Iliff et al v. Dominium Management Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Patricia Noel, Betty Lees, Nancy Lawrence, Sharifah Doyle-El, Susan Illiff, Linda Cobb, Gwenneth Larson, Home Line, Patricia Johnson and Susan Iliff
Defendant: St. Paul Leased Housing Associates IX, LLLP, Blaine Leased Housing Associates III, LLLP, St. Paul Leased Housing Associates VIII, LLC, Champlin Leased Housing Associates IV, LLC, Minneapolis Leased Housing Associates IX, LLLP, St. Paul Leased Housing Development X, LLC, Minnetonka Leased Housing Development II, LLC, Cottage Grove Leased Housing Associates I, LLLP, Dominium Holdings I, LLC, Minneapolis Leased Housing Development IX, LLC, St. Paul Leased Housing Development VIII, LLC, St. Paul Leased Housing Associates IX, LLC, Spring Lake Park Leased Housing Associates I, LLLP, St. Anthony Leased Housing Associates II, Limited Partnership, Dominium Development & Acquisition, LLC, Columbia Heights Leased Housing Associates III, LLLP, Lexington Leased Housing Associates I, LLC, Cottage Grove Leased Housing Development I, LLC, St. Paul Leased Housing Associates VI, LLLP, Spring Lake Park Leased Housing Development I, LLC, Coon Rapids Leased Housing Development IV, LLC, Columbia Heights Leased Housing Development III, LLC, Crystal Leased Housing Associates I, LLLP, Minneapolis Leased Housing Development IV, LLC, Blaine Leased Housing Associates III, LLC, Dominium Management Services, LLC, St. Cloud Leased Housing Development III, LLC, Columbia Heights Leased Housing Associates III, LLC, St. Paul Leased Housing Development VI, LLC, Blaine Leased Housing Development III, LLC, Dominium, Inc., Coon Rapids Leased Housing Associates IV, LLLP, Woodbury Leased Housing Associates II, LLLP, St. Paul Leased Housing Development IX, LLC, Minneapolis Leased Housing Associates IV, LLC, Crystal Leased Housing Development I, LLC, Cottage Grove Leased Housing Associates I, LLC, Lexington Leased Housing Associates I, LLLP, St. Cloud Leased Housing Associates III, LLC, Dominium Holdings II, LLC, St. Paul Leased Housing Associates VI, LLC, Minnetonka Leased Housing Associates II, LLLP, Champlin Leased Housing Development IV, LLC, Crystal Leased Housing Associates I, LLC, Champlin Leased Housing Associates IV, LLLP, St. Cloud Leased Housing Associates III, LLLP, Coon Rapids Leased Housing Associates IV, LLC, St. Paul Leased Housing Associates X, LLLP, Minneapolis Leased Housing Associates IV, Limited Partnership, St. Paul Leased Housing Associates VIII, LLLP, Spring Lake Park Leased Housing Associates I, LLC, Minnetonka Leased Housing Associates II, LLC, St. Anthony Leased Housing Development II, LLC, Lexington Leased Housing Development I, LLC, Minneapolis Leased Housing Associates IX, LLC, St. Paul Leased Housing Associates X, LLC, Woodbury Leased Housing Associates II, LLC, Woodbury Leased Housing Development II, LLC and St. Anthony Leased Housing Associates II, LLC
Case Number: 0:2021cv00649
Filed: March 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Michael J Davis
Referring Judge: Tony N Leung
Nature of Suit: Fraud
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 42
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING THE COURT'S RULING ON MOTION TO REMAND TO STATE COURT. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. The Joint Stipulation to Stay Proceedings Pending the Court's Ruling on Motion to Remand to State Court #24 is GRANTED. 2. Proceedings in this matter other than briefing and consideration of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand to State Court #19 are stayed pending the Court's decision on that motion. Accordingly, further briefing or consideration of Defendants Motion to Dismiss are stayed. 3. Should the Court deny Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand to State Court, Plaintiffs shall respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss within 21 days of the date of that order, and Defendants may file their reply memorandum 14 days after Plaintiffs file their response. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 4/27/2021.(GRR)
April 26, 2021 Filing 25 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #24 Stipulation,. (Coleman, Craig)
April 26, 2021 Filing 24 STIPULATION to Stay Proceedings Pending the Court's Ruling on Motion to Remand to State Court by Linda Cobb, Sharifah Doyle-El, Home Line, Susan Iliff, Patricia Johnson, Gwenneth Larson, Nancy Lawrence, Betty Lees, Patricia Noel. Jointly Signed by Dominium Management Services, LLC, et al.. (Coleman, Craig)
April 23, 2021 Filing 23 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #19 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Linda Cobb, Sharifah Doyle-El, Home Line, Susan Iliff, Patricia Johnson, Gwenneth Larson, Nancy Lawrence, Betty Lees, Patricia Noel.(Coleman, Craig)
April 23, 2021 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Support re #19 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Linda Cobb, Sharifah Doyle-El, Home Line, Susan Iliff, Patricia Johnson, Gwenneth Larson, Nancy Lawrence, Betty Lees, Patricia Noel. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Coleman, Craig)
April 23, 2021 Filing 21 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #19 Motion to Remand to State Court filed by Linda Cobb, Sharifah Doyle-El, Home Line, Susan Iliff, Patricia Johnson, Gwenneth Larson, Nancy Lawrence, Betty Lees, Patricia Noel.(Coleman, Craig)
April 23, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #19 MOTION to Remand to State Court : Date and time to be determined. Filed by Linda Cobb, Sharifah Doyle-El, Home Line, Susan Iliff, Patricia Johnson, Gwenneth Larson, Nancy Lawrence, Betty Lees, Patricia Noel. (Coleman, Craig) Modified text/filers on 4/23/2021 (CLK).
April 23, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Linda Cobb, Sharifah Doyle-El, Home Line, Susan Iliff, Patricia Johnson, Gwenneth Larson, Nancy Lawrence, Betty Lees, Patricia Noel. (Coleman, Craig)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT re #13 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiffs' Purported Class Action Complaint. Within 30 days of the motion being decided, Plaintiff shall contact the chambers of Magistrate Judge Tony Leung, by letter or e-mail, for the purpose of scheduling the pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 4/14/2021. (HAM)
April 12, 2021 Filing 17 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #13 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiffs' Purported Class Action Complaint filed by Blaine Leased Housing Associates III, LLC, Blaine Leased Housing Associates III, LLLP, Blaine Leased Housing Development III, LLC, Champlin Leased Housing Associates IV, LLC, Champlin Leased Housing Associates IV, LLLP, Champlin Leased Housing Development IV, LLC, Columbia Heights Leased Housing Associates III, LLC, Columbia Heights Leased Housing Associates III, LLLP, Columbia Heights Leased Housing Development III, LLC, Coon Rapids Leased Housing Associates IV, LLC, Coon Rapids Leased Housing Associates IV, LLLP, Coon Rapids Leased Housing Development IV, LLC, Cottage Grove Leased Housing Associates I, LLC, Cottage Grove Leased Housing Associates I, LLLP, Cottage Grove Leased Housing Development I, LLC, Crystal Leased Housing Associates I, LLC, Crystal Leased Housing Associates I, LLLP, Crystal Leased Housing Development I, LLC, Dominium Development & Acquisition, LLC, Dominium Holdings I, LLC, Dominium Holdings II, LLC, Dominium Management Services, LLC, Dominium, Inc., Lexington Leased Housing Associates I, LLC, Lexington Leased Housing Associates I, LLLP, Lexington Leased Housing Development I, LLC, Minneapolis Leased Housing Associates IV, LLC, Minneapolis Leased Housing Associates IV, Limited Partnership, Minneapolis Leased Housing Associates IX, LLC, Minneapolis Leased Housing Associates IX, LLLP, Minneapolis Leased Housing Development IV, LLC, Minneapolis Leased Housing Development IX, LLC, Minnetonka Leased Housing Associates II, LLC, Minnetonka Leased Housing Associates II, LLLP, Minnetonka Leased Housing Development II, LLC, Spring Lake Park Leased Housing Associates I, LLC, Spring Lake Park Leased Housing Associates I, LLLP, Spring Lake Park Leased Housing Development I, LLC, St. Anthony Leased Housing Associates II, LLC, St. Anthony Leased Housing Associates II, Limited Partnership, St. Anthony Leased Housing Development II, LLC, St. Cloud Leased Housing Associates III, LLC, St. Cloud Leased Housing Associates III, LLLP, St. Cloud Leased Housing Development III, LLC, St. Paul Leased Housing Associates IX, LLC, St. Paul Leased Housing Associates IX, LLLP, St. Paul Leased Housing Associates VI, LLC, St. Paul Leased Housing Associates VI, LLLP, St. Paul Leased Housing Associates VIII, LLC, St. Paul Leased Housing Associates VIII, LLLP, St. Paul Leased Housing Associates X, LLC, St. Paul Leased Housing Associates X, LLLP, St. Paul Leased Housing Development IX, LLC, St. Paul Leased Housing Development VI, LLC, St. Paul Leased Housing Development VIII, LLC, St. Paul Leased Housing Development X, LLC, Woodbury Leased Housing Associates II, LLC, Woodbury Leased Housing Associates II, LLLP, Woodbury Leased Housing Development II, LLC.(McBride, Matthew)
April 12, 2021 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support re #13 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiffs' Purported Class Action Complaint filed by Blaine Leased Housing Associates III, LLC, Blaine Leased Housing Associates III, LLLP, Blaine Leased Housing Development III, LLC, Champlin Leased Housing Associates IV, LLC, Champlin Leased Housing Associates IV, LLLP, Champlin Leased Housing Development IV, LLC, Columbia Heights Leased Housing Associates III, LLC, Columbia Heights Leased Housing Associates III, LLLP, Columbia Heights Leased Housing Development III, LLC, Coon Rapids Leased Housing Associates IV, LLC, Coon Rapids Leased Housing Associates IV, LLLP, Coon Rapids Leased Housing Development IV, LLC, Cottage Grove Leased Housing Associates I, LLC, Cottage Grove Leased Housing Associates I, LLLP, Cottage Grove Leased Housing Development I, LLC, Crystal Leased Housing Associates I, LLC, Crystal Leased Housing Associates I, LLLP, Crystal Leased Housing Development I, LLC, Dominium Development & Acquisition, LLC, Dominium Holdings I, LLC, Dominium Holdings II, LLC, Dominium Management Services, LLC, Dominium, Inc., Lexington Leased Housing Associates I, LLC, Lexington Leased Housing Associates I, LLLP, Lexington Leased Housing Development I, LLC, Minneapolis Leased Housing Associates IV, LLC, Minneapolis Leased Housing Associates IV, Limited Partnership, Minneapolis Leased Housing Associates IX, LLC, Minneapolis Leased Housing Associates IX, LLLP, Minneapolis Leased Housing Development IV, LLC, Minneapolis Leased Housing Development IX, LLC, Minnetonka Leased Housing Associates II, LLC, Minnetonka Leased Housing Associates II, LLLP, Minnetonka Leased Housing Development II, LLC, Spring Lake Park Leased Housing Associates I, LLC, Spring Lake Park Leased Housing Associates I, LLLP, Spring Lake Park Leased Housing Development I, LLC, St. Anthony Leased Housing Associates II, LLC, St. Anthony Leased Housing Associates II, Limited Partnership, St. Anthony Leased Housing Development II, LLC, St. Cloud Leased Housing Associates III, LLC, St. Cloud Leased Housing Associates III, LLLP, St. Cloud Leased Housing Development III, LLC, St. Paul Leased Housing Associates IX, LLC, St. Paul Leased Housing Associates IX, LLLP, St. Paul Leased Housing Associates VI, LLC, St. Paul Leased Housing Associates VI, LLLP, St. Paul Leased Housing Associates VIII, LLC, St. Paul Leased Housing Associates VIII, LLLP, St. Paul Leased Housing Associates X, LLC, St. Paul Leased Housing Associates X, LLLP, St. Paul Leased Housing Development IX, LLC, St. Paul Leased Housing Development VI, LLC, St. Paul Leased Housing Development VIII, LLC, St. Paul Leased Housing Development X, LLC, Woodbury Leased Housing Associates II, LLC, Woodbury Leased Housing Associates II, LLLP, Woodbury Leased Housing Development II, LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(McBride, Matthew)
April 12, 2021 Filing 15 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #13 Motion to Dismiss/General,,,,,,,,,,, filed by Blaine Leased Housing Associates III, LLC, Blaine Leased Housing Associates III, LLLP, Blaine Leased Housing Development III, LLC, Champlin Leased Housing Associates IV, LLC, Champlin Leased Housing Associates IV, LLLP, Champlin Leased Housing Development IV, LLC, Columbia Heights Leased Housing Associates III, LLC, Columbia Heights Leased Housing Associates III, LLLP, Columbia Heights Leased Housing Development III, LLC, Coon Rapids Leased Housing Associates IV, LLC, Coon Rapids Leased Housing Associates IV, LLLP, Coon Rapids Leased Housing Development IV, LLC, Cottage Grove Leased Housing Associates I, LLC, Cottage Grove Leased Housing Associates I, LLLP, Cottage Grove Leased Housing Development I, LLC, Crystal Leased Housing Associates I, LLC, Crystal Leased Housing Associates I, LLLP, Crystal Leased Housing Development I, LLC, Dominium Development & Acquisition, LLC, Dominium Holdings I, LLC, Dominium Holdings II, LLC, Dominium Management Services, LLC, Dominium, Inc., Lexington Leased Housing Associates I, LLC, Lexington Leased Housing Associates I, LLLP, Lexington Leased Housing Development I, LLC, Minneapolis Leased Housing Associates IV, LLC, Minneapolis Leased Housing Associates IV, Limited Partnership, Minneapolis Leased Housing Associates IX, LLC, Minneapolis Leased Housing Associates IX, LLLP, Minneapolis Leased Housing Development IV, LLC, Minneapolis Leased Housing Development IX, LLC, Minnetonka Leased Housing Associates II, LLC, Minnetonka Leased Housing Associates II, LLLP, Minnetonka Leased Housing Development II, LLC, Spring Lake Park Leased Housing Associates I, LLC, Spring Lake Park Leased Housing Associates I, LLLP, Spring Lake Park Leased Housing Development I, LLC, St. Anthony Leased Housing Associates II, LLC, St. Anthony Leased Housing Associates II, Limited Partnership, St. Anthony Leased Housing Development II, LLC, St. Cloud Leased Housing Associates III, LLC, St. Cloud Leased Housing Associates III, LLLP, St. Cloud Leased Housing Development III, LLC, St. Paul Leased Housing Associates IX, LLC, St. Paul Leased Housing Associates IX, LLLP, St. Paul Leased Housing Associates VI, LLC, St. Paul Leased Housing Associates VI, LLLP, St. Paul Leased Housing Associates VIII, LLC, St. Paul Leased Housing Associates VIII, LLLP, St. Paul Leased Housing Associates X, LLC, St. Paul Leased Housing Associates X, LLLP, St. Paul Leased Housing Development IX, LLC, St. Paul Leased Housing Development VI, LLC, St. Paul Leased Housing Development VIII, LLC, St. Paul Leased Housing Development X, LLC, Woodbury Leased Housing Associates II, LLC, Woodbury Leased Housing Associates II, LLLP, Woodbury Leased Housing Development II, LLC.(McBride, Matthew)
April 12, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #13 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiffs' Purported Class Action Complaint : Date and time to be determined. (McBride, Matthew)
April 12, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiffs' Purported Class Action Complaint filed by Blaine Leased Housing Associates III, LLC, Blaine Leased Housing Associates III, LLLP, Blaine Leased Housing Development III, LLC, Champlin Leased Housing Associates IV, LLC, Champlin Leased Housing Associates IV, LLLP, Champlin Leased Housing Development IV, LLC, Columbia Heights Leased Housing Associates III, LLC, Columbia Heights Leased Housing Associates III, LLLP, Columbia Heights Leased Housing Development III, LLC, Coon Rapids Leased Housing Associates IV, LLC, Coon Rapids Leased Housing Associates IV, LLLP, Coon Rapids Leased Housing Development IV, LLC, Cottage Grove Leased Housing Associates I, LLC, Cottage Grove Leased Housing Associates I, LLLP, Cottage Grove Leased Housing Development I, LLC, Crystal Leased Housing Associates I, LLC, Crystal Leased Housing Associates I, LLLP, Crystal Leased Housing Development I, LLC, Dominium Development & Acquisition, LLC, Dominium Holdings I, LLC, Dominium Holdings II, LLC, Dominium Management Services, LLC, Dominium, Inc., Lexington Leased Housing Associates I, LLC, Lexington Leased Housing Associates I, LLLP, Lexington Leased Housing Development I, LLC, Minneapolis Leased Housing Associates IV, LLC, Minneapolis Leased Housing Associates IV, Limited Partnership, Minneapolis Leased Housing Associates IX, LLC, Minneapolis Leased Housing Associates IX, LLLP, Minneapolis Leased Housing Development IV, LLC, Minneapolis Leased Housing Development IX, LLC, Minnetonka Leased Housing Associates II, LLC, Minnetonka Leased Housing Associates II, LLLP, Minnetonka Leased Housing Development II, LLC, Spring Lake Park Leased Housing Associates I, LLC, Spring Lake Park Leased Housing Associates I, LLLP, Spring Lake Park Leased Housing Development I, LLC, St. Anthony Leased Housing Associates II, LLC, St. Anthony Leased Housing Associates II, Limited Partnership, St. Anthony Leased Housing Development II, LLC, St. Cloud Leased Housing Associates III, LLC, St. Cloud Leased Housing Associates III, LLLP, St. Cloud Leased Housing Development III, LLC, St. Paul Leased Housing Associates IX, LLC, St. Paul Leased Housing Associates IX, LLLP, St. Paul Leased Housing Associates VI, LLC, St. Paul Leased Housing Associates VI, LLLP, St. Paul Leased Housing Associates VIII, LLC, St. Paul Leased Housing Associates VIII, LLLP, St. Paul Leased Housing Associates X, LLC, St. Paul Leased Housing Associates X, LLLP, St. Paul Leased Housing Development IX, LLC, St. Paul Leased Housing Development VI, LLC, St. Paul Leased Housing Development VIII, LLC, St. Paul Leased Housing Development X, LLC, Woodbury Leased Housing Associates II, LLC, Woodbury Leased Housing Associates II, LLLP, Woodbury Leased Housing Development II, LLC. (McBride, Matthew)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER on #9 Stipulation & PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 4/6/2021.(LAS)
April 1, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Evelyn Levine on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Levine, Evelyn)
March 24, 2021 Filing 10 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #9 Stipulation,,,,,,,,,,,. (McBride, Matthew)
March 24, 2021 Filing 9 STIPULATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER by Blaine Leased Housing Associates III, LLC, Blaine Leased Housing Associates III, LLLP, Blaine Leased Housing Development III, LLC, Champlin Leased Housing Associates IV, LLC, Champlin Leased Housing Associates IV, LLLP, Champlin Leased Housing Development IV, LLC, Columbia Heights Leased Housing Associates III, LLC, Columbia Heights Leased Housing Associates III, LLLP, Columbia Heights Leased Housing Development III, LLC, Coon Rapids Leased Housing Associates IV, LLC, Coon Rapids Leased Housing Associates IV, LLLP, Coon Rapids Leased Housing Development IV, LLC, Cottage Grove Leased Housing Associates I, LLC, Cottage Grove Leased Housing Associates I, LLLP, Cottage Grove Leased Housing Development I, LLC, Crystal Leased Housing Associates I, LLC, Crystal Leased Housing Associates I, LLLP, Crystal Leased Housing Development I, LLC, Dominium Development & Acquisition, LLC, Dominium Holdings I, LLC, Dominium Holdings II, LLC, Dominium Management Services, LLC, Dominium, Inc., Lexington Leased Housing Associates I, LLC, Lexington Leased Housing Associates I, LLLP, Lexington Leased Housing Development I, LLC, Minneapolis Leased Housing Associates IV, LLC, Minneapolis Leased Housing Associates IV, Limited Partnership, Minneapolis Leased Housing Associates IX, LLC, Minneapolis Leased Housing Associates IX, LLLP, Minneapolis Leased Housing Development IV, LLC, Minneapolis Leased Housing Development IX, LLC, Minnetonka Leased Housing Associates II, LLC, Minnetonka Leased Housing Associates II, LLLP, Minnetonka Leased Housing Development II, LLC, Spring Lake Park Leased Housing Associates I, LLC, Spring Lake Park Leased Housing Associates I, LLLP, Spring Lake Park Leased Housing Development I, LLC, St. Anthony Leased Housing Associates II, LLC, St. Anthony Leased Housing Associates II, Limited Partnership, St. Anthony Leased Housing Development II, LLC, St. Cloud Leased Housing Associates III, LLC, St. Cloud Leased Housing Associates III, LLLP, St. Cloud Leased Housing Development III, LLC, St. Paul Leased Housing Associates IX, LLC, St. Paul Leased Housing Associates IX, LLLP, St. Paul Leased Housing Associates VI, LLC, St. Paul Leased Housing Associates VI, LLLP, St. Paul Leased Housing Associates VIII, LLC, St. Paul Leased Housing Associates VIII, LLLP, St. Paul Leased Housing Associates X, LLC, St. Paul Leased Housing Associates X, LLLP, St. Paul Leased Housing Development IX, LLC, St. Paul Leased Housing Development VI, LLC, St. Paul Leased Housing Development VIII, LLC, St. Paul Leased Housing Development X, LLC, Woodbury Leased Housing Associates II, LLC, Woodbury Leased Housing Associates II, LLLP, Woodbury Leased Housing Development II, LLC. Jointly Signed by Susan Iliff, Betty Lees, Linda Cobb, Nancy Lawrence, Patricia Johnson, Gwenneth Larson, Patricia Noel, Sharifah Doyle-El, and HOME Line. (McBride, Matthew)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER on #5 Stipulation. Defendants shall have up to and including April 12, 2021, to answer, respond or otherwise plead in response to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 3/10/2021. (HAM)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Paul A. Magnuson recused. Case reassigned to Judge Michael J. Davis for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 21-cv-649 (MJD/TNL). Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings Signed by Judge Paul A. Magnuson on 3/9/2021.(KNK)
March 9, 2021 Filing 6 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #5 Stipulation,,,,,,,,,,,. (McBride, Matthew)
March 9, 2021 Filing 5 STIPULATION To Extend Time To Respond To Complaint by Blaine Leased Housing Associates III, LLC, Blaine Leased Housing Associates III, LLLP, Blaine Leased Housing Development III, LLC, Champlin Leased Housing Associates IV, LLC, Champlin Leased Housing Associates IV, LLLP, Champlin Leased Housing Development IV, LLC, Columbia Heights Leased Housing Associates III, LLC, Columbia Heights Leased Housing Associates III, LLLP, Columbia Heights Leased Housing Development III, LLC, Coon Rapids Leased Housing Associates IV, LLC, Coon Rapids Leased Housing Associates IV, LLLP, Coon Rapids Leased Housing Development IV, LLC, Cottage Grove Leased Housing Associates I, LLC, Cottage Grove Leased Housing Associates I, LLLP, Cottage Grove Leased Housing Development I, LLC, Crystal Leased Housing Associates I, LLC, Crystal Leased Housing Associates I, LLLP, Crystal Leased Housing Development I, LLC, Dominium Development & Acquisition, LLC, Dominium Holdings I, LLC, Dominium Holdings II, LLC, Dominium Management Services, LLC, Dominium, Inc., Lexington Leased Housing Associates I, LLC, Lexington Leased Housing Associates I, LLLP, Lexington Leased Housing Development I, LLC, Minneapolis Leased Housing Associates IV, LLC, Minneapolis Leased Housing Associates IV, Limited Partnership, Minneapolis Leased Housing Associates IX, LLC, Minneapolis Leased Housing Associates IX, LLLP, Minneapolis Leased Housing Development IV, LLC, Minneapolis Leased Housing Development IX, LLC, Minnetonka Leased Housing Associates II, LLC, Minnetonka Leased Housing Associates II, LLLP, Minnetonka Leased Housing Development II, LLC, Spring Lake Park Leased Housing Associates I, LLC, Spring Lake Park Leased Housing Associates I, LLLP, Spring Lake Park Leased Housing Development I, LLC, St. Anthony Leased Housing Associates II, LLC, St. Anthony Leased Housing Associates II, Limited Partnership, St. Anthony Leased Housing Development II, LLC, St. Cloud Leased Housing Associates III, LLC, St. Cloud Leased Housing Associates III, LLLP, St. Cloud Leased Housing Development III, LLC, St. Paul Leased Housing Associates IX, LLC, St. Paul Leased Housing Associates IX, LLLP, St. Paul Leased Housing Associates VI, LLC, St. Paul Leased Housing Associates VI, LLLP, St. Paul Leased Housing Associates VIII, LLC, St. Paul Leased Housing Associates VIII, LLLP, St. Paul Leased Housing Associates X, LLC, St. Paul Leased Housing Associates X, LLLP, St. Paul Leased Housing Development IX, LLC, St. Paul Leased Housing Development VI, LLC, St. Paul Leased Housing Development VIII, LLC, St. Paul Leased Housing Development X, LLC, Woodbury Leased Housing Associates II, LLC, Woodbury Leased Housing Associates II, LLLP, Woodbury Leased Housing Development II, LLC. Jointly Signed by Susan Iliff, Betty Lees, Linda Cobb, Nancy Lawrence, Patricia Johnson, Gwenneth Larson, Patricia Noel, Sharifah Doyle-El, and HOME Line. (McBride, Matthew)
March 8, 2021 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Paul A. Magnuson per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 21-cv-649 PAM/TNL. (MMG)
March 5, 2021 Filing 3 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Evelyn Snyder as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (MMG)
March 5, 2021 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendants Blaine Leased Housing Associates III, LLC, Blaine Leased Housing Associates III, LLLP, Blaine Leased Housing Development III, LLC, Champlin Leased Housing Associates IV, LLC, Champlin Leased Housing Associates IV, LLLP, Champlin Leased Housing Development IV, LLC, Columbia Heights Leased Housing Associates III, LLC, Columbia Heights Leased Housing Associates III, LLLP, Columbia Heights Leased Housing Development III, LLC, Coon Rapids Leased Housing Associates IV, LLC, Coon Rapids Leased Housing Associates IV, LLLP, Coon Rapids Leased Housing Development IV, LLC, Cottage Grove Leased Housing Associates I, LLC, Cottage Grove Leased Housing Associates I, LLLP, Cottage Grove Leased Housing Development I, LLC, Crystal Leased Housing Associates I, LLC, Crystal Leased Housing Associates I, LLLP, Crystal Leased Housing Development I, LLC, Dominium Development & Acquisition, LLC, Dominium Holdings I, LLC, Dominium Holdings II, LLC, Dominium Management Services, LLC, Dominium, Inc., Lexington Leased Housing Associates I, LLC, Lexington Leased Housing Associates I, LLLP, Lexington Leased Housing Development I, LLC, Minneapolis Leased Housing Associates IV, LLC, Minneapolis Leased Housing Associates IV, Limited Partnership, Minneapolis Leased Housing Associates IX, LLC, Minneapolis Leased Housing Associates IX, LLLP, Minneapolis Leased Housing Development IV, LLC, Minneapolis Leased Housing Development IX, LLC, Minnetonka Leased Housing Associates II, LLC, Minnetonka Leased Housing Associates II, LLLP, Minnetonka Leased Housing Development II, LLC, Spring Lake Park Leased Housing Associates I, LLC, Spring Lake Park Leased Housing Associates I, LLLP, Spring Lake Park Leased Housing Development I, LLC, St. Anthony Leased Housing Associates II, LLC, St. Anthony Leased Housing Associates II, Limited Partnership, St. Anthony Leased Housing Development II, LLC, St. Cloud Leased Housing Associates III, LLC, St. Cloud Leased Housing Associates III, LLLP, St. Cloud Leased Housing Development III, LLC, St. Paul Leased Housing Associates IX, LLC, St. Paul Leased Housing Associates IX, LLLP, St. Paul Leased Housing Associates VI, LLC, St. Paul Leased Housing Associates VI, LLLP, St. Paul Leased Housing Associates VIII, LLC, St. Paul Leased Housing Associates VIII, LLLP, St. Paul Leased Housing Associates X, LLC, St. Paul Leased Housing Associates X, LLLP, St. Paul Leased Housing Development IX, LLC, St. Paul Leased Housing Development VI, LLC, St. Paul Leased Housing Development VIII, LLC, St. Paul Leased Housing Development X, LLC, Woodbury Leased Housing Associates II, LLC, Woodbury Leased Housing Associates II, LLLP, Woodbury Leased Housing Development II, LLC. (McBride, Matthew)
March 5, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County District Court (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8576808) filed by Minneapolis Leased Housing Development IV, LLC, Minneapolis Leased Housing Associates IV, Limited Partnership, St. Cloud Leased Housing Associates III, LLLP, Crystal Leased Housing Associates I, LLLP, Woodbury Leased Housing Development II, LLC, St. Paul Leased Housing Associates VI, LLLP, Coon Rapids Leased Housing Associates IV, LLC, Champlin Leased Housing Development IV, LLC, Blaine Leased Housing Associates III, LLC, Woodbury Leased Housing Associates II, LLLP, Spring Lake Park Leased Housing Associates I, LLLP, Minnetonka Leased Housing Associates II, LLC, Crystal Leased Housing Development I, LLC, Dominium Management Services, LLC, Minneapolis Leased Housing Associates IX, LLC, St. Paul Leased Housing Development IX, LLC, St. Anthony Leased Housing Development II, LLC, Columbia Heights Leased Housing Associates III, LLLP, Dominium Development & Acquisition, LLC, Minneapolis Leased Housing Development IX, LLC, Lexington Leased Housing Development I, LLC, St. Paul Leased Housing Associates X, LLLP, St. Cloud Leased Housing Associates III, LLC, St. Paul Leased Housing Development VIII, LLC, St. Anthony Leased Housing Associates II, Limited Partnership, Spring Lake Park Leased Housing Associates I, LLC, Coon Rapids Leased Housing Associates IV, LLLP, Lexington Leased Housing Associates I, LLC, Minnetonka Leased Housing Associates II, LLLP, Spring Lake Park Leased Housing Development I, LLC, Champlin Leased Housing Associates IV, LLLP, Dominium, Inc., St. Paul Leased Housing Associates VI, LLC, St. Cloud Leased Housing Development III, LLC, Blaine Leased Housing Associates III, LLLP, Dominium Holdings I, LLC, Dominium Holdings II, LLC, St. Paul Leased Housing Development VI, LLC, Minneapolis Leased Housing Associates IX, LLLP, Cottage Grove Leased Housing Associates I, LLC, Woodbury Leased Housing Associates II, LLC, St. Paul Leased Housing Associates X, LLC, Coon Rapids Leased Housing Development IV, LLC, Minnetonka Leased Housing Development II, LLC, Columbia Heights Leased Housing Associates III, LLC, Cottage Grove Leased Housing Associates I, LLLP, Blaine Leased Housing Development III, LLC, Crystal Leased Housing Associates I, LLC, St. Paul Leased Housing Associates VIII, LLLP, Champlin Leased Housing Associates IV, LLC, Cottage Grove Leased Housing Development I, LLC, St. Anthony Leased Housing Associates II, LLC, St. Paul Leased Housing Associates IX, LLLP, Lexington Leased Housing Associates I, LLLP, Columbia Heights Leased Housing Development III, LLC, St. Paul Leased Housing Development X, LLC, Minneapolis Leased Housing Associates IV, LLC, St. Paul Leased Housing Associates IX, LLC, St. Paul Leased Housing Associates VIII, LLC. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint Exhibit A, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (McBride, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Iliff et al v. Dominium Management Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Paul Leased Housing Associates IX, LLLP
Represented By: Olivia Moreland Cooper
Represented By: Matthew R McBride
Represented By: Thomas H Boyd
Represented By: Quin C. Seiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blaine Leased Housing Associates III, LLLP
Represented By: Olivia Moreland Cooper
Represented By: Matthew R McBride
Represented By: Thomas H Boyd
Represented By: Quin C. Seiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Paul Leased Housing Associates VIII, LLC
Represented By: Olivia Moreland Cooper
Represented By: Matthew R McBride
Represented By: Thomas H Boyd
Represented By: Quin C. Seiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Champlin Leased Housing Associates IV, LLC
Represented By: Olivia Moreland Cooper
Represented By: Matthew R McBride
Represented By: Thomas H Boyd
Represented By: Quin C. Seiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minneapolis Leased Housing Associates IX, LLLP
Represented By: Olivia Moreland Cooper
Represented By: Matthew R McBride
Represented By: Thomas H Boyd
Represented By: Quin C. Seiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Paul Leased Housing Development X, LLC
Represented By: Olivia Moreland Cooper
Represented By: Matthew R McBride
Represented By: Thomas H Boyd
Represented By: Quin C. Seiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minnetonka Leased Housing Development II, LLC
Represented By: Olivia Moreland Cooper
Represented By: Matthew R McBride
Represented By: Thomas H Boyd
Represented By: Quin C. Seiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cottage Grove Leased Housing Associates I, LLLP
Represented By: Olivia Moreland Cooper
Represented By: Matthew R McBride
Represented By: Thomas H Boyd
Represented By: Quin C. Seiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominium Holdings I, LLC
Represented By: Olivia Moreland Cooper
Represented By: Matthew R McBride
Represented By: Thomas H Boyd
Represented By: Quin C. Seiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minneapolis Leased Housing Development IX, LLC
Represented By: Olivia Moreland Cooper
Represented By: Matthew R McBride
Represented By: Thomas H Boyd
Represented By: Quin C. Seiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Paul Leased Housing Development VIII, LLC
Represented By: Olivia Moreland Cooper
Represented By: Matthew R McBride
Represented By: Thomas H Boyd
Represented By: Quin C. Seiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Paul Leased Housing Associates IX, LLC
Represented By: Olivia Moreland Cooper
Represented By: Matthew R McBride
Represented By: Thomas H Boyd
Represented By: Quin C. Seiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spring Lake Park Leased Housing Associates I, LLLP
Represented By: Olivia Moreland Cooper
Represented By: Matthew R McBride
Represented By: Thomas H Boyd
Represented By: Quin C. Seiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Anthony Leased Housing Associates II, Limited Partnership
Represented By: Olivia Moreland Cooper
Represented By: Matthew R McBride
Represented By: Thomas H Boyd
Represented By: Quin C. Seiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominium Development & Acquisition, LLC
Represented By: Olivia Moreland Cooper
Represented By: Matthew R McBride
Represented By: Thomas H Boyd
Represented By: Quin C. Seiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia Heights Leased Housing Associates III, LLLP
Represented By: Olivia Moreland Cooper
Represented By: Matthew R McBride
Represented By: Thomas H Boyd
Represented By: Quin C. Seiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexington Leased Housing Associates I, LLC
Represented By: Olivia Moreland Cooper
Represented By: Matthew R McBride
Represented By: Thomas H Boyd
Represented By: Quin C. Seiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cottage Grove Leased Housing Development I, LLC
Represented By: Olivia Moreland Cooper
Represented By: Matthew R McBride
Represented By: Thomas H Boyd
Represented By: Quin C. Seiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Paul Leased Housing Associates VI, LLLP
Represented By: Olivia Moreland Cooper
Represented By: Matthew R McBride
Represented By: Thomas H Boyd
Represented By: Quin C. Seiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spring Lake Park Leased Housing Development I, LLC
Represented By: Olivia Moreland Cooper
Represented By: Matthew R McBride
Represented By: Thomas H Boyd
Represented By: Quin C. Seiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coon Rapids Leased Housing Development IV, LLC
Represented By: Olivia Moreland Cooper
Represented By: Matthew R McBride
Represented By: Thomas H Boyd
Represented By: Quin C. Seiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia Heights Leased Housing Development III, LLC
Represented By: Olivia Moreland Cooper
Represented By: Matthew R McBride
Represented By: Thomas H Boyd
Represented By: Quin C. Seiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal Leased Housing Associates I, LLLP
Represented By: Olivia Moreland Cooper
Represented By: Matthew R McBride
Represented By: Thomas H Boyd
Represented By: Quin C. Seiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minneapolis Leased Housing Development IV, LLC
Represented By: Olivia Moreland Cooper
Represented By: Matthew R McBride
Represented By: Thomas H Boyd
Represented By: Quin C. Seiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blaine Leased Housing Associates III, LLC
Represented By: Olivia Moreland Cooper
Represented By: Matthew R McBride
Represented By: Thomas H Boyd
Represented By: Quin C. Seiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominium Management Services, LLC
Represented By: Olivia Moreland Cooper
Represented By: Matthew R McBride
Represented By: Thomas H Boyd
Represented By: Quin C. Seiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Cloud Leased Housing Development III, LLC
Represented By: Olivia Moreland Cooper
Represented By: Matthew R McBride
Represented By: Thomas H Boyd
Represented By: Quin C. Seiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia Heights Leased Housing Associates III, LLC
Represented By: Olivia Moreland Cooper
Represented By: Matthew R McBride
Represented By: Thomas H Boyd
Represented By: Quin C. Seiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Paul Leased Housing Development VI, LLC
Represented By: Olivia Moreland Cooper
Represented By: Matthew R McBride
Represented By: Thomas H Boyd
Represented By: Quin C. Seiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blaine Leased Housing Development III, LLC
Represented By: Olivia Moreland Cooper
Represented By: Matthew R McBride
Represented By: Thomas H Boyd
Represented By: Quin C. Seiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominium, Inc.
Represented By: Olivia Moreland Cooper
Represented By: Matthew R McBride
Represented By: Thomas H Boyd
Represented By: Quin C. Seiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coon Rapids Leased Housing Associates IV, LLLP
Represented By: Olivia Moreland Cooper
Represented By: Matthew R McBride
Represented By: Thomas H Boyd
Represented By: Quin C. Seiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woodbury Leased Housing Associates II, LLLP
Represented By: Olivia Moreland Cooper
Represented By: Matthew R McBride
Represented By: Thomas H Boyd
Represented By: Quin C. Seiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Paul Leased Housing Development IX, LLC
Represented By: Olivia Moreland Cooper
Represented By: Matthew R McBride
Represented By: Thomas H Boyd
Represented By: Quin C. Seiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minneapolis Leased Housing Associates IV, LLC
Represented By: Olivia Moreland Cooper
Represented By: Matthew R McBride
Represented By: Thomas H Boyd
Represented By: Quin C. Seiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal Leased Housing Development I, LLC
Represented By: Olivia Moreland Cooper
Represented By: Matthew R McBride
Represented By: Thomas H Boyd
Represented By: Quin C. Seiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cottage Grove Leased Housing Associates I, LLC
Represented By: Olivia Moreland Cooper
Represented By: Matthew R McBride
Represented By: Thomas H Boyd
Represented By: Quin C. Seiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexington Leased Housing Associates I, LLLP
Represented By: Olivia Moreland Cooper
Represented By: Matthew R McBride
Represented By: Thomas H Boyd
Represented By: Quin C. Seiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Cloud Leased Housing Associates III, LLC
Represented By: Olivia Moreland Cooper
Represented By: Matthew R McBride
Represented By: Thomas H Boyd
Represented By: Quin C. Seiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominium Holdings II, LLC
Represented By: Olivia Moreland Cooper
Represented By: Matthew R McBride
Represented By: Thomas H Boyd
Represented By: Quin C. Seiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Paul Leased Housing Associates VI, LLC
Represented By: Olivia Moreland Cooper
Represented By: Matthew R McBride
Represented By: Thomas H Boyd
Represented By: Quin C. Seiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minnetonka Leased Housing Associates II, LLLP
Represented By: Olivia Moreland Cooper
Represented By: Matthew R McBride
Represented By: Thomas H Boyd
Represented By: Quin C. Seiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Champlin Leased Housing Development IV, LLC
Represented By: Olivia Moreland Cooper
Represented By: Matthew R McBride
Represented By: Thomas H Boyd
Represented By: Quin C. Seiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal Leased Housing Associates I, LLC
Represented By: Olivia Moreland Cooper
Represented By: Matthew R McBride
Represented By: Thomas H Boyd
Represented By: Quin C. Seiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Champlin Leased Housing Associates IV, LLLP
Represented By: Olivia Moreland Cooper
Represented By: Matthew R McBride
Represented By: Thomas H Boyd
Represented By: Quin C. Seiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Cloud Leased Housing Associates III, LLLP
Represented By: Olivia Moreland Cooper
Represented By: Matthew R McBride
Represented By: Thomas H Boyd
Represented By: Quin C. Seiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coon Rapids Leased Housing Associates IV, LLC
Represented By: Olivia Moreland Cooper
Represented By: Matthew R McBride
Represented By: Thomas H Boyd
Represented By: Quin C. Seiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Paul Leased Housing Associates X, LLLP
Represented By: Olivia Moreland Cooper
Represented By: Matthew R McBride
Represented By: Thomas H Boyd
Represented By: Quin C. Seiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minneapolis Leased Housing Associates IV, Limited Partnership
Represented By: Olivia Moreland Cooper
Represented By: Matthew R McBride
Represented By: Thomas H Boyd
Represented By: Quin C. Seiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Paul Leased Housing Associates VIII, LLLP
Represented By: Olivia Moreland Cooper
Represented By: Matthew R McBride
Represented By: Thomas H Boyd
Represented By: Quin C. Seiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spring Lake Park Leased Housing Associates I, LLC
Represented By: Olivia Moreland Cooper
Represented By: Matthew R McBride
Represented By: Thomas H Boyd
Represented By: Quin C. Seiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minnetonka Leased Housing Associates II, LLC
Represented By: Olivia Moreland Cooper
Represented By: Matthew R McBride
Represented By: Thomas H Boyd
Represented By: Quin C. Seiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Anthony Leased Housing Development II, LLC
Represented By: Olivia Moreland Cooper
Represented By: Matthew R McBride
Represented By: Thomas H Boyd
Represented By: Quin C. Seiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexington Leased Housing Development I, LLC
Represented By: Olivia Moreland Cooper
Represented By: Matthew R McBride
Represented By: Thomas H Boyd
Represented By: Quin C. Seiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minneapolis Leased Housing Associates IX, LLC
Represented By: Olivia Moreland Cooper
Represented By: Matthew R McBride
Represented By: Thomas H Boyd
Represented By: Quin C. Seiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Paul Leased Housing Associates X, LLC
Represented By: Olivia Moreland Cooper
Represented By: Matthew R McBride
Represented By: Thomas H Boyd
Represented By: Quin C. Seiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woodbury Leased Housing Associates II, LLC
Represented By: Olivia Moreland Cooper
Represented By: Matthew R McBride
Represented By: Thomas H Boyd
Represented By: Quin C. Seiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woodbury Leased Housing Development II, LLC
Represented By: Olivia Moreland Cooper
Represented By: Matthew R McBride
Represented By: Thomas H Boyd
Represented By: Quin C. Seiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Anthony Leased Housing Associates II, LLC
Represented By: Olivia Moreland Cooper
Represented By: Matthew R McBride
Represented By: Thomas H Boyd
Represented By: Quin C. Seiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Noel
Represented By: Margaret Louise Kaplan
Represented By: James W Poradek
Represented By: Rachel Cardwell
Represented By: Michael F Cockson
Represented By: Craig S Coleman
Represented By: Evelyn Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Lees
Represented By: Margaret Louise Kaplan
Represented By: James W Poradek
Represented By: Rachel Cardwell
Represented By: Michael F Cockson
Represented By: Craig S Coleman
Represented By: Evelyn Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Lawrence
Represented By: Margaret Louise Kaplan
Represented By: James W Poradek
Represented By: Rachel Cardwell
Represented By: Michael F Cockson
Represented By: Craig S Coleman
Represented By: Evelyn Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharifah Doyle-El
Represented By: Margaret Louise Kaplan
Represented By: James W Poradek
Represented By: Rachel Cardwell
Represented By: Michael F Cockson
Represented By: Craig S Coleman
Represented By: Evelyn Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Illiff
Represented By: Margaret Louise Kaplan
Represented By: James W Poradek
Represented By: Rachel Cardwell
Represented By: Michael F Cockson
Represented By: Craig S Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Cobb
Represented By: Margaret Louise Kaplan
Represented By: James W Poradek
Represented By: Rachel Cardwell
Represented By: Michael F Cockson
Represented By: Craig S Coleman
Represented By: Evelyn Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gwenneth Larson
Represented By: Margaret Louise Kaplan
Represented By: James W Poradek
Represented By: Rachel Cardwell
Represented By: Michael F Cockson
Represented By: Craig S Coleman
Represented By: Evelyn Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Home Line
Represented By: Margaret Louise Kaplan
Represented By: James W Poradek
Represented By: Rachel Cardwell
Represented By: Michael F Cockson
Represented By: Craig S Coleman
Represented By: Evelyn Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Johnson
Represented By: Margaret Louise Kaplan
Represented By: James W Poradek
Represented By: Rachel Cardwell
Represented By: Michael F Cockson
Represented By: Craig S Coleman
Represented By: Evelyn Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Iliff
Represented By: Margaret Louise Kaplan
Represented By: James W Poradek
Represented By: Rachel Cardwell
Represented By: Michael F Cockson
Represented By: Craig S Coleman
Represented By: Evelyn Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?