Worth et al v. Harrington et al
Plaintiff: Firearms Policy Coalition Inc., Axel Anderson, Austin Dye, Kristin Worth, Second Amendment Foundation, Minnesota Gun Owners Caucus and Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc.
Defendant: Troy Wolberson, Don Lorge, John Harrington, Dan Starry and Troy Wolbersen
Case Number: 0:2021cv01348
Filed: June 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT on #17 Stipulation. John Harrington answer due 8/13/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 7/13/2021.(JLB)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #17 Stipulation,. (Miltich, Cicely)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by John Harrington. Jointly Signed by Kristin Worth, Austin Dye, Axel Anderson, MN Gun Owners Caucus, 2d Amendment Foundation, and Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc.. (Miltich, Cicely)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Summons Returned Executed served on Dan Starry on 06/24/2021, answer due 7/15/21 filed by Kristin Worth. (Nelson, Blair) Modified text on 6/30/2021 (JME).
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Summons Returned Executed on John Harrington on 06/24/2021, answer due 7/15/21 filed by Kristin Worth. (Nelson, Blair) Modified text on 6/30/2021 (JME).
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Joint and Separate ANSWER to Complaint filed by Don Lorge, Dan Starry, Troy Wolbersen. (Anderson, Scott)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney David H. Thompson for Kristin Worth; granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Peter A. Patterson for Kristin Worth; granting #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney William V. Bergstrom for Kristin Worth. Approved by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 6/23/2021. (NAH)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed for Summons and Complaint served on Don Lorge on 06/09/2021, filed by Kristin Worth. Answer due 6/30/21. (Nelson, Blair) Modified text on 6/23/2021 (kt).
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AMENDED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kristin Worth. Troy Wolbersen served on 6/11/2021. Answer due 7/2/21. (Nelson, Blair) Modified text on 6/23/2021 (kt).
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney William V. Bergstrom. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8819537 filed by Kristin Worth. (Nelson, Blair)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Peter A. Patterson. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8819525 filed by Kristin Worth. (Nelson, Blair)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David H. Thompson. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8819482 filed by Kristin Worth. FILED IN ERROR: MOTION to Withdraw Admission. (Nelson, Blair). Modified text on 6/16/2021 (MTP).
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Troy Wolbersen. (MMP)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff Minnesota Gun Owners Caucus. (Nelson, Blair)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc.. (Nelson, Blair)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to John Harrington, Don Lorge, Dan Starry, Troy Wolberson. (MMP)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing David H. Thompson, Peter A. Patterson, William V. Bergstrom as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (MMP)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per 5th Division Civil Rights list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 21-cv-1348 (NEB/LIB). (MMP)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8802926) filed by Blair W. Nelson Ltd. Filer requests summons issued. ATTACHMENT FILED IN ERROR - WILL REFILE - (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), ATTACHMENT FILED IN ERROR - WILL REFILE -#2 Exhibit(s), ATTACHMENT FILED IN ERROR - WILL REFILE - #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Nelson, Blair) Modified text on 6/8/2021 (MMP).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Worth et al v. Harrington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Firearms Policy Coalition Inc.
Represented By: Blair W Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Axel Anderson
Represented By: Blair W Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Austin Dye
Represented By: Blair W Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristin Worth
Represented By: Blair W Nelson
Represented By: David H. Thompson
Represented By: Peter A. Patterson
Represented By: William V. Bergstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Second Amendment Foundation
Represented By: Blair W Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minnesota Gun Owners Caucus
Represented By: Blair W Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc.
Represented By: Blair W Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy Wolberson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Lorge
Represented By: Kristin C Nierengarten
Represented By: Scott T Anderson
Represented By: Zachary Cronen J Cronen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Harrington
Represented By: Cicely R Miltich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Starry
Represented By: Kristin C Nierengarten
Represented By: Scott T Anderson
Represented By: Zachary Cronen J Cronen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy Wolbersen
Represented By: Kristin C Nierengarten
Represented By: Scott T Anderson
Represented By: Zachary Cronen J Cronen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?