United States of America v. $27,683 in U.S. Currency et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $27,683 in U.S. Currency, $33,600 in U.S. Currency, $30,000 in U.S. Currency, $3,300 in U.S. Currency, $19,898 in U.S. Currency, $1,675 in U.S. Currency, $8,150 in U.S. Currency, $32,000 in U.S. Currency, $23,700 in U.S. Currency and $53,710 in U.S. Currency
Case Number: 0:2021cv01604
Filed: July 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Michael J Davis
Referring Judge: David T Schultz
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1341
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2021 Filing 24 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against United States of America, filed by $33,600 in U.S. Currency. (Campoli, Lauren) Modified text on 9/9/2021 (lmb).
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES. This case is reassigned to Judge Michael J. Davis and Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz for all further proceedings. Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright, Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 21-cv-01604 MJD/DTS. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis and Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 9/2/2021.(MTP)
September 2, 2021 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by $27,683 in U.S. Currency re #21 Answer to Complaint (Brandl, Jean)
September 2, 2021 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint filed by $27,683 in U.S. Currency. (Brandl, Jean)
August 26, 2021 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint filed by $19,898 in U.S. Currency. (Brever, Thomas)
August 26, 2021 Filing 19 REPLY to Counterclaim filed by $53,710 in U.S. Currency. (Brever, Thomas)
August 26, 2021 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint filed by $1,675 in U.S. Currency. (Brever, Thomas)
August 26, 2021 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint filed by $32,000 in U.S. Currency. (Brever, Thomas)
August 26, 2021 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against $30,000 in U.S. Currency. filed by $30,000 in U.S. Currency. (Brever, Thomas)
August 25, 2021 Filing 15 Third Party Intervenor COMPLAINT Against Defendants United States of America and Unnamed Federal Agents. filed by $33,600 in U.S. Currency. (Campoli, Lauren)
August 25, 2021 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support re #13 MOTION to Intervene as Plaintiff-Intervenor filed by $33,600 in U.S. Currency. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance)(Campoli, Lauren)
August 25, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Intervene as Plaintiff-Intervenor filed by $33,600 in U.S. Currency. (Campoli, Lauren)
August 19, 2021 Filing 12 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by $33,600 in U.S. Currency. (Campoli, Lauren)
August 17, 2021 Filing 11 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by $1,675 in U.S. Currency. (Brever, Thomas)
August 17, 2021 Filing 10 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by $53,710 in U.S. Currency. (Brever, Thomas)
August 17, 2021 Filing 9 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by $32,000 in U.S. Currency. (Brever, Thomas)
August 16, 2021 Filing 8 Verified Claim ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against $53,710 in U.S. Currency. filed by $53,710 in U.S. Currency. (Brever, Thomas)
August 13, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by $27,683 in U.S. Currency re #6 Financial Affidavit Verified Claim and Declaration (Brandl, Jean)
August 13, 2021 Filing 6 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by $27,683 in U.S. Currency. (Brandl, Jean)
August 12, 2021 Filing 5 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by $3,300 in U.S. Currency. (Brever, Thomas)
August 12, 2021 Filing 4 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by $30,000 in U.S. Currency. (Brever, Thomas)
August 12, 2021 Filing 3 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by $19,898 in U.S. Currency. (Brever, Thomas)
July 16, 2021 WARRANT OF ARREST AND NOTICE IN REM issued. (kt)
July 13, 2021 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 3rd, 4th - Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 21-cv-1604 (WMW/BRT). (KNK)
July 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture In Rem against All Defendants filed by United States of America. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Baune, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $27,683 in U.S. Currency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Craig R Baune
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $27,683 in U.S. Currency
Represented By: Jean M Brandl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $33,600 in U.S. Currency
Represented By: Lauren Campoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $30,000 in U.S. Currency
Represented By: Thomas E Brever
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $3,300 in U.S. Currency
Represented By: Thomas E Brever
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $19,898 in U.S. Currency
Represented By: Thomas E Brever
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $1,675 in U.S. Currency
Represented By: Thomas E Brever
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $8,150 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $32,000 in U.S. Currency
Represented By: Thomas E Brever
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $23,700 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $53,710 in U.S. Currency
Represented By: Thomas E Brever
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?