Beeman Berry Farm, LLC v. Bayer Cropscience LP et al
Plaintiff: Beeman Berry Farm, LLC
Defendant: Corteva, Inc., Federated Co-Operatives Ltd., Bayer Cropscience LP, Cargill Incorporated, BASF Corporation, Tenkoz, Inc., Nutrien AG Solutions Inc., CHS Inc., Growmark Inc., Simplot AB Retail Sub, Inc., Bayer Cropscience, Inc., Winfield Solutions, LLC, Univar Solutions, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Growmark FS, LLC and Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2021cv00719
Filed: March 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Michael J Davis
Referring Judge: Tony N Leung
2 Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2021 Filing 68 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE:Case transferred from Minnesota has been opened in Eastern District of Missouri as case 4:21-cv-00747, filed 06/23/2021. (kt)
June 22, 2021 Filing 67 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE: This case has been transferred/extracted to the Eastern District of Missouri. (MMP)
June 22, 2021 Filing 66 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) transferring case to the Eastern District of Missouri per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to the Honorable Sarah E. Pitlyk.(MMP)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 65 TEXT-ONLY ORDER in Response to #64 Letter to Magistrate Judge. With the permission of presiding District Judge Michael J. Davis, and in response to #64 the parties' letter reflecting their agreement and intention that Defendant Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc. was to be added as a defendant in this matter with the filing of the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint, the Clerk of Court is directed to add Defendant Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc. as a defendant in this matter. This matter remains stayed pursuant to #59 the May 5, 2021 Order of Judge Davis staying all proceedings and deadlines, including but not limited to the filing of additional motions. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 5/26/2021.(EB)
May 25, 2021 Filing 64 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Beeman Berry Farm, LLC . (McSweeney, Rhett)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #56 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Adam C. Hemlock for BASF Corporation.; granting #57 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney David J. Lender for BASF Corporation.; granting #58 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Lara Bach for BASF Corporation. Approved by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 5/6/2021. (JGK)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #53 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Kathy Osborn for CHS Inc.. Approved by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 5/6/2021. (JGK)
May 5, 2021 Filing 61 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant Simplot AB Retail Sub, Inc.. (Dufresne, Andrew)
May 5, 2021 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Thomas Dufresne on behalf of Simplot AB Retail Sub, Inc.. (Dufresne, Andrew)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER STAYING CASE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: All proceedings and deadlines in the above-captioned cases are STAYED until ten days after the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation determines whether to transfer these actions to an MDL proceeding and completes any transfer of the action pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407. See In re Crop Inputs Antitrust Litig., MDL No. 2993. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 5/5/2021.Associated Cases: 0:21-cv-00351-MJD-TNL et al.(GRR)
May 5, 2021 Filing 58 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Lara Bach. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8729592 filed by BASF Corporation. (Fee, Mary)
May 5, 2021 Filing 57 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David Lender. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8729583 filed by BASF Corporation. (Fee, Mary)
May 5, 2021 Filing 56 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Adam Hemlock. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8729562 filed by BASF Corporation. (Fee, Mary)
May 5, 2021 Filing 55 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant Nutrien AG Solutions Inc.. (Westerman, Luke)
May 5, 2021 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Luke Westerman on behalf of Nutrien AG Solutions Inc.. (Westerman, Luke)
May 5, 2021 Filing 53 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kathy L. Osborn. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8728911 filed by CHS Inc.. (Chow, Emily)
May 5, 2021 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter J Schwingler on behalf of Univar Solutions, Inc.. (Schwingler, Peter)
May 5, 2021 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon M. Woodruff on behalf of Univar Solutions, Inc.. (Woodruff, Jon)
May 5, 2021 Filing 50 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Syngenta Corporation. (Long, James)
May 4, 2021 Filing 49 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant BASF Corporation. (Wind, Todd)
May 4, 2021 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd A Wind on behalf of BASF Corporation. (Wind, Todd)
May 4, 2021 Filing 47 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - INCORRECT CASE - REFILED - NOTICE of Appearance by Todd A Wind on behalf of BASF Corporation. (Wind, Todd) Modified text on 5/5/2021 (MMP).
May 4, 2021 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Fee on behalf of BASF Corporation. (Fee, Mary)
May 4, 2021 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Jevon Bindman on behalf of Syngenta Corporation. (Bindman, Jevon)
April 30, 2021 Filing 44 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #43 Stipulation. (Stilson, Jaime)
April 30, 2021 Filing 43 STIPULATION re Pretrial Order No. 1 by Growmark FS, LLC, Growmark Inc.. Jointly Signed by All parties. (Stilson, Jaime)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER in Response to (47 in 0:21-cv-00543-MJD-TNL) Letter to District Judge, (25 in 0:21-cv-00970-MJD-TNL) Letter to District Judge, (24 in 0:21-cv-00996-MJD-TNL) Letter to District Judge, (40 in 0:21-cv-00681-MJD-TNL) Letter to District Judge, (40 in 0:21-cv-00719-MJD-TNL) Letter to District Judge, (63 in 0:21-cv-00433-MJD-TNL) Letter to District Judge, (92 in 0:21-cv-00351-MJD-TNL) Letter to District Judge, (45 in 0:21-cv-00404-MJD-TNL) Letter to District Judge, (41 in 0:21-cv-00685-MJD-TNL) Letter to District Judge, (58 in 0:21-cv-00475-MJD-TNL) Letter to District Judge, (48 in 0:21-cv-00462-MJD-TNL) Letter to District Judge, (44 in 0:21-cv-00639-MJD-TNL) Letter to District Judge. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. Plaintiffs may file a letter response to Defendants' letter by Monday, May 2, 2021. 2. If the parties are unable to agree on the scheduling or procedure governing the anticipated omnibus motion to transfer and the status of the pending individual motions to transfer venue, the parties shall direct those disagreements to Magistrate Judge Leung for a ruling. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 4/30/2021.Associated Cases: 0:21-cv-00351-MJD-TNL et al.(GRR)
April 29, 2021 Filing 41 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Tenkoz, Inc.. (Hashmall, David)
April 28, 2021 Filing 40 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Bayer Cropscience LP, Bayer Cropscience, Inc. Regarding Venue Motions. (Jensen, Richard)
April 28, 2021 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by David L Hashmall on behalf of Tenkoz, Inc.. (Hashmall, David)
April 28, 2021 Filing 38 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - WILL REFILE - RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant Winfield Solutions, LLC. (Miesen, Jonathan) Modified text on 4/28/2021 (MMP).
April 28, 2021 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan C Miesen on behalf of Winfield Solutions, LLC. (Miesen, Jonathan)
April 27, 2021 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Davida Sheri McGhee on behalf of Cargill Incorporated. (McGhee, Davida)
April 27, 2021 Filing 35 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Cargill Incorporated. (Zhao, X.)
April 27, 2021 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by X. Kevin Zhao on behalf of Cargill Incorporated. (Zhao, X.)
April 26, 2021 Filing 33 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Corteva, Inc.. (Vehrs, Karla)
April 26, 2021 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Karla M Vehrs on behalf of Corteva, Inc.. (Vehrs, Karla)
April 26, 2021 Filing 31 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant CHS Inc.. (Chow, Emily)
April 26, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Elizabeth Chow on behalf of CHS Inc.. (Chow, Emily)
April 21, 2021 Filing 29 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. filed by Beeman Berry Farm, LLC. No summons requested. (Mencel, Jonathan)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #26 Motion. See Order for additional details and deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 4/20/2021. (EB)
April 19, 2021 Filing 27 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re TO SET RESPONSE DEADLINES AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE. (Stilson, Jaime)
April 19, 2021 Filing 26 Joint MOTION TO SET RESPONSE DEADLINES AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE filed by Growmark FS, LLC, Growmark Inc.. (Stilson, Jaime)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 4/6/2021. (EB)
April 5, 2021 Filing 24 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Growmark FS, LLC on 04/05/2021 by Beeman Berry Farm, LLC. Waiver of Service due by 5/5/2021. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of the Service of Summons, #2 Certificate of Service)(Mencel, Jonathan)
April 5, 2021 Filing 23 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Winfield Solutions, LLC on 04/02/2021 by Beeman Berry Farm, LLC. Waiver of Service due by 5/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of the Service of Summons, #2 Certificate of Service)(Mencel, Jonathan)
April 5, 2021 Filing 22 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Univar Solutions, Inc. on 04/02/2021 by Beeman Berry Farm, LLC. Waiver of Service due by 5/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of the Service of Summons, #2 Certificate of Service)(Mencel, Jonathan)
April 5, 2021 Filing 21 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Tenkoz, Inc. on 04/02/2021 by Beeman Berry Farm, LLC. Waiver of Service due by 5/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of the Service of Summons, #2 Certificate of Service)(Mencel, Jonathan)
April 5, 2021 Filing 20 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Syngenta Corporation on 04/02/2021 by Beeman Berry Farm, LLC. Waiver of Service due by 5/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of the Service of Summons, #2 Certificate of Service)(Mencel, Jonathan)
April 5, 2021 Filing 19 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Simplot AB Retail Sub, Inc. on 04/02/2021 by Beeman Berry Farm, LLC. Waiver of Service due by 5/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of the Service of Summons, #2 Certificate of Service)(Mencel, Jonathan)
April 5, 2021 Filing 18 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Nutrien AG Solutions Inc. on 04/02/2021 by Beeman Berry Farm, LLC. Waiver of Service due by 5/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of the Service of Summons, #2 Certificate of Service)(Mencel, Jonathan)
April 5, 2021 Filing 17 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Growmark Inc. on 04/02/2021 by Beeman Berry Farm, LLC. Waiver of Service due by 5/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of the Service of Summons, #2 Certificate of Service)(Mencel, Jonathan)
April 5, 2021 Filing 16 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Corteva, Inc. on 04/02/2021 by Beeman Berry Farm, LLC. Waiver of Service due by 5/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of the Service of Summons, #2 Certificate of Service)(Mencel, Jonathan)
April 5, 2021 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to CHS Inc. on 04/02/2021 by Beeman Berry Farm, LLC. Waiver of Service due by 5/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of the Service of Summons, #2 Certificate of Service)(Mencel, Jonathan)
April 5, 2021 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Cargill, Inc. on 04/02/2021 by Beeman Berry Farm, LLC. Waiver of Service due by 5/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of the Service of Summons, #2 Certificate of Service)(Mencel, Jonathan)
April 5, 2021 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Bayer CropScience, Inc. on 04/02/2021 by Beeman Berry Farm, LLC. Waiver of Service due by 5/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of the Service of Summons, #2 Certificate of Service)(Mencel, Jonathan)
April 5, 2021 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Bayer CropScience LP on 04/02/2021 by Beeman Berry Farm, LLC. Waiver of Service due by 5/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of the Service of Summons, #2 Certificate of Service)(Mencel, Jonathan)
April 5, 2021 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to BASF Corporation on 04/02/2021 by Beeman Berry Farm, LLC. Waiver of Service due by 5/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of the Service of Summons, #2 Certificate of Service)(Mencel, Jonathan)
April 2, 2021 Filing 10 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #9 Motion for Extension of Time (General). (Stilson, Jaime)
April 2, 2021 Filing 9 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time filed by Growmark FS, LLC, Growmark Inc.. (Stilson, Jaime)
March 31, 2021 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Federated Co-Operatives Ltd.. (Hulse, Benjamin)
March 23, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin W Hulse on behalf of Federated Co-Operatives Ltd.. (Hulse, Benjamin)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES. This case is reassigned to Judge Michael J. Davis for all further proceedings. Judge Patrick J. Schiltz no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 21-cv-719 (MJD/TNL). Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis and Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 3/22/2021.(MMP)
March 18, 2021 Filing 5 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing William G. Caldes, Jeffrey J. Corrigan, Icee N. Etheridge, Mark K. Wasvary, Brian P. Murray, Lee Albert, Steven A. Kramer, Jonathan M. Jagher, David P. McLafferty as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (MMG)
March 17, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to BASF Corporation, Bayer Cropscience LP, Bayer Cropscience, Inc., CHS Inc., Cargill Incorporated, Corteva, Inc., Federated Co-Operatives Ltd., Growmark FS, LLC, Growmark Inc., Nutrien AG Solutions Inc., Simplot AB Retail Sub, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Tenkoz, Inc., Univar Solutions, Inc., Winfield Solutions, LLC. (MMG)
March 17, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to BASF Corporation, Bayer Cropscience LP, Bayer Cropscience, Inc., CHS Inc., Cargill Incorporated, Corteva, Inc., Federated Co-Operatives Ltd., Growmark FS, LLC, Growmark Inc., Nutrien AG Solutions Inc., Simplot AB Retail Sub, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Tenkoz, Inc., Univar Solutions, Inc., Winfield Solutions, LLC. (MMG)
March 17, 2021 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 21-cv-719 PJS/TNL. (MMG)
March 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BASF Corporation, Bayer Cropscience LP, Bayer Cropscience, Inc., CHS Inc., Cargill Incorporated, Corteva, Inc., Federated Co-Operatives Ltd., Growmark FS, LLC, Growmark Inc., Nutrien AG Solutions Inc., Simplot AB Retail Sub, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Tenkoz, Inc., Univar Solutions, Inc., Winfield Solutions, LLC (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8605306) filed by Beeman Berry Farm, LLC. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (McSweeney, Rhett)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beeman Berry Farm, LLC v. Bayer Cropscience LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corteva, Inc.
Represented By: Karla M Vehrs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federated Co-Operatives Ltd.
Represented By: Benjamin W Hulse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Cropscience LP
Represented By: Richard G Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cargill Incorporated
Represented By: X. Kevin Zhao
Represented By: Davida Sheri McGhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASF Corporation
Represented By: Mary Fee
Represented By: Lara Bach
Represented By: Todd A Wind
Represented By: David J. Lender
Represented By: Adam C. Hemlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tenkoz, Inc.
Represented By: Brandon J. Wheeler
Represented By: David L Hashmall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nutrien AG Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Luke Westerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHS Inc.
Represented By: Kathy Osborn
Represented By: Emily Elizabeth Chow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Growmark Inc.
Represented By: Michael A Lindsay
Represented By: Jaime Stilson
Represented By: F Matthew Ralph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simplot AB Retail Sub, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Thomas Dufresne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Cropscience, Inc.
Represented By: Richard G Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winfield Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan C Miesen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Univar Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Jon M. Woodruff
Represented By: Peter J Schwingler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syngenta Corporation
Represented By: Jevon Bindman
Represented By: James J Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Growmark FS, LLC
Represented By: Michael A Lindsay
Represented By: Jaime Stilson
Represented By: F Matthew Ralph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beeman Berry Farm, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan R Mencel
Represented By: Rhett A McSweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?