CAIR Foundation, Inc. v. Saroya
Plaintiff: CAIR Foundation, Inc. doing business as Council on American-Islamic Relations doing business as CAIR
Defendant: Asma Lori Haidri Saroya, Lori Haidri, Lori Saroya, L.H., Lori Haidri-Saroya and Asma Saroya
Case Number: 0:2021cv01267
Filed: May 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Tony N Leung
Referring Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2021 Filing 80 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung: Motion Hearing held on 12/7/2021 re #51 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff to Answer Interrogatories and #65 MOTION For Declaration that No Privilege Exists with Respect to a 2014 Report Provided by CAIR to Her, that Any Privilege Has Been Waived, or that She May Use the Report to Present Facts in the Report in Her Defense filed by Asma Lori Haidri Saroya. (Court Reporter Lynne Krenz) (EB)
December 1, 2021 Filing 81 LETTER TO THE COURT re Non-Party CAIR-MI's Motion to Quash Defendant's Subpoena Duces Tecum filed in the Eastern District of Michigan (Southern Division). (Attachments: #1 Motion to Quash filed in the Eastern District of Michigan, #2 Envelope)(kt)
December 1, 2021 Filing 79 JOINT MOTION REGARDING CONTINUED SEALING re #54 Memorandum in Support of Motion for an Order Compelling Plaintiff to Answer Interrogatories filed by Asma Lori Haidri Saroya. (Kerbaugh, Steven)
November 30, 2021 Filing 78 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Impracticable to Redact for #77 Sealed Document(s) - Sealed Memorandum in Opposition filed by CAIR Foundation, Inc..(Morgan, Cynthia)
November 30, 2021 Filing 77 SEALED MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #65 MOTION For Declaration that No Privilege Exists with Respect to a 2014 Report Provided by CAIR to Her, that Any Privilege Has Been Waived, or that She Ma Ues the Report to Present Facts in the Report in Her Defense filed by CAIR Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Morgan, Cynthia)
November 30, 2021 Filing 76 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Remote Public Access to Motion Hearing on 12/7/2021 at 3:30 PM on Defendant's #51 Motion for an Order Compelling Plaintiff to Answer Interrogatories and #65 Motion for Declaration That No Privilege Exists With Respect to a 2014 Report Provided by CAIR to Her, That Any Privilege Has Been Waived, or That She May Use the Report to Present Facts in the Report in Her Defense. Login information has been e-mailed to counsel.For members of the public, e-mail Leung_Chambers@mnd.uscourts.gov to obtain the dial-in instructions. (EB)
November 23, 2021 Filing 75 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #65 MOTION For Declaration that No Privilege Exists with Respect to a 2014 Report Provided by CAIR to Her, that Any Privilege Has Been Waived, or that She Ma Ues the Report to Present Facts in the Report in Her Defense filed by Asma Lori Haidri Saroya.(Kerbaugh, Steven)
November 23, 2021 Filing 74 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Impracticable to Redact for #73 Sealed Document(s) - #73 Sealed Declaration of Lori Saroya, [73--1] Sealed Exhibit A, [73-2] Sealed Exhibit B filed by Asma Lori Haidri Saroya.(Kerbaugh, Steven)
November 23, 2021 Filing 73 SEALED Declaration of Lori Saroya in Support of #65 MOTION For Declaration that No Privilege Exists with Respect to a 2014 Report Provided by CAIR to Her, that Any Privilege Has Been Waived, or that She Ma Ues the Report to Present Facts in the Report in Her Defense filed by Lori Saroya. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit B)(Kerbaugh, Steven)
November 23, 2021 Filing 72 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Impracticable to Redact for #71 Sealed Document(s) - #71 Sealed Exhibit 1, [71-1] Sealed Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Steven C. Kerbaugh filed by Asma Lori Haidri Saroya.(Kerbaugh, Steven)
November 23, 2021 Filing 71 SEALED EXHIBIT Sealed Exhibit 1 re #70 Declaration in Support, filed by Lori Saroya. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit 2)(Kerbaugh, Steven)
November 23, 2021 Filing 70 Declaration of Steven C. Kerbaugh in Support of #65 MOTION For Declaration that No Privilege Exists with Respect to a 2014 Report Provided by CAIR to Her, that Any Privilege Has Been Waived, or that She Ma Ues the Report to Present Facts in the Report in Her Defense filed by Asma Lori Haidri Saroya.(Kerbaugh, Steven)
November 23, 2021 Filing 69 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Impracticable to Redact for #68 Sealed Document(s) - #68 Memorandum in Support filed by Asma Lori Haidri Saroya.(Kerbaugh, Steven)
November 23, 2021 Filing 68 SEALED MEMORANDUM in Support re #65 MOTION For Declaration that No Privilege Exists with Respect to a 2014 Report Provided by CAIR to Her, that Any Privilege Has Been Waived, or that She Ma Ues the Report to Present Facts in the Report in Her Defense filed by Lori Saroya. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Kerbaugh, Steven)
November 23, 2021 Filing 67 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #65 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, filed by Asma Lori Haidri Saroya.(Kerbaugh, Steven)
November 23, 2021 Filing 66 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #65 MOTION For Declaration that No Privilege Exists with Respect to a 2014 Report Provided by CAIR to Her, that Any Privilege Has Been Waived, or that She Ma Ues the Report to Present Facts in the Report in Her Defense : Motion Hearing set for 12/7/2021 at 03:30 PM in Video Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. (Kerbaugh, Steven)
November 23, 2021 Filing 65 MOTION For Declaration that No Privilege Exists with Respect to a 2014 Report Provided by CAIR to Her, that Any Privilege Has Been Waived, or that She Ma Ues the Report to Present Facts in the Report in Her Defense filed by Asma Lori Haidri Saroya. (Kerbaugh, Steven)
November 19, 2021 Filing 64 Reply to Response to Motion re #27 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Asma Lori Haidri Saroya. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Kerbaugh, Steven)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 (Text-Only) ORDER granting #49 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Kelsey Marron for Asma Lori Haidri Saroya. Approved by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 11/16/2021. (JGK)
November 15, 2021 Filing 62 JOINT MOTION REGARDING CONTINUED SEALING re #40 Statement instead of Redacted Document - Entire Document Confidential/Impracticable to Redact, #39 Exhibit, #36 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #37 Redacted Document, #43 Statement instead of Redacted Document - Entire Document Confidential/Impracticable to Redact,, #41 Declaration in Support, #42 Redacted Document filed by Asma Lori Haidri Saroya. (Kerbaugh, Steven)
November 10, 2021 Filing 61 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #51 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff to Answer Interrogatories filed by CAIR Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Morgan, Cynthia)
November 9, 2021 Filing 60 (Text-Only) NOTICE of Cancelation & Resetting of Hearing: The hearing on #27 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings is now set for 12/13/2021 at 9:30 AM via Video Conference (no courtroom) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. Notice to Public: Please visit our website at #https://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/court-schedules for audio connection information for this hearing. Note that hearings might not appear on the court schedule or courthouse kiosk until one week before the hearing date.(SMD)
November 5, 2021 Filing 59 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #27 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by CAIR Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate Certificate of Compliance)(Morgan, Cynthia)
November 4, 2021 Filing 58 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung: Motion Hearing held on 11/4/2021 re #33 MOTION to Compel filed by Asma Lori Haidri Saroya. (Court Reporter Renee Rogge) (EB)
November 3, 2021 Filing 57 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #51 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff to Answer Interrogatories filed by Asma Lori Haidri Saroya.(Kerbaugh, Steven)
November 3, 2021 Filing 56 Declaration of Steven C. Kerbaugh in Support of #51 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff to Answer Interrogatories filed by Asma Lori Haidri Saroya. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 D)(Kerbaugh, Steven)
November 3, 2021 Filing 55 Redacted Document for #54 Defendant's Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Answer Interrogatories filed by Asma Lori Haidri Saroya. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Kerbaugh, Steven)
November 3, 2021 Filing 54 SEALED MEMORANDUM in Support re #51 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff to Answer Interrogatories filed by Lori Saroya. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Kerbaugh, Steven)
November 3, 2021 Filing 53 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #51 Motion to Compel filed by Asma Lori Haidri Saroya.(Kerbaugh, Steven)
November 3, 2021 Filing 52 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #51 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff to Answer Interrogatories : Motion Hearing set for 12/7/2021 at 03:30 PM in Video Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. (Kerbaugh, Steven)
November 3, 2021 Filing 51 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff to Answer Interrogatories filed by Asma Lori Haidri Saroya. (Kerbaugh, Steven)
November 3, 2021 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron David Sampsel on behalf of CAIR Foundation, Inc.. (Sampsel, Aaron)
November 1, 2021 Filing 49 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kelsey Marron. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9117062 filed by Asma Lori Haidri Saroya. (Kerbaugh, Steven)
October 29, 2021 Filing 48 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Remote Public Access to Motion Hearing on 11/4/2021 at 3:30 PM.Log-in information has been e-mailed to counsel.For members of the public, e-mail Leung_Chambers@mnd.uscourts.gov to obtain the dial-in instructions. (EB)
October 25, 2021 Filing 47 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #33 MOTION to Compel filed by CAIR Foundation, Inc..(Morgan, Cynthia)
October 25, 2021 Filing 46 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. REFILED AT #47 . MOTION to Compel filed by CAIR Foundation, Inc. (Morgan, Cynthia) Modified text on 10/26/2021 (CLK).
October 25, 2021 Filing 45 NOTICE of Resetting of Hearing: #34 Motion Hearing set for 11/1/2021 at 03:30 PM by Video Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on Defendant's #33 MOTION to Compel is continued to 11/4/2021 at 03:30 PM by Video Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Log-in information will be provided to counsel in advance of the hearing. (EB)
October 18, 2021 Filing 44 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #33 MOTION to Compel filed by Asma Lori Haidri Saroya.(Kerbaugh, Steven)
October 18, 2021 Filing 43 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Impracticable to Redact for #41 Sealed Document(s) - [41-1] Sealed Exhibit A, [41-2] Sealed Exhibit B, [41-3] Sealed Exhibit C, [41-4] Sealed Exhibit D, [41-5] Sealed Exhibit E, [41-6] Sealed Exhibit F, [41-7] Sealed Exhibit G, [41-8] Sealed Exhibit H, [41-9] Sealed Exhibit I, [41-10] Sealed Exhibit J, [41-11] Sealed Exhibit K, [41-12] Sealed Exhibit L, [41-13] Sealed Exhibit M, [41-14] Sealed Exhbiit N to Declaration of Lori Saroya filed by Asma Lori Haidri Saroya.(Kerbaugh, Steven)
October 18, 2021 Filing 42 Redacted Document for #41 Declaration of Lori Saroya filed by Asma Lori Haidri Saroya.(Kerbaugh, Steven)
October 18, 2021 Filing 41 SEALED Declaration of Lori Saroya in Support of #33 MOTION to Compel filed by Lori Saroya. (Attachments: #1 Sealed Exhibit A, #2 Sealed Exhibit B, #3 Sealed Exhibit C, #4 Sealed Exhibit D, #5 Sealed Exhibit E, #6 Sealed Exhibit F, #7 Sealed Exhibit G, #8 Sealed Exhibit H, #9 Sealed Exhibit I, #10 Sealed Exhibit J, #11 Sealed Exhibit K, #12 Sealed Exhibit L, #13 Sealed Exhibit M, #14 Sealed Exhibit N)(Kerbaugh, Steven)
October 18, 2021 Filing 40 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Impracticable to Redact for #39 Sealed Document(s) - Exhibit G to Declaration of Steven C. Kerbaugh filed by Asma Lori Haidri Saroya.(Kerbaugh, Steven)
October 18, 2021 Filing 39 SEALED EXHIBIT G re #38 Declaration in Support, filed by Lori Saroya.(Kerbaugh, Steven)
October 18, 2021 Filing 38 Declaration of Steven C. Kerbaugh in Support of #33 MOTION to Compel filed by Asma Lori Haidri Saroya. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F)(Kerbaugh, Steven)
October 18, 2021 Filing 37 Redacted Document for #36 Defendant's Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel filed by Asma Lori Haidri Saroya. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Kerbaugh, Steven)
October 18, 2021 Filing 36 SEALED MEMORANDUM in Support re #33 MOTION to Compel filed by Lori Saroya. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Kerbaugh, Steven)
October 18, 2021 Filing 35 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #33 Motion to Compel filed by Asma Lori Haidri Saroya.(Kerbaugh, Steven)
October 18, 2021 Filing 34 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #33 MOTION to Compel : Motion Hearing set for 11/1/2021 at 03:30 PM in Video Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. (Kerbaugh, Steven)
October 18, 2021 Filing 33 MOTION to Compel filed by Asma Lori Haidri Saroya. (Kerbaugh, Steven)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER in Response to #25 , #26 Letters to Magistrate Judge & PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 10/6/2021. (EB)
October 6, 2021 Filing 31 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #27 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Asma Lori Haidri Saroya.(Kerbaugh, Steven)
October 6, 2021 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM in Support re #27 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Asma Lori Haidri Saroya. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Kerbaugh, Steven)
October 6, 2021 Filing 29 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #27 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Asma Lori Haidri Saroya.(Kerbaugh, Steven)
October 6, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #27 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings : Motion Hearing set for 12/3/2021 at 09:30 AM via video conference (No Courtroom) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (Kerbaugh, Steven) Modified text on 10/6/2021 (SMD).
October 6, 2021 Filing 27 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Asma Lori Haidri Saroya. (Kerbaugh, Steven)
August 25, 2021 Filing 26 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by CAIR Foundation, Inc. regarding Protective Order. (Morgan, Cynthia)
August 25, 2021 Filing 25 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Asma Lori Haidri Saroya regarding proposed protective order language [ECF 24]. (Kerbaugh, Steven)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 TEXT-ONLY ORDER in Response to #22 Letter to Magistrate Judge. On or before August 25, 2021, the parties shall each submit a letter not to exceed three pages setting forth that party's reasoning for its proposed protective-order language. In addition to the letter, each party shall also e-mail a Word version of its proposed protective order to leung_chambers@mnd.uscourts.gov. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 8/19/2021. (EB)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 (Text-Only) BRIEFING ORDER. The Defendant's motion for partial judgment on the pleadings pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(c) is scheduled for a hearing on December 3, 2021 at 9:30 a.m. via video conference. Based on this hearing date, the Court adjusts the previously ordered briefing schedule as follows: Defendant shall file her motion on or before October 6, 2021. Plaintiff's response is due on or before November 5, 2021. Defendant may file her reply on or before November 19, 2021. Ordered by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 8/16/2021. (SMD)
August 13, 2021 Filing 22 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Asma Lori Haidri Saroya . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B)(Kerbaugh, Steven)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT-ONLY ORDER in Response to #20 Letter to Magistrate Judge. Defendant's request to file a motion for partial judgment on the pleadings pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(c) before the close of discovery is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties' proposed briefing schedule is APPROVED. Defendant shall file her motion on or before August 16, 2021. Per the parties' agreement, Plaintiff shall file its responsive memorandum within 30 days of the filing of Defendant's motion and Defendant may file her reply within 14 days of the filing of Plaintiff's responsive memorandum. The parties shall promptly contact the chambers of the Hon. Susan Richard Nelson, District Judge for the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota, to obtain a hearing date. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 8/11/2021. (EB)
August 6, 2021 Filing 20 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Asma Lori Haidri Saroya requesting permission to file a motion for partial judgment. (Kerbaugh, Steven)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Confidential Letter to Court due by 11/14/2022. Settlement Conference set for 11/21/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 7/29/2021. (HAM)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 5/1/2022. Fact Discovery due by 8/1/2022. Expert Discovery due by 12/15/2022. Motions (non-disp) due 8/1/2022. Motions (disp) due by 12/15/2022. Ready for trial due by 4/15/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 7/29/2021. (HAM)
July 29, 2021 Filing 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 7/29/2021. Pretrial scheduling order will be issued. (HAM)
July 28, 2021 Filing 16 (Text-Only) AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing: The Pretrial Conference is now set for 7/29/2021 at 1:30 PM, by Telephone Conference, before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. *TIME CHANGE ONLY.(HAM)
July 22, 2021 Filing 15 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Asma Lori Haidri Saroya. Jointly Signed by CAIR Foundation, Inc., d/b/a Council on American-Islamic Relations, & CAIR.(Kerbaugh, Steven)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Joseph Dominic Lipchitz, I for Asma Lori Haidri Saroya. Approved by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 7/12/2021. (NAH)
July 8, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Joseph D. Lipchitz. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8868324 filed by Asma Lori Haidri Saroya. (Kerbaugh, Steven)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jeffrey Scott Robbins for Asma Lori Haidri Saroya. Approved by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 6/30/2021. (NAH)
June 25, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jeffrey S. Robbins. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8844721 filed by Asma Lori Haidri Saroya. (Baudry, Alain)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (Text-Only) ORDER/NOTICE TO ATTORNEY. In recognition of the current efforts locally and nationally to protect persons from unnecessary potential exposure to COVID-19, the Pretrial Scheduling Conference in this case will be held by telephone. A call-in number will be provided by the Court. The parties are not required to conduct any applicable meet and confers in person. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 6/25/2021. (HAM)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Cynthia Morgan for CAIR Foundation, Inc..; granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Michael J. Fortunato for CAIR Foundation, Inc.. Approved by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 6/18/2021. (JGK)
June 14, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael J. Fortunato. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8816666 filed by CAIR Foundation, Inc.. (Christensen, Carl)
June 14, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Cynthia B. Morgan. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number BMNDC-8816519 filed by CAIR Foundation, Inc.. (Christensen, Carl)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF AND ORDER FOR PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 7/29/2021 at 10:00 AM in Judge's Chambers 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 6/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (HAM)
June 11, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Asma Lori Haidri Saroya. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1 , #2 Exhibit(s) 2 , #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Exhibit(s) 5, #6 Exhibit(s) 6, #7 Exhibit(s) 7, #8 Exhibit(s) 8) (Kerbaugh, Steven) Modified text on 6/17/2021 (MTP).
May 21, 2021 Filing 4 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Michael J. Fortunato, Cynthia B. Morgan as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (CLK)
May 21, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Asma Lori Haidri Saroya. (CLK)
May 21, 2021 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 21-cv-1267 SRN/TNL. (CLK)
May 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Asma Lori Haidri Saroya (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8769903) filed by CAIR Foundation, Inc.. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-Q, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Christensen, Carl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CAIR Foundation, Inc. v. Saroya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asma Lori Haidri Saroya
Represented By: Alain M Baudry
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Robbins
Represented By: Joseph Dominic Lipchitz, I
Represented By: Steven C Kerbaugh
Represented By: Kelsey Marron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Haidri
Represented By: Alain M Baudry
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Robbins
Represented By: Joseph Dominic Lipchitz, I
Represented By: Steven C Kerbaugh
Represented By: Kelsey Marron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Saroya
Represented By: Alain M Baudry
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Robbins
Represented By: Joseph Dominic Lipchitz, I
Represented By: Steven C Kerbaugh
Represented By: Kelsey Marron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L.H.
Represented By: Alain M Baudry
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Robbins
Represented By: Joseph Dominic Lipchitz, I
Represented By: Steven C Kerbaugh
Represented By: Kelsey Marron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Haidri-Saroya
Represented By: Alain M Baudry
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Robbins
Represented By: Joseph Dominic Lipchitz, I
Represented By: Steven C Kerbaugh
Represented By: Kelsey Marron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asma Saroya
Represented By: Alain M Baudry
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Robbins
Represented By: Joseph Dominic Lipchitz, I
Represented By: Steven C Kerbaugh
Represented By: Kelsey Marron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAIR Foundation, Inc. doing business as Council on American-Islamic Relations doing business as CAIR
Represented By: Carl E Christensen
Represented By: Cynthia Morgan
Represented By: Michael J. Fortunato
Represented By: Aaron David Sampsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?