CellTrust Corporation v. ionLake, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: CellTrust Corporation
Defendant: Derrick Girard and ionLake, LLC
Case Number: 0:2021cv01354
Filed: June 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Nancy E Brasel
2 Judge: Tony N Leung
3 Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2021 Filing 30 JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Civil Notice - appeal)(MKB)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER FOR DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 12/8/2021. (RJE)
November 29, 2021 Filing 28 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #27 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Hansen, Loren)
November 29, 2021 Filing 27 STIPULATION of Dismissal /Voluntary Dismissal by CellTrust Corporation. Jointly Signed by IonLake, LLC and Derrick Girard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A)(Hansen, Loren)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 TEXT-ONLY ORDER on #22 Stipulation. The parties' #22 Stipulated Order Regarding Discovery of Electronically Stored Information is adopted and shall be enforced by the Court as an agreement between the parties. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 11/12/2021. (EB)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER on #23 Stipulation & PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 11/12/2021. (EB)
October 15, 2021 Filing 24 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #23 Stipulation. (Niles, Donald)
October 15, 2021 Filing 23 STIPULATION for Protective Order by ionLake, LLC. Jointly Signed by CellTrust Corporation and Derrick Girard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Niles, Donald)
October 15, 2021 Filing 22 STIPULATION Stipulated Order Regarding Discovery of Electronically Stored Information by ionLake, LLC. Jointly Signed by CellTrust Corporation and Derrick Girard. (Niles, Donald)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Confidential Letter to Court due by 5/4/2022. Settlement Conference set for 5/11/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 9/21/2021. (HAM)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 2/1/2022. Fact Discovery due by 8/19/2022. Expert Discovery due by 2/1/2023. Motions (non-disp) due 8/19/2022. Motions (disp) due by 4/1/2023. Ready for trial due by 9/1/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 9/21/2021. (HAM)
September 16, 2021 Filing 19 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 9/16/2021. Pretrial scheduling order will be issued. (HAM)
September 9, 2021 Filing 18 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Pretrial Scheduling Order (Patent). (Oney, Richard)
September 9, 2021 Filing 17 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by CellTrust Corporation. Jointly Signed by ionLake LLC. (Oney, Richard)
August 13, 2021 Filing 16 REPLY to Counterclaim filed by CellTrust Corporation. (Oney, Richard)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE OF AND ORDER FOR PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 9/16/2021 at 10:00 AM, by Telephone Conference, before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 7/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (HAM)
July 23, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald W Niles on behalf of All Defendants. (Niles, Donald)
July 23, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against CellTrust Corporation. filed by Derrick Girard, ionLake, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 6) (Kniser, Casey)
July 22, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Casey Allen Kniser on behalf of All Defendants. (Kniser, Casey)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Richard E. Oney for CellTrust Corporation. Approved by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 6/17/2021. (NAH)
June 15, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Richard E. Oney. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8819139 filed by CellTrust Corporation. (Hansen, Loren)
June 14, 2021 Filing 9 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright and Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung for all further proceedings. Judge Nancy E. Brasel, Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 21-cv-1354 (WMW/TNL). Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright and Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 6/10/2021.(KNK) Modified text on 6/14/2021 (MKB).
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 21-cv-1354 (NEB/BRT). Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 6/9/2021.(KNK)
June 9, 2021 Filing 6 REPORT ON FILING OF PATENT/TRADEMARK ACTION (AO 120)(USPTO noticed with filing). (Hansen, Loren)
June 9, 2021 Filing 5 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR -(Text-Only) NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (LNP) Modified text on 6/9/2021 (LNP).
June 8, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Derrick Girard, ionLake, LLC. (KNK)
June 8, 2021 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per 3rd, 4th - Patent list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 21-cv-1354 (NEB/HB). (KNK)
June 8, 2021 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff CELLTRUST CORPORATION, a Delaware Corporation. (Hansen, Loren)
June 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8804963) filed by CellTrust Corporation . Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hansen, Loren) Modified text on 6/8/2021 (KNK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CellTrust Corporation v. ionLake, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derrick Girard
Represented By: Casey Allen Kniser
Represented By: Donald W Niles
Represented By: Douglas J Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ionLake, LLC
Represented By: Casey Allen Kniser
Represented By: Donald W Niles
Represented By: Douglas J Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CellTrust Corporation
Represented By: Loren L Hansen
Represented By: Richard E. Oney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?