HEK, LLC v. Votum Enterprises, LLC et al
Plaintiff: HEK, LLC doing business as Kinneberg Management Group
Defendant: Marvin Stutz, Votum Enterprises, LLC and Michael Mastrangelo
Case Number: 0:2021cv01380
Filed: June 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Nature of Suit: Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2021 Filing 30 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: #12 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 11/10/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3A (STP) before Judge Nancy E. Brasel. (Berman, Kari)
August 4, 2021 Filing 29 AFFIDAVIT of Kari Berman in SUPPORT OF #12 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Michael Mastrangelo, Marvin Stutz, Votum Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Berman, Kari)
August 4, 2021 Filing 28 Reply to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Michael Mastrangelo, Marvin Stutz, Votum Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Berman, Kari)
July 22, 2021 Filing 27 DECLARATION of Daniel R. Hall in Opposition to #12 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by HEK, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A & B)(Hall, Daniel)
July 22, 2021 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by HEK, LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Hall, Daniel)
July 16, 2021 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael Mastrangelo, Marvin Stutz, Votum Enterprises, LLC re #24 Notice of Appearance of Kyle Nelson (Nelson, Kyle)
July 16, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle Nelson on behalf of Michael Mastrangelo, Marvin Stutz, Votum Enterprises, LLC. (Nelson, Kyle)
July 15, 2021 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael Mastrangelo, Marvin Stutz, Votum Enterprises, LLC re #21 Notice of Removal,,, (Berman, Kari)
July 15, 2021 Filing 22 (Text-Only) AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion to Dismiss. The hearing on the motion to dismiss #12 is rescheduled to 10/15/21 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 3A of the Minneapolis Federal Courthouse. (KMW) Modified text on 7/16/2021 (KMW).
July 15, 2021 Filing 21 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County District Court, case number 27-cv-21-7451 filed by Michael Mastrangelo, Marvin Stutz, Votum Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit(s) 3-Email accepting service of Complaint, #4 Exhibit(s) 4-Email re Kinneberg Sole Member of HEK, LLC, #5 Exhibit(s) 5-Votum Certificate of Formation, #6 Exhibit(s) 6-Declaration of Mark Linder, #7 Exhibit(s) 7-Declaration of Grace Stutz, #8 Exhibit(s) 8-Declaration of McKenna Stutz, #9 Exhibit(s) 9-Declaration of Harrison Stutz, #10 Exhibit(s) 10-Declaration of Madeline Stutz, #11 Exhibit(s) 11-Declaration of Beth Mastrangelo, #12 Exhibit(s) 12-Declaration of Tedd Levine, #13 Exhibit(s) 13-Declaration of Carmel Pedatella) (Berman, Kari)
July 2, 2021 Filing 20 Amended AFFIDAVIT of Kari Berman in SUPPORT OF #12 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Michael Mastrangelo, Marvin Stutz, Votum Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) E)(Berman, Kari)
July 1, 2021 Filing 19 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #12 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Michael Mastrangelo, Marvin Stutz, Votum Enterprises, LLC.(Berman, Kari)
July 1, 2021 Filing 18 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #12 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Michael Mastrangelo, Marvin Stutz, Votum Enterprises, LLC.(Berman, Kari)
July 1, 2021 Filing 17 Declaration of Marvin Stutz in Support of #12 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Michael Mastrangelo, Marvin Stutz, Votum Enterprises, LLC.(Berman, Kari)
July 1, 2021 Filing 16 Declaration of Michael Mastrangelo in Support of #12 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Michael Mastrangelo, Marvin Stutz, Votum Enterprises, LLC.(Berman, Kari)
July 1, 2021 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Kari Berman in SUPPORT OF #12 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Michael Mastrangelo, Marvin Stutz, Votum Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F, #7 Exhibit(s) G, #8 Exhibit(s) H, #9 Exhibit(s) I, #10 Exhibit(s) J, #11 Exhibit(s) K)(Berman, Kari)
July 1, 2021 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support re #12 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Michael Mastrangelo, Marvin Stutz, Votum Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Berman, Kari)
July 1, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #12 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 10/18/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3A (STP) before Judge Nancy E. Brasel. (Berman, Kari)
July 1, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Michael Mastrangelo, Marvin Stutz, Votum Enterprises, LLC. (Berman, Kari)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 (Text-Only) The Court has reviewed Defendants' letter request for enlargement of word count #8 and the responses #9 #10 . The Defendants' request is hereby denied. Defendants shall submit their briefs in accordance with this District's Local Rules. Ordered by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 6/28/2021. (KMW)
June 28, 2021 Filing 10 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Michael Mastrangelo, Marvin Stutz, Votum Enterprises, LLC . (Berman, Kari)
June 28, 2021 Filing 9 LETTER RESPONSE re #8 Letter to Request Permission to Exceed Word/Line Limits. (Hall, Daniel)
June 25, 2021 Filing 8 LETTER to Request Permission to Exceed Word/Line Limits . (Berman, Kari)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Tedd S Levine for Michael Mastrangelo, Marvin Stutz, and for Votum Enterprises, LLC. Approved by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 6/23/2021. (NAH)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Defendants have until July 15, 2021, to file an Amended Notice of Removal properly alleging the Court's subject matter jurisdiction over the case. If Defendants do not file an amended Notice of Removal by July 15, 2021, the Court will dismiss the case for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 6/17/2021.(KMW)
June 16, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Tedd S. Levine. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8822153 filed by Michael Mastrangelo, Marvin Stutz, Votum Enterprises, LLC. (Berman, Kari)
June 15, 2021 Filing 4 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #3 Stipulation. (Berman, Kari)
June 15, 2021 Filing 3 STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Defendants to Serve a Responsive Pleading by Michael Mastrangelo, Marvin Stutz, Votum Enterprises, LLC. Jointly Signed by HEK, LLC d/b/a Kinneberg Management. (Berman, Kari)
June 11, 2021 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 21-cv-1380 (NEB/KMM). (MKB)
June 11, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8812730) filed by Michael Mastrangelo, Marvin Stutz, Votum Enterprises, LLC. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Berman, Kari)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HEK, LLC v. Votum Enterprises, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvin Stutz
Represented By: Kari S Berman
Represented By: Tina Syring-Petrocchi
Represented By: Kyle Nelson
Represented By: Tedd S Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Votum Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Kari S Berman
Represented By: Tina Syring-Petrocchi
Represented By: Kyle Nelson
Represented By: Tedd S Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Mastrangelo
Represented By: Kari S Berman
Represented By: Tina Syring-Petrocchi
Represented By: Kyle Nelson
Represented By: Tedd S Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HEK, LLC doing business as Kinneberg Management Group
Represented By: Janel M Dressen
Represented By: Daniel R Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?