Powerlift Door Consultants, Inc. v. Shepard et al
Plaintiff: Powerlift Door Consultants, Inc., a South Dakota Corporation and Powerlift Door Consultants, Inc.
Defendant: ABC Corporation, Rearden Steel Manufacturing LLC d/b/a Powerlift Hydraulic Doors of Florida, a Florida limited liability company, Lynn Shepard, Rearden Steel Inc. and Rearden Steel Manufacturing LLC doing business as Powerlift Hydraulic Doors of Florida, a Florida limited liability company
Case Number: 0:2021cv01316
Filed: June 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 (Text-Only) NOTICE to USCA of subsequent filing in a civil case, Re: Memorandum in Opposition to Motion #63 , Affidavit in Opposition to Motion #66 , Declaration in Opposition #64 , Response in Opposition to Motion #67 , Letter to District Judge #65 . (CLK)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 67 RESPONSE in Opposition re #42 MOTION for Contempt (Civil) filed by Lynn Shepard. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Ali, Jeffer)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 DECLARATION of Lynn Shepard in Support of Defendant's OPPOSITION TO #42 MOTION for Contempt (Civil) filed by Lynn Shepard.(Ali, Jeffer) Modified text on 7/29/2021 (KNK).
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 65 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Powerlift Door Consultants, Inc. Opposing Defendants' Request for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration. (Tchida, Bryant)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 DECLARATION of Richard E. Peterson in Opposition to #36 MOTION to Stay filed by Powerlift Door Consultants, Inc..(Tchida, Bryant)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #36 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal filed by Powerlift Door Consultants, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Tchida, Bryant)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 (Text-Only) NOTICE to USCA of subsequent filing in a civil case, Re: Notice of Appearance #61 , Notice of Appearance #59 , Notice of Appearance #60 , Letter to District Judge #57 , Notice of Appearance #58 . (KDS)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffer Ali, I on behalf of Lynn Shepard. (Ali, Jeffer)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffer Ali, I on behalf of Lynn Shepard. (Ali, Jeffer)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffer Ali, I on behalf of Lynn Shepard. (Ali, Jeffer)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffer Ali, I on behalf of Lynn Shepard. (Ali, Jeffer)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Lynn Shepard RE: Letter Request for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration. (Ali, Jeffer)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 (Text-Only) NOTICE to USCA of subsequent filing in a civil case, Re: Designation of Record on Appeal #55 . (CLK)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal by Lynn Shepard re #34 Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit, (Ali, Jeffer)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 (Text-Only) NOTICE to USCA of subsequent filing in a civil case, Re: Transcript #53 . (kt)
July 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 6/16/2021 before Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright. (32 pages). Court Reporter: Lori Simpson. For a copy of the transcript, please file a Transcript Request under Other Filings/Other Documents.Parties have 7 days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. In accordance with Judicial Conference policy and #Local Rule 80.1, the transcript may be released and made remotely electronically available to the public in 90 days. For further information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5 and #Case Information >Transcripts, Court Reporters and Digital Audio Recordings. Notice Intent/No Intent to Request Redactions due 8/2/2021. Redaction Request due 8/16/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/24/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/22/2021. (LAS)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 (Text-Only) NOTICE to USCA of subsequent filing in a civil case, Re: Motion for Contempt #42 , Declaration in Support #48 , Declaration in Support #46 , Meet and Confer Statement #45 , Memorandum in Support of Motion #38 , Proposed Order to Judge #41 , Notice of Hearing on Motion #43 , Transcript Request #50 , Motion to Stay #36 , Notice of Hearing on Motion #39 , Proposed Order to Judge #49 , Declaration in Support #47 , Memorandum in Support of Motion #44 , Meet and Confer Statement #40 . (CLK)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 USCA Case Number 21-2600 for #34 Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit, filed by Lynn Shepard. (MTP)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for a COPY OF TRANSCRIPT #27 Motion Hearing, to Court Reporter Lori Simpson. (Ali, Jeffer)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #42 MOTION for Contempt (Civil) filed by Powerlift Door Consultants, Inc..(Tchida, Bryant)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Declaration of Kelly C. Engebretson in Support of #42 MOTION for Contempt (Civil) filed by Powerlift Door Consultants, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1-5)(Tchida, Bryant)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Declaration of Amanda K. Bennett in Support of #42 MOTION for Contempt (Civil) filed by Powerlift Door Consultants, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1-6)(Tchida, Bryant)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Declaration of Richard E. Peterson in Support of #42 MOTION for Contempt (Civil) filed by Powerlift Door Consultants, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1-2)(Tchida, Bryant)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #42 Motion for Contempt filed by Powerlift Door Consultants, Inc..(Tchida, Bryant)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MEMORANDUM in Support re #42 MOTION for Contempt (Civil) filed by Powerlift Door Consultants, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Tchida, Bryant)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #42 MOTION for Contempt (Civil) : Date and time to be determined. (Tchida, Bryant)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MOTION for Contempt (Civil) filed by Powerlift Door Consultants, Inc.. (Tchida, Bryant)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #36 MOTION to Stay filed by Lynn Shepard.(Ali, Jeffer)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #36 Motion to Stay filed by Lynn Shepard.(Ali, Jeffer)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re #36 Motion to stay: Date and time to be determined. (Ali, Jeffer) Modified text on 7/22/2021 (CLK).
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MEMORANDUM in Support re #36 MOTION to Stay filed by Lynn Shepard. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Ali, Jeffer)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-WILL REFILE. NOTICE by Lynn Shepard (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Ali, Jeffer) Modified text on 7/21/2021 (MKB).
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MOTION to Stay filed by Lynn Shepard. EXHIBITS FILED IN ERROR-WILL REFILE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s))(Ali, Jeffer) Modified text on 7/21/2021 (MKB).
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 TRANSMITTAL OF APPEAL LETTER TO U. S. COURT OF APPEALS, 8TH CIRCUIT, Re: Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit, #34 . (CLK)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE OF APPEAL TO 8TH CIRCUIT as to #33 Judgment, #32 Order on Motion for TRO, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Order on Motion to Expedite by Lynn Shepard. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number AMNDC-8890250. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Appellants Information Form)(Ali, Jeffer)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Civil Notice - appeal)(CLK)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER. (See order for details) (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 7/12/2021. (RJE)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER/NOTICE: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/3/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 8/10/2021 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 7/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(TMA)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #28 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Evelina Gentry for Rearden Steel Inc., Rearden Steel Manufacturing LLC, and for Lynn Shepard. Approved by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 6/30/2021. (NAH)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint filed by Rearden Steel Inc., Rearden Steel Manufacturing LLC, Lynn Shepard. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Ali, Jeffer)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Evelina Gentry. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8836551 filed by Rearden Steel Inc., Rearden Steel Manufacturing LLC, Lynn Shepard. (Ali, Jeffer)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright: Motion Hearing held on 6/16/2021 re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION to Expedite filed by Powerlift Door Consultants, Inc. (Court Reporter Lori Simpson) (RJE)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Second Declaration of Amanda K. Bennett in Support of #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION to Expedite filed by Powerlift Door Consultants, Inc..(Tchida, Bryant)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 RESPONSE in Support re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION to Expedite filed by Powerlift Door Consultants, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Tchida, Bryant)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #20 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Thomas Pasternak for Rearden Steel Inc., Rearden Steel Manufacturing LLC, and for Lynn Shepard. Approved by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 6/10/2021. (NAH)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 DECLARATION of Lynn Shepard re #22 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Rearden Steel Inc., Rearden Steel Manufacturing LLC, Lynn Shepard . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A to Shepard Declaration, #2 Exhibit(s) B to Shepard Declaration)(Ali, Jeffer)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by Rearden Steel Inc., Rearden Steel Manufacturing LLC, Lynn Shepard. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Ali, Jeffer)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Edward Szymanski on behalf of Rearden Steel Inc., Rearden Steel Manufacturing LLC, Lynn Shepard. (Szymanski, Adam)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Thomas Gerard Pasternak. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8804877 filed by ABC Corporation, Rearden Steel Manufacturing LLC, Lynn Shepard. (Ali, Jeffer)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffer Ali, I on behalf of Rearden Steel Inc., Rearden Steel Manufacturing LLC, Lynn Shepard. (Ali, Jeffer)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Powerlift Door Consultants, Inc.. Rearden Steel Inc. served on 6/3/2021, answer due 6/24/2021; Rearden Steel Manufacturing LLC served on 6/3/2021, answer due 6/24/2021; Lynn Shepard served on 6/3/2021, answer due 6/24/2021. (Engebretson, Kelly)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Powerlift Door Consultants, Inc. re #1 Complaint, Exhibits 1-6 and Summons (Engebretson, Kelly)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Powerlift Door Consultants, Inc. re #15 Scheduling Order, (Tchida, Bryant)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 BRIEFING AND HEARING SCHEDULE ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND EXPEDITED DISCOVERY. (See order for dates and details). Motion Hearing is set for 06/16/21 at 01:00 PM in Telephone Conference (no courtroom) before Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright. Dial-in instructions will be sent to counsel via email. Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 6/4/2021.(SMP)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Powerlift Door Consultants, Inc. re #10 Declaration in Support,, #13 Proposed Order to Judge, #9 Declaration in Support, #8 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #12 Declaration in Support, #7 Notice of Hearing on Motion, #11 Declaration in Support, #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION to Expedite (Tchida, Bryant)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION to Expedite filed by Powerlift Door Consultants, Inc..(Tchida, Bryant)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Declaration of Kelly C. Engebretson in Support of #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION to Expedite filed by Powerlift Door Consultants, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4)(Tchida, Bryant)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Declaration of Bryant D. Tchida in Support of #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION to Expedite filed by Powerlift Door Consultants, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1)(Tchida, Bryant)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Declaration of Amanda K. Bennett in Support of #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION to Expedite filed by Powerlift Door Consultants, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Exhibit(s) 5, #6 Exhibit(s) 6, #7 Exhibit(s) 7, #8 Exhibit(s) 8, #9 Exhibit(s) 9)(Tchida, Bryant)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Declaration of Richard E. Peterson in Support of #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION to Expedite filed by Powerlift Door Consultants, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Exhibit(s) 5)(Tchida, Bryant)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION to Expedite filed by Powerlift Door Consultants, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Tchida, Bryant)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION to Expedite : Date and time to be determined. (Tchida, Bryant)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested, MOTION to Expedite filed by Powerlift Door Consultants, Inc.. (Tchida, Bryant)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REPORT ON FILING OF PATENT/TRADEMARK ACTION (AO 120)(USPTO noticed with filing). (Engebretson, Kelly)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to ABC Corporation, Rearden Steel Inc., Rearden Steel Manufacturing LLC, Lynn Shepard. (MTP)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per Civil (3rd/4th - Copyright, Trademark) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 21-cv-01316 WMW/ECW. (MTP)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8790887) filed by Powerlift Door Consultants, Inc., a South Dakota Corporation. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1-6 of Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Engebretson, Kelly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Powerlift Door Consultants, Inc. v. Shepard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rearden Steel Manufacturing LLC d/b/a Powerlift Hydraulic Doors of Florida, a Florida limited liability company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Shepard
Represented By: Adam Edward Szymanski
Represented By: Evelina Gentry
Represented By: Jeffer Ali, I
Represented By: Sarah M Stensland
Represented By: Thomas Pasternak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rearden Steel Inc.
Represented By: Adam Edward Szymanski
Represented By: Evelina Gentry
Represented By: Jeffer Ali, I
Represented By: Sarah M Stensland
Represented By: Thomas Pasternak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rearden Steel Manufacturing LLC doing business as Powerlift Hydraulic Doors of Florida, a Florida limited liability company
Represented By: Adam Edward Szymanski
Represented By: Evelina Gentry
Represented By: Jeffer Ali, I
Represented By: Sarah M Stensland
Represented By: Thomas Pasternak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Powerlift Door Consultants, Inc., a South Dakota Corporation
Represented By: Kelly C. Engebretson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Powerlift Door Consultants, Inc.
Represented By: Bryant D Tchida
Represented By: Kelly C. Engebretson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?