Michels Pipeline, Inc. v. United Association Of Journeymen And Apprentices Of The Plumbing And Pipe Fitting Industry Of The United States And Canada, AFL-CIO and its Affilated Entities Including et al
Plaintiff: Michels Pipeline, Inc.
Defendant: UNITED ASSOCIATION OF JOURNEYMEN AND APPRENTICES OF THE PLUMBING AND PIPE FITTING INDUSTRY OF THE UNITED STATES AND CANADA, AFL-CIO AND ITS AFFILIATED ENTITIES INCLUDING LOCAL 798, Distribution Contractors Association, Pipe Line Contractors Association, United Association Of Journeymen And Apprentices Of The Plumbing And Pipe Fitting Industry Of The United States And Canada, AFL-CIO and UA Local 978
Case Number: 0:2021cv01648
Filed: July 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Tony N Leung
Referring Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 184
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 65 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #61 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by United Association Of Journeymen And Apprentices Of The Plumbing And Pipe Fitting Industry Of The United States And Canada, AFL-CIO.(Cummins, Brendan)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #61 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by United Association Of Journeymen And Apprentices Of The Plumbing And Pipe Fitting Industry Of The United States And Canada, AFL-CIO.(Cummins, Brendan)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MEMORANDUM in Support re #61 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by United Association Of Journeymen And Apprentices Of The Plumbing And Pipe Fitting Industry Of The United States And Canada, AFL-CIO. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Cummins, Brendan)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #61 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 1/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 14E (MPLS) before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (Cummins, Brendan)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by United Association Of Journeymen And Apprentices Of The Plumbing And Pipe Fitting Industry Of The United States And Canada, AFL-CIO. (Cummins, Brendan)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER on #58 Stipulation. Distribution Contractors Association answer due 9/20/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 8/25/2021. (HAM)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #58 Stipulation. (Kappenman, Martin)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 STIPULATION to Extend Deadline for Defendant Distribution Contractors Association's Response by Distribution Contractors Association. Jointly Signed by Michels Pipeline, Inc.. (Kappenman, Martin)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting #53 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 8/16/2021. (CLG)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by United Association Of Journeymen And Apprentices Of The Plumbing And Pipe Fitting Industry Of The United States And Canada, AFL-CIO. United Association Of Journeymen And Apprentices Of The Plumbing And Pipe Fitting Industry Of The United States And Canada, AFL-CIO waiver sent on 7/19/2021, answer due 9/17/2021. (Bolek, Keith)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss #53 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, #54 Meet and Confer Statement. (Lipschultz, Noah)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #53 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Michels Pipeline, Inc..(Lipschultz, Noah)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #44 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Michels Pipeline, Inc.. (Lipschultz, Noah)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 AMENDED JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Civil Notice - appeal)(JME)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - REFILED. JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Civil Notice - appeal)(JME) Modified text on 8/12/2021 (JME). Modified text on 8/12/2021 (kt).
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER denying #6 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 8/10/2021. (CLG)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT re #44 MOTION to Dismiss/General. Within 30 days of the motion being decided, Plaintiff shall contact the chambers of Magistrate Judge Tony Leung, by letter or e-mail, for the purpose of scheduling the pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 8/9/2021. (HAM)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #44 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Pipe Line Contractors Association.(Easley, Brian)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #44 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Pipe Line Contractors Association.(Burks, Courtney)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MEMORANDUM in Support re #44 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Pipe Line Contractors Association. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Easley, Brian)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #44 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 1/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 14E (MPLS) before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (Easley, Brian)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Pipe Line Contractors Association. (Easley, Brian)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER on #41 Stipulation. Local 798 answer due 9/20/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 8/5/2021. (HAM)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #41 Stipulation. (Cummins, Brendan)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANT PIPELINERS LOCAL UNION NO. 798 TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT by Local 798. Jointly Signed by Michels Pipeline, Inc.. (Cummins, Brendan)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER on #38 Stipulation. Distribution Contractors Association answer due 8/27/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 8/3/2021. (HAM)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #38 Stipulation. (Kappenman, Martin)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATION to Extend Deadline for Defendant Distribution Contractors Association's Response by Distribution Contractors Association. Jointly signed by Plaintiff. (Kappenman, Martin) Modified text on 8/3/2021 (kt).
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz: Motion Hearing held on 7/30/2021 re #6 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Michels Pipeline, Inc. Motion taken under advisement, written order forthcoming. (Court Reporter Debra Beauvais) (CLG)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian West Easley on behalf of Pipe Line Contractors Association. (Easley, Brian)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Brian West Easley. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8913124 filed by Pipe Line Contractors Association. (Burks, Courtney) Modified text on 7/29/2021 (NAH).
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #20 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Louis L Robein, Jr for Local 798; granting #22 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Ellen O. Boardman for United Association Of Journeymen And Apprentices Of The Plumbing And Pipe Fitting Industry Of The United States And Canada, AFL-CIO and its Affilated Entities Including; granting #23 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jonathan O Levine for Michels Pipeline, Inc.; granting #30 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Mike S. Yellin for Michels Pipeline, Inc. Approved by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 7/27/2021. (NAH)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 LETTER from Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (CLG)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Supplemental DECLARATION of Scott Hunsberger re #31 Reply, by Michels Pipeline, Inc. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(Lipschultz, Noah)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 REPLY re #7 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #6 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested, #27 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #24 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #28 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #25 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Michels Pipeline, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Lipschultz, Noah)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael S. Yellin. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8906901 filed by Michels Pipeline, Inc.. (Lipschultz, Noah)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michels Pipeline, Inc.. Local 798 served on 7/21/2021, answer due 8/11/2021. (Lipschultz, Noah)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #6 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Pipe Line Contractors Association. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Burks, Courtney)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Distribution Contractors Association. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Kappenman, Martin)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 DECLARATION of David L. Barnett in Opposition to #6 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by United Association Of Journeymen And Apprentices Of The Plumbing And Pipe Fitting Industry Of The United States And Canada, AFL-CIO and its Affilated Entities Including. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1-6, #2 Exhibit(s) 7-12)(Cummins, Brendan)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #6 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by United Association Of Journeymen And Apprentices Of The Plumbing And Pipe Fitting Industry Of The United States And Canada, AFL-CIO and its Affilated Entities Including. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Cummins, Brendan)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #6 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Local 798. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Cummins, Brendan)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jonathan O. Levine. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8903722 filed by Michels Pipeline, Inc.. (Lipschultz, Noah)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ellen O. Boardman. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8902498 filed by United Association Of Journeymen And Apprentices Of The Plumbing And Pipe Fitting Industry Of The United States And Canada, AFL-CIO and its Affilated Entities Including. (Cummins, Brendan)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Brendan D Cummins on behalf of Local 798. (Cummins, Brendan)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Louis L. Robein, Jr.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8901976 filed by Local 798. (Cummins, Brendan)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Keith Bolek for United Association Of Journeymen And Apprentices Of The Plumbing And Pipe Fitting Industry Of The United States And Canada, AFL-CIO and its Affilated Entities Including. Approved by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 7/22/2021. (NAH)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER SETTING HEARING AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Motion Hearing set for 7/30/2021 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 14E (MPLS) before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. See Order for other dates and deadlines. Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 7/22/2021.(CLG)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily M Peterson on behalf of Pipe Line Contractors Association. (Peterson, Emily)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily M Peterson on behalf of Pipe Line Contractors Association. (Peterson, Emily)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Courtney Lynn Burks on behalf of Pipe Line Contractors Association. (Burks, Courtney)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristin Simonet on behalf of Pipe Line Contractors Association. (Simonet, Kristin)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Martin D Kappenman on behalf of Distribution Contractors Association. (Kappenman, Martin)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas R Revnew on behalf of Distribution Contractors Association. (Revnew, Thomas)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Keith R. Bolek. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8895317 filed by United Association Of Journeymen And Apprentices Of The Plumbing And Pipe Fitting Industry Of The United States And Canada, AFL-CIO and its Affilated Entities Including. (Cummins, Brendan)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Brendan D Cummins on behalf of United Association Of Journeymen And Apprentices Of The Plumbing And Pipe Fitting Industry Of The United States And Canada, AFL-CIO and its Affilated Entities Including. (Cummins, Brendan)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michels Pipeline, Inc. re #7 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #6 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested, #8 Proposed Order to Judge - Other (Lipschultz, Noah)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction #7 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #6 Motion for TRO. (Lipschultz, Noah)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Michels Pipeline, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Lipschultz, Noah)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Michels Pipeline, Inc.. (Lipschultz, Noah)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Jonathan O. Levine and Michael S. Yellin as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (MMP)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Distribution Contractors Association, Local 798, Pipe Line Contractors Association, United Association Of Journeymen And Apprentices Of The Plumbing And Pipe Fitting Industry Of The United States And Canada, AFL-CIO and its Affilated Entities. (MMP)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per 3rd 4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 21-cv-1648 (PJS/TNL). (MMP)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Plaintiff Michels Pipeline, Inc.. (Lipschultz, Noah)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Distribution Contractors Association, Pipe Line Contractors Association, United Association Of Journeymen And Apprentices Of The Plumbing And Pipe Fitting Industry Of The United States And Canada, AFL-CIO and its Affilated Entities Including et al (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8887300) filed by Michels Pipeline, Inc. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Scott Hunsberger Declaration, #2 Exhibit(s) Hunsberger Exhibits 1-10, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Lipschultz, Noah) Modified text on 7/19/2021 (MMP).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michels Pipeline, Inc. v. United Association Of Journeymen And Apprentices Of The Plumbing And Pipe Fitting Industry Of The United States And Canada, AFL-CIO and its Affilated Entities Including et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michels Pipeline, Inc.
Represented By: Noah G Lipschultz
Represented By: Jonathan O Levine
Represented By: Mike S. Yellin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED ASSOCIATION OF JOURNEYMEN AND APPRENTICES OF THE PLUMBING AND PIPE FITTING INDUSTRY OF THE UNITED STATES AND CANADA, AFL-CIO AND ITS AFFILIATED ENTITIES INCLUDING LOCAL 798
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Distribution Contractors Association
Represented By: Martin D Kappenman
Represented By: Thomas R Revnew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pipe Line Contractors Association
Represented By: Brian West Easley
Represented By: Courtney Lynn Burks
Represented By: Emily M Peterson
Represented By: Kristin Simonet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Association Of Journeymen And Apprentices Of The Plumbing And Pipe Fitting Industry Of The United States And Canada, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Brendan D Cummins
Represented By: Ellen O. Boardman
Represented By: Keith Bolek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UA Local 978
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?