Guenther v. Williams
Petitioner: Dean Guenther
Respondent: Louis Williams, II
Case Number: 0:2021cv01328
Filed: June 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David T Schultz
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER that judgment be entered in this matter pursuant to the order of the United States District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin entered on June 2, 2021 28 . Signed by Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 6/17/2021.(RMM) Modified text on 6/17/2021 (kt). Modified text on 6/17/2021 (kt).
June 15, 2021 Filing 34 RESPONSE re #33 Order to Party File Document/Respond to Court filed by Louis Williams, II.(Kirkpatrick, Lisa)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 6/9/2021. (TJB) cc: Robert Meyers. Modified text on 6/9/2021 (lmb).
June 3, 2021 Filing 32 SEALED Notice of Related Cases by Louis Williams II. (Kirkpatrick, Lisa)
June 3, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE/SUBSTITUTION for Louis Williams, II. (Kirkpatrick, Lisa)
June 3, 2021 Filing 30 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Shelley M Fite; Leslie K. Herje as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (lmb) cc: Shelley M Fite; Leslie K. Herje
June 3, 2021 Filing 29 Case transferred in from District of Wisconsin Western; Case Number 3:17-cv-00231. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud from deck Civil (3rd, 4th - Prisoner) list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 21-cv-1328 (ECT/DTS).
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** The court's November 2, 2017 judgment is VACATED, petitioner Dean Guenther's petition for a writ of habeas corpus under 28 U.S.C. 2241 is GRANTED, and this case is transferred to the District of Minnesota for resentencing. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 6/2/2021. (kmd),(ps) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 6/3/2021.]
June 2, 2021 Filing 27 JUDGMENT from USCA reversing as to #18 Notice of Appeal filed by Dean Guenther. No record to be returned. (Attachments: #1 Mandate, #2 Appellate Opinion, #3 Forthwith Order) (kmd),(ps) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 6/3/2021.]
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER from USCA that the District Court add attorney Shelley M. Fite to their CM/ECF database for purposes of accessing District Court documents as to #18 Notice of Appeal filed by Dean Guenther (jef),(ps) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 6/3/2021.]
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 12/7/2017. (nln),(ps) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 6/3/2021.]
November 30, 2017 Filing 24 Court Reporter Certification of Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet re #18 Notice of Appeal. (jef),(ps) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 6/3/2021.]
November 30, 2017 Filing 23 Transcript Request Form by Petitioner Dean Guenther re #18 Notice of Appeal. (nln),(ps) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 6/3/2021.]
November 30, 2017 Filing 22 Inmate Account Statement by Petitioner Dean Guenther. (nln),(ps) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/6/2017: #1 Indigency Determination) (nln). [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 6/3/2021.]
November 30, 2017 Filing 21 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on Appeal by Petitioner Dean Guenther. (nln),(ps) (Attachment(s) added on 11/30/2017: #1 Envelope) (nln). [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 6/3/2021.]
November 27, 2017 USCA Case Number 17-3409 for #18 Notice of Appeal filed by Dean Guenther. (jef),(ps) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 6/3/2021.]
November 22, 2017 Filing 20 Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Docketing Statement, Docket Sheet and Judgment to Seventh Circuit Court of Appeals re #18 Notice of Appeal. (Attachments: #1 Docketing Statement, #2 Order, #3 Judgment, #4 Docket sheet) (jef),(ps) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 6/3/2021.]
November 22, 2017 Filing 19 Appeal Information Packet. (jef),(ps) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 6/3/2021.]
November 22, 2017 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Petitioner Dean Guenther as to #17 Judgment, #16 Order on Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Fee or motion for ifp due. Docketing Statement filed. (Attachments: #1 Docketing Statement, #2 Envelope) (jef),(ps) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 6/3/2021.]
November 2, 2017 Filing 17 JUDGMENT entered denying the petition of Dean Guenther for a petition for a writ of certiorari under 28 U.S.C. 2241. Signed by Peter A. Oppeneer, Clerk of Court on 11/2/2017. (jef),(ps) Modified on 6/2/2021 - Judgment is vacated per Dkt. 28. (kmd) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 6/3/2021.]
November 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying #1 petition for a writ of certiorari under 28 U.S.C. 2241. Petitioner is GRANTED a certificate of appealability. The clerk of court is directed to enter judgment and close this case. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 11/2/2017. (jef),(ps) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 6/3/2021.]
September 1, 2017 Filing 15 Letter from from petitioner requesting verification of receipt of signed reply brief. Docket sheet mailed to petitioner in response to this request. (Attachments: #1 Copy of dkt. #12 , #2 Envelope) (elc),(ps) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 6/3/2021.]
August 17, 2017 Filing 14 Signed #12 Brief in Reply filed by Dean Guenther (elc),(ps) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 6/3/2021.]
August 9, 2017 Filing 13 Letter from clerk's office returning #12 Brief in Reply to petitioner for signature. (elc),(ps) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 6/3/2021.]
August 9, 2017 Filing 12 Brief in Reply (unsigned) by Petitioner Dean Guenther in Support of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Signed copy at dkt. #12 . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Envelope) (elc),(ps) Modified on 8/17/2017 (elc). [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 6/3/2021.]
July 25, 2017 Filing 11 Exhibit to #7 Response to Habeas Petition, filed by Louis Williams, II. Exhibit 3 - 1992 First Degree Burglary Conviction. (Herje, Leslie),(ps) Modified on 7/26/2017: Unredacted. (lak) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 6/3/2021.]
July 25, 2017 Filing 10 Exhibit to #7 Response to Habeas Petition, filed by Louis Williams, II. Exhibit 2 - 1990 First Degree Burglary and Kidnapping Conviction. (Herje, Leslie),(ps) Modified on 7/26/2017: Unredacted. (lak) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 6/3/2021.]
July 25, 2017 Filing 9 Exhibit to #7 Response to Habeas Petition, filed by Louis Williams, II. Exhibit 1 - 1986 Second Degree Burglary Conviction. (Herje, Leslie),(ps) Modified on 7/26/2017: Unredacted. (lak) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 6/3/2021.]
July 25, 2017 Reset Briefing Deadlines as to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - Federal. Petitioner's Brief in Reply due 8/24/2017. (nln),(ps) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 6/3/2021.]
July 24, 2017 Filing 8 Exhibit 5 - Presenstence Investigation Report, to #7 Response to Habeas Petition, filed by Louis Williams, II. (Sealed Document) (Herje, Leslie),(ps) Modified on 7/25/2017. (lak) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 6/3/2021.]
July 24, 2017 Filing 7 Response to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - Federal by Respondent Louis Williams, II, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - See #9 ., #2 Exhibit 2 - See #10 ., #3 Exhibit 3 - See #11 ., #4 Exhibit 4 - Sentencing Transcript, 04-cr-476, #5 Certificate of Service) (Herje, Leslie),(ps) Modified on 7/25/2017: Exhibits 1, 2 and 3 are blank. (lak) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 6/3/2021.]
June 2, 2017 Filing 6 Certified Mail Receipt of #3 Order to Show Cause, sent to J. Sessions, Attorney General of the United States. (elc),(ps) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 6/3/2021.]
June 1, 2017 Filing 5 Certified Mail Return Receipt of #3 Order to Show Cause, sent to the Acting United States Attorney for the Western District of Wisconsin. (elc),(ps) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 6/3/2021.]
May 31, 2017 Filing 4 Certified Mail Receipt of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - Federal, #3 Order to Show Cause, sent to Warden Louis Williams. (Attachments: #1 U.S. attorney MN) (jef),(ps) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 6/3/2021.]
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order to Show Cause Issued. Materials delivered to Respondent via certified mail. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 5/22/2017. (jef),(ps) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/23/2017: #1 Certified mail receipts) (jef/skv/ls). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/25/2017: #2 Mail receipt as to wiwd U.S. atty.) (jef). [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 6/3/2021.]
March 28, 2017 Filing fee received: $ 5.00, receipt number 34690028574. (jef),(ps) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 6/3/2021.]
March 22, 2017 Filing 2 Brief in Support of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Petitioner Dean Guenther. (jef),(ps) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 6/3/2021.]
March 22, 2017 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - Federal, filed by Dean Guenther. (Case randomly assigned to District Judge Barbara B. Crabb.) (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (jef) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 6/3/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guenther v. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dean Guenther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Louis Williams, II
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Lisa D Kirkpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?