James et al v. Ford Motor Company et al
Plaintiff: Ronald C. James and Kory James
Defendant: Ken Grody Redlands, LLC. and Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 0:2021cv00629
Filed: March 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2021 Filing 12 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Given Nietfeld, Molly)
April 20, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Ford Motor Company. (Given Nietfeld, Molly) Modified text on 4/21/2021 (lmb).
March 26, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Ronald C. James, Kory James. Ken Grody Redlands, LLC. waiver sent on 3/5/2021, answer due 5/4/2021. (Zimmerman, Genevieve)
March 24, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Molly J. Given Nietfeld on behalf of Ford Motor Company. (Given Nietfeld, Molly)
March 16, 2021 Filing 8 DECLARATION of David Hansen by Ronald C. James . (Milasincic, Adam)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Robert Ammons for Kory James and for Ronald C. James.; granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Adam A Milasincic for Kory James and for Ronald C. James. Approved by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 3/9/2021. (JGK)
March 5, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Adam Milasincic. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8577076 filed by Kory James, Ronald C. James. (Zimmerman, Genevieve)
March 5, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Robert E. Ammons. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8577061 filed by Kory James, Ronald C. James. (Zimmerman, Genevieve)
March 4, 2021 Filing 4 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Robert E. Ammons, Adam Milasincic as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (MMG)
March 4, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Ford Motor Company, Ken Grody Redlands, LLC.. (MMG)
March 4, 2021 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 6th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 21-cv-629 ECT/LIB. (MMG)
March 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ford Motor Company, Ken Grody Redlands, LLC. (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8572161) filed by Ronald C. James, Kory James. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Zimmerman, Genevieve)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James et al v. Ford Motor Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Grody Redlands, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Molly J. Given Nietfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald C. James
Represented By: Genevieve M Zimmerman
Represented By: Robert Ammons
Represented By: Adam A Milasincic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kory James
Represented By: Genevieve M Zimmerman
Represented By: Robert Ammons
Represented By: Adam A Milasincic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?