Dango Products, LLC v. Muradin et al
Plaintiff: Dango Products, LLC
Defendant: Free Trail, John Doe, Blue Planet Inc, Neverland Motor, Muradin, Haycover, Jexicase, Bando and Evcing
Case Number: 0:2021cv00901
Filed: March 31, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2021 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dango Products, LLC (Schwie, Wesley)
May 21, 2021 Filing 10 EXHIBIT 1 re #8 AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Dango Products, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 2, #2 Exhibit(s) 3, #3 Exhibit(s) 4, #4 Exhibit(s) 5, #5 Exhibit(s) 6, #6 Exhibit(s) 7, #7 Exhibit(s) 8, #8 Exhibit(s) 9, #9 Exhibit(s) 10, #10 Exhibit(s) 11, #11 Exhibit(s) 12, #12 Exhibit(s) 13, #13 Exhibit(s) 14, #14 Exhibit(s) 15, #15 Exhibit(s) 16, #16 Exhibit(s) 17, #17 Exhibit(s) 18, #18 Exhibit(s) 19, #19 Exhibit(s) 20, #20 Exhibit(s) 21, #21 Exhibit(s) 22, #22 Exhibit(s) 23)(Schwie, Wesley) Modified text on 5/24/2021 (kt).
May 21, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Bando, Blue Planet Inc, John Doe, Evcing, Free Trail, Haycover, Jexicase, Muradin, Neverland Motor. (lmb)
May 20, 2021 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Muradin, Blue Planet Inc., Free Trail, Haycare, Jexicase, Neverland Motor, Evcing, Bando, John Doe Entities, filed by Dango Products, LLC. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 24, #2 Exhibit(s) 25, #3 Exhibit(s) 26) (Schwie, Wesley) Modified text on 5/21/2021 (lmb). Modified text on 5/21/2021 (lmb).
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint and for Service in Lieu of Original Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 5/14/2021. (LNP)
May 13, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings filed by Dango Products, LLC. (Schwie, Wesley)
May 13, 2021 Filing 5 PROPOSED AMENDED COMPLAINT-SEE ORDER #7 . against All Defendants. filed by Dango Products, LLC. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 24, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 25, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 26) (Schwie, Wesley) Modified text on 5/17/2021 (MMG).
April 2, 2021 Filing 4 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have been recently revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (LNP)
April 1, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Blue Planet Inc, John Doe, Free Trail, Haycover, Jexicase, Muradin, Neverland Motor. (MMP)
April 1, 2021 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 3rd 4th Patent list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 21-cv-901 (ECT/HB). (MMP)
March 31, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Blue Planet Inc, Free Trail, Haycover, Jexicase, John Doe Entities 1-50, Muradin, Neverland Motor (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8651917) filed by Dango Products, LLC. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23Exhibit 23, #24 Civil Cover Sheet) (Schwie, Wesley) Modified text on 3/31/2021 (MMP).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dango Products, LLC v. Muradin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dango Products, LLC
Represented By: Wesley Schwie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Free Trail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Planet Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neverland Motor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Muradin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haycover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jexicase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bando
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evcing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?