Evans v. Business Development Sales, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sheila Evans
Defendant: BDS Laundry Commercial Solutions, BDS Laundry Management Company doing business as BDS Laundry and Business Development Sales, Inc. doing business as BDS Laundry Systems
Case Number: 0:2021cv01046
Filed: April 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 6/17/2021.(LNP)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #17 Stipulation. (Nodes, Jennifer)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION for Protective Order by BDS Laundry Commercial Solutions, BDS Laundry Management Company, Business Development Sales, Inc. Jointly signed by Sheila Evans. (Nodes, Jennifer) Modified text on 6/17/2021 (CLK).
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 8/5/2021 at 09:45 AM by Telephone Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Joint update letter due no later than 8/2/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 8/27/2021. Fact Discovery due by 3/25/2022. Expert Discovery due by 7/15/2022. Motions (non-disp) due 4/15/2022. Motions (disp) due by 7/15/2022. Ready for trial due by 11/15/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 5/27/2021.(LNP)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Text Only Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer: Pretrial Scheduling Conference held on 5/27/2021 by Conference Bridge. Discussion of pretrial deadlines and early settlement. Pretrial Scheduling Order to be issued. TIME: 2:15-3:17 PM. Counsel for Plaintiff: Elizabeth Binczik, Nicholas G B May. Counsel for Defendants: Jennifer A. Nodes. (LNP)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Sheila Evans. Jointly Signed by Sheila Evans, Business Development Sales, Inc. d/b/a BDS Laundry Systems, BDS Laundry Management Company d/b/a BDS Laundry, and BDS Laundry Commercial Solutions.(May, Nicholas)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 First Amended Complaint filed by BDS Laundry Commercial Solutions, BDS Laundry Management Company, Business Development Sales, Inc. (Nodes, Jennifer) Modified link on 5/14/2021 (lmb).
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AMENDED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sheila Evans. BDS Laundry Commercial Solutions served on 4/7/2021; BDS Laundry Management Company served on 4/7/2021. (May, Nicholas)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AMENDED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sheila Evans. Business Development Sales, Inc. served on 4/7/2021. (May, Nicholas)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sheila Evans. Business Development Sales, Inc. served on 4/2/2021, answer due 4/23/2021. (May, Nicholas)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. filed by Sheila Evans. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Certificate of Service) (May, Nicholas) Modified text on 4/28/2021 (CLK).
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8708702) filed by Sheila Evans. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (May, Nicholas) Modified text on 4/28/2021 (CLK).
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/20/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 5/27/2021 at 02:15 PM, by Telephone Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 4/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(LNP)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have been recently revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (LNP)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per Civil (3rd/4th Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 21-cv-01046 SRN/HB. (MTP)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendants BDS Laundry Commercial Solutions, BDS Laundry Management Company d/b/a BDS Laundry, Business Development Sales, Inc. d/b/a BDS Laundry Systems. (Nodes, Jennifer)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ANSWER to #1 Complaint First Amended Complaint filed by BDS Laundry Commercial Solutions, BDS Laundry Management Company, Business Development Sales, Inc. (Nodes, Jennifer) Modified text/link on 5/14/2021 (lmb).
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from State of Minnesota District Court, County of Dakota First Judicial District (filing fee $402, receipt number AMNDC-8702926) filed by Business Development Sales, Inc., BDS Laundry Commercial Solutions, BDS Laundry Management Company. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit(s) State Court Notice of Removal with Ex 1, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Nodes, Jennifer) Modified text on 5/14/2021 (lmb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans v. Business Development Sales, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BDS Laundry Commercial Solutions
Represented By: Jennifer A Nodes
Represented By: Jessica M Marsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BDS Laundry Management Company doing business as BDS Laundry
Represented By: Jennifer A Nodes
Represented By: Jessica M Marsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Business Development Sales, Inc. doing business as BDS Laundry Systems
Represented By: Jennifer A Nodes
Represented By: Jessica M Marsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Evans
Represented By: Elizabeth Binczik
Represented By: Nicholas G B May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?