Itasca Images, LLC v. Caveo Insurance Agency LLC et al
Plaintiff: Itasca Images, LLC
Defendant: Kimberly Lynn Torell, Caveo Insurance Agency, LLC and Caveo Insurance Agency LLC
Case Number: 0:2021cv01032
Filed: April 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Tony N Leung
Referring Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2021 Filing 17 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Itasca Images, LLC. Jointly Signed by Defendants Caveo Insurance Agency, LLC and Kimberly Lynn Torell.(Flaherty, Scott)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 (Text-Only) ORDER/NOTICE TO ATTORNEY. In recognition of the current efforts locally and nationally to protect persons from unnecessary potential exposure to COVID-19, the Pretrial Scheduling Conference in this case will be held by telephone. A call-in number will be provided by the Court. The parties are not required to conduct any applicable meet and confers in person. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 6/7/2021. (HAM)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE OF AND ORDER FOR PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 7/7/2021 at 10:00 AM in Judge's Chambers 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 5/27/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (HAM)
May 27, 2021 Filing 14 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendants Caveo Insurance Agency LLC, Kimberly Lynn Torell. (Erffmeyer, Steven)
May 27, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Caveo Insurance Agency LLC, Kimberly Lynn Torell. (Erffmeyer, Steven)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER on #10 Stipulation. Defendants are granted an extension through May 28, 2021, to answer and/or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 5/13/2021. (HAM)
May 13, 2021 Filing 11 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #10 Stipulation. (Erffmeyer, Steven)
May 13, 2021 Filing 10 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Extending Time to Respond by Caveo Insurance Agency LLC, Kimberly Lynn Torell. Jointly Signed by Itasca Images, LLC. (Erffmeyer, Steven)
May 13, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven J Erffmeyer on behalf of All Defendants. (Erffmeyer, Steven)
May 13, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Colby B Lund on behalf of All Defendants. (Lund, Colby)
April 27, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Itasca Images, LLC re #5 Summons Issued, #3 Report on Filing of Copyright Action (AO 121), #2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement, #1 Complaint, on Kimberly Lynn Torrell, individually (Flaherty, Scott)
April 27, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Itasca Images, LLC re #5 Summons Issued, #3 Report on Filing of Copyright Action (AO 121), #2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement, #1 Complaint, on Kimberly Lynn Torrell, President of Caveo Insurance Agency (Flaherty, Scott)
April 23, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Caveo Insurance Agency LLC, Kimberly Lynn Torell. (KDS)
April 23, 2021 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per Civil (3rd, 4th - Copyright, Trademark) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 21-cv-1032 SRN/TNL. (KDS)
April 22, 2021 Filing 3 REPORT ON FILING OF COPYRIGHT ACTION (The Clerk's Office will mail a copy of the AO 121 and the Complaint to the U.S Copyright Office.). cc: U.S. Copyright Office.(Flaherty, Scott) Modified text on 4/23/2021 (CLK).
April 22, 2021 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff Itasca Images, LLC. (Flaherty, Scott)
April 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Caveo Insurance Agency, LLC, Kimberly Lynn Torell (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8699148) filed by Itasca Images, LLC. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Flaherty, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Itasca Images, LLC v. Caveo Insurance Agency LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Lynn Torell
Represented By: Steven J Erffmeyer
Represented By: Colby B Lund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caveo Insurance Agency, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caveo Insurance Agency LLC
Represented By: Steven J Erffmeyer
Represented By: Colby B Lund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Itasca Images, LLC
Represented By: Scott M Flaherty
Represented By: O. Joseph Balthazor, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?