SECURA Insurance Company v. Deere & Company
Plaintiff: SECURA Insurance Company and SECURA Insurance Company as subrogee of Molitor Equipment, LLC doing business as Molitor Brothers Farm
Defendant: Deere & Company
Case Number: 0:2021cv01200
Filed: May 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Becky R Thorson
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER/NOTICE: Pretrial Conference set for 7/26/2021 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 7/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)Associated Cases: 0:21-cv-01200-ECT-BRT, 0:21-cv-01199-ECT-BRT(MSK)
June 30, 2021 Filing 26 Letter re: withdrawal of motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss/General Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Partially Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint from Ryan C. McCarthy. (Mattson, Timothy)
June 29, 2021 Filing 25 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #20 MOTION to Dismiss/General Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Partially Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Deere & Company.(Mattson, Timothy)
June 29, 2021 Filing 24 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #20 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Deere & Company.(Mattson, Timothy)
June 29, 2021 Filing 23 Declaration of Timothy J. Mattson in Support of #20 MOTION to Dismiss/General Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Partially Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Deere & Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Mattson, Timothy)
June 29, 2021 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Support re #20 MOTION to Dismiss/General Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Partially Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Deere & Company. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Mattson, Timothy)
June 29, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #20 MOTION to Dismiss/General Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Partially Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 8/23/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3B (STP) before Judge Eric C. Tostrud. (Mattson, Timothy)
June 29, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss/General Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Partially Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Deere & Company. (Mattson, Timothy)
June 24, 2021 Filing 19 DECLARATION of David J. Taylor in Opposition to #5 MOTION to Dismiss/General Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Partially Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by SECURA Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Taylor, David)
June 24, 2021 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss/General Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Partially Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by SECURA Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Taylor, David)
June 15, 2021 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Deere & Company. filed by SECURA Insurance Company. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C) (Taylor, David)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER on #14 Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 6/15/2021.(MSK)
June 14, 2021 Filing 15 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #14 Stipulation. (Taylor, David)
June 14, 2021 Filing 14 STIPULATION to Amend Plaintiff's Complaint by SECURA Insurance Company. Jointly Signed by Deere & Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-C)(Taylor, David) Modified text on 6/15/2021 (MMP).
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES. This Case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 21-cv-1200 (ECT/BRT). Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings Signed by Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 6/8/2021.(MKB)
June 8, 2021 Filing 12 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff SECURA Insurance Company. (Taylor, David)
June 3, 2021 Filing 11 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Deere & Company. (Mattson, Timothy)
June 3, 2021 Filing 10 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #5 MOTION to Dismiss/General Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Partially Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Deere & Company.(Mattson, Timothy)
June 3, 2021 Filing 9 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #5 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Deere & Company.(Mattson, Timothy)
June 3, 2021 Filing 8 Declaration of Timothy J. Mattson in Support of #5 MOTION to Dismiss/General Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Partially Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Deere & Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Mattson, Timothy)
June 3, 2021 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss/General Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Partially Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Deere & Company. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Mattson, Timothy)
June 3, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #5 MOTION to Dismiss/General Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Partially Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 8/23/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3B (STP) before Judge Eric C. Tostrud. (Mattson, Timothy)
June 3, 2021 Filing 5 WITHDRAWN PER #26 LETTER DATED 6/30/21 - MOTION to Dismiss/General Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Partially Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Deere & Company. (Mattson, Timothy) Modified text on 6/30/2021 (MMP).
May 14, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SECURA Insurance Company. Deere & Company served on 5/14/2021, answer due 6/4/2021. (Taylor, David)
May 12, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Deere & Company. (MKB)
May 12, 2021 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 21-cv-1200 (ECT/TNL). (MKB)
May 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Deere & Company (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8745048) filed by SECURA Insurance Company. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-C, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Taylor, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SECURA Insurance Company v. Deere & Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deere & Company
Represented By: Ryan McCarthy
Represented By: Timothy J Mattson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SECURA Insurance Company
Represented By: David J Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SECURA Insurance Company as subrogee of Molitor Equipment, LLC doing business as Molitor Brothers Farm
Represented By: David J Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?