Minnesota Nurses Association v. Allina Health
Plaintiff: Minnesota Nurses Association
Defendant: Allina Health
Case Number: 0:2021cv01364
Filed: June 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Michael J Davis
Referring Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 704
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction #7 is DENIED. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 7/16/2021. (GRR)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-EMAILED ATTORNEY TO REFILE. MOTION to Vacate Arbitration Award Memrandum of Law in Opposition filed by Minnesota Nurses Association. (Wachtler, Christopher) Modified text on 7/16/2021 (MMG).
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER/NOTICE: Settlement Conference set for 7/15/2021 at 10:00 AM in Video Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Confidential Letter to Court due by 7/14/2021. Parties are directed to Meet and Confer by 7/13/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 7/8/2021. (JEN)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael J. Davis: Motion Hearing held on 7/7/2021 re #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Minnesota Nurses Association. The motion was moved, argued and taken under advisement. An order will follow. A settlement conference has been scheduled with Magistrate Judge Kate M. Menendez on July 15, 2021 at 10:00 AM. The parties are directed to contact Judge Menendez's chambers for details. (Court Reporter Lori Simpson) (GRR)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Reply to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Minnesota Nurses Association.(Wachtler, Christopher)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #18 Motion to Vacate Arbitration Award. (Abrahamson, Joel)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM re #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested, #18 Cross MOTION to Vacate Arbitration Award in Part filed by Allina Health. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Abrahamson, Joel)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #18 Cross MOTION to Vacate Arbitration Award in Part : Date and time to be determined. (Abrahamson, Joel)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Cross MOTION to Vacate Arbitration Award in Part filed by Allina Health. (Abrahamson, Joel)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Allina Health. (Abrahamson, Joel)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 (Text-Only) ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT re #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested. Defendant's opposition shall be due on or before 6/30/21. Plaintiff's reply shall be due on or before 7/2/21. Ordered by Judge Michael J. Davis on 6/24/2021.(GRR)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne Marie Buethe on behalf of Allina Health. (Buethe, Anne Marie)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested : Motion Hearing set for 7/7/2021 at 01:00 PM in Video Conference (no courtroom) before Judge Michael J. Davis. (Wachtler, Christopher)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 LR7.1/LR72.2 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Minnesota Nurses Association re #11 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Minnesota Nurses Association.(Wachtler, Christopher)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Clifton Willmeng in SUPPORT OF #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Minnesota Nurses Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) additional medical bills)(Wachtler, Christopher)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Minnesota Nurses Association.(Wachtler, Christopher)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - WILL REFILE - MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Minnesota Nurses Association.(Wachtler, Christopher) Modified text on 6/15/2021 (MMP).
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested : Date and time to be determined. (Wachtler, Christopher)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-DIRECTED TO REFILE. MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Minnesota Nurses Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Affidavit of Clifton Willmeng)(Wachtler, Christopher) Modified text on 6/14/2021 (MKB).
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Minnesota Nurses Association. (Wachtler, Christopher)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-DIRECTED TO REFILE. MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Minnesota Nurses Association. (Wachtler, Christopher) Modified text on 6/14/2021 (MKB).
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Allina Health. (KNK)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Michael J. Davis per 3rd, 4th - Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 21-cv-1364 (MJD/KMM). (KNK)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint, filed by Minnesota Nurses Association, Allina Health filed by Minnesota Nurses Association. (Wachtler, Christopher)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 EXHIBIT exhibits b-f re #1 Complaint, filed by Minnesota Nurses Association. (Wachtler, Christopher)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Parties (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8808546) filed by Minnesota Nurses Association. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Collective Bargaining Agreement) (Wachtler, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Minnesota Nurses Association v. Allina Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minnesota Nurses Association
Represented By: Christopher K Wachtler
Represented By: Christopher Kent Wachtler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allina Health
Represented By: Anne Marie Buethe
Represented By: Dominic J Cecere
Represented By: Joel E Abrahamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?