Jidoefor et al v. Freedom Specialty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Okwuchukwu E. Jidoefor and Vince Automotive Group Corporation
Defendant: Freedom Specialty Insurance Company
Case Number: 0:2021cv01609
Filed: July 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES that 21-cv-1911 PAM/HB has been reassigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Signed by Judge Eric C. Tostrud and Judge Paul A. Magnuson on 8/31/2021.(MMG)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Freedom Specialty Insurance Company re #15 Reply, #17 Declaration in Opposition, #16 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion (Allen, Travis)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 DECLARATION of Travis J. Allen in Opposition to #9 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Freedom Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Summons and Complaint)(Allen, Travis)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Freedom Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Allen, Travis)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 REPLY re #5 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Freedom Specialty Insurance Company.(Allen, Travis)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Freedom Specialty Insurance Company re #13 Meet and Confer Statement, #12 Notice of Hearing on Motion (Broman, Stacy)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #5 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Freedom Specialty Insurance Company.(Broman, Stacy)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #5 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Date and time to be determined. (Broman, Stacy)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Freedom Specialty Insurance Company re #6 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #7 Proposed Order to Judge, #5 MOTION to Dismiss/General (Broman, Stacy)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Okwuchukwu E. Jidoefor re #9 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings #1 Notice of Removal,, #8 Response (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(MMG) Document QC'd on 8/5/2021 (KDS).
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Okwuchukwu E. Jidoefor. (MMG) Document QC'd on 8/5/2021 (KDS).
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS re #5 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Okwuchukwu E. Jidoefor. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MMG) Document QC'd on 8/5/2021 (KDS).
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #5 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Freedom Specialty Insurance Company.(Broman, Stacy)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Freedom Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Broman, Stacy)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Freedom Specialty Insurance Company. (Broman, Stacy)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 21-cv-1609 ECT/ECW. (MMG)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Freedom Specialty Insurance Company. (Broman, Stacy)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Freedom Specialty Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal, (Broman, Stacy)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County with State Court Complaint and Summons attached (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8878543) filed by Freedom Specialty Insurance Company. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Broman, Stacy) Modified text on 7/14/2021 (MMG).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jidoefor et al v. Freedom Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Okwuchukwu E. Jidoefor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vince Automotive Group Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freedom Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Stacy A Broman
Represented By: Travis Jorge Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?