United Natural Foods, Inc. et al v. Teamsters Local 120
Plaintiff: Supervalu, Inc., United Natural Foods, Inc. and Supervalu Inc.
Defendant: Teamsters Local 120
Case Number: 0:2021cv01174
Filed: May 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2021 Filing 46 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #30 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Supervalu Inc., United Natural Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Lipschultz, Noah)
June 25, 2021 Filing 45 TRANSCRIPT of Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction held on 5/19/2021 before Judge Nancy E. Brasel. (39 pages). Court Reporter: Tim Willette. For a copy of the transcript, please file a Transcript Request under Other Filings/Other Documents.Parties have 7 days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. In accordance with Judicial Conference policy and #Local Rule 80.1, the transcript may be released and made remotely electronically available to the public in 90 days. For further information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5 and #Case Information >Transcripts, Court Reporters and Digital Audio Recordings. Notice Intent/No Intent to Request Redactions due 7/2/2021. Redaction Request due 7/16/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/26/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/23/2021. (TJW)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING the unopposed #39 motion that the amended complaint does not moot or require the filing of a second motion to dismiss by the defendant and that plaintiff may have up until 7/1/21 to file its response to the defendant's motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 7/23/2021. (KMW)
June 23, 2021 Filing 43 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United Natural Foods, Inc., Supervalu Inc.. Teamsters Local 120 served on 6/23/2021, answer due 7/14/2021. (Lipschultz, Noah)
June 22, 2021 Filing 42 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Teamsters Local 120 . (Perillo, Frederick)
June 22, 2021 Filing 41 Summons Issued as to Teamsters Local 120. (MKB)
June 21, 2021 Filing 40 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #39 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, filed by Supervalu, Inc., United Natural Foods, Inc..(Lipschultz, Noah)
June 21, 2021 Filing 39 MOTION UNFIS MOTION FOR FINDINGS (1) THAT AMENDED COMPLAINT DOES NOT MOOT OR REQUIRE FILING OF SECOND DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS, AND (2) FOR UNFI TO HAVE UNTIL JULY 1, 2021 (10 DAYS AFTER FILING AMENDED COMPLAINT) TO FILE ITS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Supervalu, Inc., United Natural Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B)(Lipschultz, Noah)
June 21, 2021 Filing 38 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Teamsters Local 120. filed by United Natural Foods, Inc., Supervalu, Inc.. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C) (Lipschultz, Noah)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #35 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Frederick Perillo for Teamsters Local 120; granting #36 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Amanda Marie Brunt for Teamsters Local 120. Approved by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 6/7/2021. (NAH)
June 3, 2021 Filing 36 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Amanda Brunt. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8796434 filed by Teamsters Local 120. (Joseph, Katrina)
June 3, 2021 Filing 35 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Frederick Perillo. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8796430 filed by Teamsters Local 120. (Joseph, Katrina)
June 3, 2021 Filing 34 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #30 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Teamsters Local 120.(Joseph, Katrina)
June 2, 2021 Filing 33 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #30 Motion to Dismiss/General. (Joseph, Katrina)
June 2, 2021 Filing 32 MEMORANDUM in Support re #30 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Teamsters Local 120. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Joseph, Katrina)
June 2, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #30 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 8/2/2021 at 10:00 AM in Video Conference (no courtroom) before Judge Nancy E. Brasel. (Joseph, Katrina)
June 2, 2021 Filing 30 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Teamsters Local 120. (Joseph, Katrina)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 5/26/2021. (SMD)
May 26, 2021 Filing 28 SURETY BOND in the amount of $10,000.00 posted by United Natural Foods, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (KNK) Modified text on 5/26/2021 (KNK).
May 25, 2021 Filing 27 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for a 30-Day Transcript of #22 Motion Hearing, to Court Reporter Tim Willette. (Lipschultz, Noah)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #14 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Wonho J. Lee for Supervalu, Inc. and for United Natural Foods, Inc. Approved by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 5/21/2021. (NAH)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Shane O'Halloran for Supervalu, Inc. and for United Natural Foods, Inc. Approved by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 5/20/2021. (NAH)
May 19, 2021 Filing 24 (Text-Only) NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS. A Status Conference is scheduled for 5/27/21 at 9:30 a.m. before Judge Nancy Brasel by video conference. The parties shall receive a video conference link for this meeting. (KMW)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Based on all the files, records, and proceedings herein, the motion is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 5/19/2021. (KMW)
May 19, 2021 Filing 22 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nancy E. Brasel: Motion Hearing held on 5/19/2021 re #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction to Maintain the Status Quo and Stay Arbitration - Expedited Handling Requested filed by United Natural Foods, Inc., Supervalu, Inc. The motion was moved, argued and taken under advisement. The Court will issue orders on this matter. (Court Reporter Tim Willette) (KMW)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Philip Andrew Miscimarra for Supervalu, Inc. and for United Natural Foods, Inc. Approved by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 5/19/2021. (NAH)
May 18, 2021 Filing 20 Second Declaration of Philip A. Miscimarra in Support of #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction to Maintain the Status Quo and Stay Arbitration - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Supervalu, Inc., United Natural Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1-6)(Lipschultz, Noah)
May 18, 2021 Filing 19 REPLY re #17 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction to Maintain the Status Quo and Stay Arbitration - Expedited Handling Requested, #8 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #9 Declaration in Support, filed by Supervalu, Inc., United Natural Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Lipschultz, Noah)
May 17, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Katrina E Joseph on behalf of Teamsters Local 120. (Joseph, Katrina)
May 17, 2021 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction to Maintain the Status Quo and Stay Arbitration - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Teamsters Local 120. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Joseph, Katrina)
May 14, 2021 Filing 16 (Text-Only) NOTICE: Remote Public Access to #15 Motion Hearing on 5/19/2021 at 12:30 PM.To join the telephonic hearing, dial 1 669 254 5252. Use access code 161 875 3313 and security code 462331104. (KMW)
May 14, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction to Maintain the Status Quo and Stay Arbitration - Expedited Handling Requested : Motion Hearing set for 5/19/2021 at 12:30 PM before Judge Nancy E. Brasel. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Lipschultz, Noah) Modified text on 5/14/2021 (KMW).
May 14, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney W. John Lee. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8751224 filed by Supervalu, Inc., United Natural Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Lipschultz, Noah)
May 14, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Shane C. O'Halloran. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8751213 filed by Supervalu, Inc., United Natural Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Lipschultz, Noah)
May 13, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Philip A. Miscimarra. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8750574 filed by Supervalu, Inc., United Natural Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Lipschultz, Noah)
May 13, 2021 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Supervalu, Inc., United Natural Foods, Inc. re #10 Proposed Order to Judge - Other, #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction to Maintain the Status Quo and Stay Arbitration - Expedited Handling Requested, #8 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #9 Declaration in Support, (Lipschultz, Noah)
May 13, 2021 Filing 10 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction to Maintain the Status Quo and Stay Arbitration #7 Motion for TRO, #8 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #9 Declaration in Support,. (Lipschultz, Noah)
May 13, 2021 Filing 9 Declaration of Philip A. Miscimarra in Support of #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction to Maintain the Status Quo and Stay Arbitration - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Supervalu, Inc., United Natural Foods, Inc..(Lipschultz, Noah)
May 13, 2021 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction to Maintain the Status Quo and Stay Arbitration - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Supervalu, Inc., United Natural Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Lipschultz, Noah)
May 13, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction to Maintain the Status Quo and Stay Arbitration - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Supervalu, Inc., United Natural Foods, Inc.. (Lipschultz, Noah)
May 13, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United Natural Foods, Inc., Supervalu, Inc.. Teamsters Local 120 served on 5/12/2021, answer due 6/2/2021. (Lipschultz, Noah)
May 7, 2021 Filing 5 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Philip A. Miscimarra, W. John Lee as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (KNK)
May 7, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Teamsters Local 120. (KNK)
May 7, 2021 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per 3rd, 4th - Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 21-cv-1174 (NEB/ECW). (KNK)
May 7, 2021 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Plaintiffs Supervalu, Inc., United Natural Foods, Inc.. (Lipschultz, Noah)
May 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Teamsters Local 120 (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8735056) filed by United Natural Foods, Inc., Supervalu, Inc.. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Lipschultz, Noah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United Natural Foods, Inc. et al v. Teamsters Local 120
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Supervalu, Inc.
Represented By: Noah G Lipschultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Natural Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Noah G Lipschultz
Represented By: Philip Andrew Miscimarra
Represented By: Shane O'Halloran
Represented By: Wonho J. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Supervalu Inc.
Represented By: Noah G Lipschultz
Represented By: Philip Andrew Miscimarra
Represented By: Shane O'Halloran
Represented By: Wonho J. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teamsters Local 120
Represented By: Amanda Marie Brunt
Represented By: Frederick Perillo
Represented By: Katrina E Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?