ionLake, LLC v. CellTrust Corporation
Plaintiff: ionLake, LLC
Defendant: CellTrust Corporation
Case Number: 0:2021cv01069
Filed: April 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Tony N Leung
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Niles, Donald)
May 26, 2021 Filing 10 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES. This case is reassigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright and Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung for all further proceedings. Judge Eric C. Tostrud, Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 21-cv-1069 WMW/TNL. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 5/24/2021. Signed by Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 5/25/2021.(MMG)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Richard E. Oney for CellTrust Corporation. Approved by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 5/21/2021. (NAH)
May 20, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Richard E. Oney. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8766258 filed by CellTrust Corporation. (Hansen, Loren)
May 17, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by ionLake, LLC. CellTrust Corporation waiver sent on 4/27/2021, answer due 6/28/2021. (Niles, Donald)
April 27, 2021 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff ionLake, LLC. (Niles, Donald)
April 27, 2021 Filing 4 REPORT ON FILING OF PATENT/TRADEMARK ACTION (AO 120)(USPTO noticed with filing). (Niles, Donald)
April 27, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to CellTrust Corporation. (lmb)
April 27, 2021 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per Civil (3rd, 4th - Patent) list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 21-cv-1069 (ECT/DTS). (lmb)
April 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CellTrust Corporation (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8706873) filed by ionLake, LLC. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Christensen, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ionLake, LLC v. CellTrust Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CellTrust Corporation
Represented By: Loren L Hansen
Represented By: Richard E. Oney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ionLake, LLC
Represented By: Douglas J Christensen
Represented By: Donald W Niles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?