Retire Young, Inc. et al v. Fiserv, Inc.
Plaintiff: Retire Young, Inc., Kevin Young and Retire Young, Inc. doing business as Online Trading Academy Minneapolis
Defendant: Fiserv, Inc. and Fiserv, Inc. doing business as CardConnect
Case Number: 0:2021cv01224
Filed: May 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER on #16 Stipulation. The Plaintiff's response to the motion to dismiss is due on 7/28/21. The reply shall be due on 8/11/21. Signed by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 7/9/2021.(KMW)
July 8, 2021 Filing 17 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #16 Stipulation. (Moss, Carol)
July 8, 2021 Filing 16 STIPULATION to Amend Briefing Schedule by Retire Young, Inc., Kevin Young. Jointly Signed by Fiserv, Inc., d/b/a CardConnect. (Moss, Carol)
June 23, 2021 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Fiserv, Inc. re #14 Proposed Order to Judge, #12 Meet and Confer Statement, #13 Notice of Hearing on Motion, #10 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiffs' Complaint, #11 Memorandum in Support of Motion, (Knapp, Christopher)
June 23, 2021 Filing 14 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #10 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Fiserv, Inc..(Knapp, Christopher)
June 23, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #10 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiffs' Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 9/15/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3A (STP) before Judge Nancy E. Brasel. (Knapp, Christopher)
June 23, 2021 Filing 12 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #10 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Fiserv, Inc..(Knapp, Christopher)
June 23, 2021 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Fiserv, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate, #2 Exhibit(s) Merchant Application and Agreement, #3 Exhibit(s) Merchant Services Program Terms and Conditions, #4 Exhibit(s) Confirmation Page)(Knapp, Christopher)
June 23, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Fiserv, Inc.. (Knapp, Christopher)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (Text-Only) ORDER granting #7 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Fiserv, Inc. answer due 6/23/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 6/10/2021. (KAT)
June 9, 2021 Filing 8 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #7 Stipulation. (Knapp, Christopher)
June 9, 2021 Filing 7 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Fiserv, Inc.. Jointly Signed by Retire Young, Inc. and Kevin Young. (Knapp, Christopher)
June 9, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J Knapp on behalf of Fiserv, Inc.. (Knapp, Christopher)
May 21, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Retire Young, Inc.. Fiserv, Inc. served on 5/19/2021, answer due 6/9/2021. (Herman, Katherine)
May 17, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Fiserv, Inc. (lmb)
May 17, 2021 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 21-cv-1224 (NEB/KMM). (lmb)
May 14, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint, filed by Fiserv, Inc. filed by Retire Young, Inc., Kevin Young. (Moss, Carol)
May 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Fiserv, Inc. (filing fee $402, receipt number AMNDC-8753235) filed by Retire Young, Inc., Kevin Young. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - CardConnect Ltr to Retire Young, Inc., #2 Exhibit B - Security Rules Ch 11) (Moss, Carol) Modified text on 5/17/2021 (lmb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Retire Young, Inc. et al v. Fiserv, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Retire Young, Inc.
Represented By: Carol R M Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Young
Represented By: Carol R M Moss
Represented By: Katherine Herman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Retire Young, Inc. doing business as Online Trading Academy Minneapolis
Represented By: Carol R M Moss
Represented By: Katherine Herman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fiserv, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fiserv, Inc. doing business as CardConnect
Represented By: Christopher J Knapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?