Geographic Location Innovations, LLC v. Evereve Incorporated
Plaintiff: Geographic Location Innovations LLC and Geographic Location Innovations, LLC
Defendant: Evereve Incorporated
Case Number: 0:2021cv01048
Filed: April 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2021 Filing 16 REPORT ON DETERMINATION OF PATENT/TRADEMARK ACTION (AO 120)(USPTO noticed with filing.) (lmb)
June 8, 2021 Filing 15 REPORT ON FILING OF PATENT/TRADEMARK ACTION (AO 120)(USPTO noticed with filing). (Robbennolt, Paul)
June 7, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Geographic Location Innovations, LLC (Robbennolt, Paul)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Unopposed Motion to Extend Defendant's Deadline to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Evereve Incorporated answer due 6/18/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 5/10/2021. (LNP)
May 7, 2021 Filing 12 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #11 Motion for Extension of Time (General). (Conner, Clint)
May 7, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to Move, Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint (UNOPPOSED) filed by Evereve Incorporated. (Conner, Clint) Modified event type on 5/10/2021 (LNP).
May 7, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Clint Conner on behalf of Evereve Incorporated. (Conner, Clint)
May 3, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Geographic Location Innovations, LLC. Evereve Incorporated served on 4/28/2021, answer due 5/19/2021. (Padmanabhan, Devan)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jay Brett Johnson for Geographic Location Innovations, LLC. Approved by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 4/30/2021. (NAH)
April 29, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jay Johnson. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8713577 filed by Geographic Location Innovations, LLC. (Padmanabhan, Devan)
April 27, 2021 Filing 6 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have been recently revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (LNP)
April 26, 2021 Filing 5 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
April 26, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Evereve Incorporated. (MMP)
April 23, 2021 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 3rd 4th Patent list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 21-cv-1048 (WMW/HB). (MMP)
April 23, 2021 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Plaintiff Geographic Location Innovations LLC. (Robbennolt, Paul)
April 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Evereve Incorporated (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8703157) filed by Geographic Location Innovations LLC. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A (U.S,. Patent No. 7,917,285), #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Robbennolt, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Geographic Location Innovations, LLC v. Evereve Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evereve Incorporated
Represented By: Clint Conner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geographic Location Innovations LLC
Represented By: Paul J Robbennolt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geographic Location Innovations, LLC
Represented By: Devan V Padmanabhan
Represented By: Jay Brett Johnson
Represented By: Paul J Robbennolt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?