Yoga Company, LLC
Represented By: Jason Hungerford
Represented By: Courtney M. Blanchard
Represented By: Joseph G Schmitt
Represented By: Joel D O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maura Howard
Represented By: Brant D Penney
Represented By: Garrett D Blanchfield, Jr
Represented By: Bryan L. Bleichner
Represented By: Christopher P Renz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?