Stanhope et al v. Kokron et al
Plaintiff: Phyllis Wood Lasher and Jack Stanhope
Defendant: Janet Kokron and Gary Kokron
Case Number: 0:2021cv01263
Filed: May 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2021 Filing 29 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Gary Kokron, Janet Kokron. Jointly Signed by Jack Stanhope and Phyllis Wood-Lasher.(Fullerton, Ryan)
July 28, 2021 Filing 28 Joint STATEMENT OF CASE as to All Defendants. (Fullerton, Ryan)
July 19, 2021 Filing 27 AFFIDAVIT of Janet Kokron in OPPOSITION TO #17 Motion to Appoint Receiver filed by Gary Kokron, Janet Kokron. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-D)(Fullerton, Ryan)
July 19, 2021 Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 Motion to Appoint Receiver filed by Gary Kokron, Janet Kokron. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Fullerton, Ryan)
July 12, 2021 Filing 25 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiffs Jack Stanhope, Phyllis Wood Lasher. (Fish, Alan)
July 12, 2021 Filing 24 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #17 Motion to Appoint Receiver filed by Jack Stanhope, Phyllis Wood Lasher.(Fish, Alan) Modified text on 7/12/2021 (lmb).
July 12, 2021 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT of Phyllis Woods-Lasher in SUPPORT OF #17 Motion to Appoint Receiver filed by Jack Stanhope, Phyllis Wood Lasher. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit(s) A)(Fish, Alan) Modified text on 7/12/2021 (lmb).
July 12, 2021 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT of Jack Stanhope in SUPPORT OF #17 Motion to Appoint Receiver filed by Jack Stanhope, Phyllis Wood Lasher. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit(s) A)(Fish, Alan) Modified text on 7/12/2021 (lmb).
July 12, 2021 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT of Alan B. Fish in SUPPORT OF #17 Motion to Appoint Receiver filed by Jack Stanhope, Phyllis Wood Lasher. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 Exhibit(s) B, #4 Exhibit(s) C)(Fish, Alan) Modified text on 7/12/2021 (lmb).
July 12, 2021 Filing 20 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #17 Motion to Appoint Receiverfiled by Jack Stanhope, Phyllis Wood Lasher. (Fish, Alan) Modified text on 7/12/2021 (lmb).
July 12, 2021 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Support re #17 Motion to Appoint Receiver filed by Jack Stanhope, Phyllis Wood Lasher. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Fish, Alan) Modified text on 7/12/2021 (lmb).
July 12, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #17 Motion to Appoint Receiver: Motion Hearing set for 9/15/2021 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (FF) before Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. (Fish, Alan) Modified text on 7/12/2021 (lmb).
July 12, 2021 Filing 17 Motion to Appoint Receiver filed by Jack Stanhope, Phyllis Wood Lasher. (Fish, Alan) Modified text/event on 7/12/2021 (lmb).
July 9, 2021 Filing 16 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-NOT SIGNED BY ALL PARTIES. Joint Consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge with appeal to 8th Circuit. (Fish, Alan) Modified text on 7/12/2021 (lmb).
July 9, 2021 Filing 15 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-NOT SIGNED BY ALL PARTIES. Joint Consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge with appeal to 8th Circuit. (Fish, Alan) Modified text on 7/12/2021 (lmb).
July 8, 2021 Filing 14 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. DUPLICATE FILING OF DOC. NO. 13. PROPOSED CONSENT DECREE TO JUDGE. (Fish, Alan) Modified text on 7/9/2021 (KNK).
July 8, 2021 Filing 13 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR, TO BE REFILED. PROPOSED CONSENT DECREE TO JUDGE. (Fish, Alan) Modified text on 7/9/2021 (KNK).
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER WHILE DISTRICT OF MINNESOTA IS UNDER GENERAL ORDER RELATED TO COVID-19: See Notice and Order for document submission deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 6/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(JLB)
June 30, 2021 Filing 11 Plaintiffs' REPLY to Counterclaim of Defendant Gary Kokron filed by Phyllis Wood Lasher. (Fish, Alan)
June 30, 2021 Filing 10 Plaintiffs' REPLY to Counterclaim of Defendant Gary Kokron filed by Jack Stanhope. (Fish, Alan)
June 22, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs. filed by Gary Kokron. (Fullerton, Ryan)
May 28, 2021 Filing 8 Answer to Counterclaim filed by Jack Stanhope. (Fish, Alan) Modified text on 6/1/2021 (JME).
May 25, 2021 Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER that #5 MOTION to Appoint Receiver filed by Plaintiff Phyllis Wood Lasher, Plaintiff Jack Stanhope is/are not properly before this court and therefore denied without prejudice. In order to be considered, any motion previously filed in state court must be refiled in compliance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of this District. Orders entered by the state court prior to removal remain in effect. Approved by the Court on 5/25/2021. (CLK)
May 21, 2021 Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE re #5 Motion to Appoint Receiver is a copy of a document filed in Lake of the Woods County District Court. (CLK) Modified text on 5/25/2021 (CLK).
May 21, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Receiver filed by Jack Stanhope, Phyllis Wood Lasher. (CLK)
May 21, 2021 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim per Civil (6th - Stockholder Suits) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 21-cv-1263 JRT/LIB. (CLK)
May 21, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs. filed by Janet Kokron. (Fullerton, Ryan)
May 21, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by Jack Stanhope, Phyllis Wood Lasher filed by Janet Kokron. (Fullerton, Ryan)
May 21, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ninth Judicial District Court for Lake of the Woods County, case number 39-CV-21-74 (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8769630) filed by Janet Kokron. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit(s) Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit(s) Notice of Motion & Motion, #4 Exhibit(s) Proposed Order, #5 Exhibit(s) Brief, #6 Exhibit(s) Affidavit of Phyllis Wood-Lasher, #7 Exhibit(s) Affidavit of Alan Fish, #8 Exhibit(s) Affidavit of Jack Stanhope, #9 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, ATTACHMENT FILED IN ERROR - WILL REFILE - #10 Civil Cover Sheet) (Fullerton, Ryan) Modified text on 5/21/2021 (MMP).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stanhope et al v. Kokron et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Kokron
Represented By: Ryan Fullerton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Kokron
Represented By: Ryan Fullerton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phyllis Wood Lasher
Represented By: Alan B Fish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Stanhope
Represented By: Alan B Fish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?