InteRebar Fabricators LLC v. Lunda/C.S. McCrossan Joint Venture et al
Plaintiff: InteRebar Fabricators LLC and JRC Opco LLC, successor-in-interest to Metal Partners Rebar, LLC
Defendant: Lunda/C.S. McCrossan Joint Venture, Lunda Construction Company and C.S. McCrossan Construction, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2021cv01685
Filed: July 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: John F Docherty
Referring Judge: Paul A Magnuson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2021 Filing 23 **TEXT ONLY** NOTICE of Cancellation of Hearing: #18 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #14 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Stay Proceedings : The Motion Hearing set for Tuesday, September 28, 2021, at 2:00 p.m., before The Hon. Paul A. Magnuson, is CANCELLED. (LLM)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. Defendants' Motion to Stay and to Compel Arbitration #14 is DENIED as moot; 2. The parties shall provide the Court with a status update in six months and every three months thereafter; and 3. This matter is STAYED pending arbitration according to the parties' arbitration agreement. Signed by The Hon. Paul A. Magnuson on 8/23/2021. (LLM)
August 23, 2021 Filing 21 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #20 Stipulation,. (Coleman, Jeffrey)
August 23, 2021 Filing 20 STIPULATION re #14 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Stay Proceedings by InteRebar Fabricators LLC. Jointly Signed by Lunda/C.S. McCrossan Joint Venture, C.S. McCrossan Construction, Inc., and Lunda Construction Company. (Coleman, Jeffrey)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 (Text-Only) ORDER/NOTICE: Due to the pending Motion to Stay Proceedings and Compel Arbitration (Dkt. No. 14), the Court finds there is good cause to delay the entry of a pretrial scheduling order. The Court will schedule a pretrial conference, if needed, promptly after a decision is issued on the pending motion. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 8/23/2021.(TJS)
August 23, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #14 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Stay Proceedings : Motion Hearing set for 9/28/2021 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7D (STP) before Judge Paul A. Magnuson. (Wieland, Jeffrey)
August 19, 2021 Filing 17 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #14 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by C.S. McCrossan Construction, Inc., Lunda Construction Company, Lunda/C.S. McCrossan Joint Venture.(Wieland, Jeffrey)
August 19, 2021 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support re #14 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by C.S. McCrossan Construction, Inc., Lunda Construction Company, Lunda/C.S. McCrossan Joint Venture. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Wieland, Jeffrey)
August 19, 2021 Filing 15 Declaration of Jeffrey Wieland in Support of #14 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by C.S. McCrossan Construction, Inc., Lunda Construction Company, Lunda/C.S. McCrossan Joint Venture. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-D)(Wieland, Jeffrey)
August 19, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by C.S. McCrossan Construction, Inc., Lunda Construction Company, Lunda/C.S. McCrossan Joint Venture. (Wieland, Jeffrey)
August 17, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey A Wieland on behalf of C.S. McCrossan Construction, Inc., Lunda Construction Company, Lunda/C.S. McCrossan Joint Venture. (Wieland, Jeffrey)
August 3, 2021 Filing 12 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these practice pointers, in addition to the District of Minnesota's Local Rules and Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Stahlmann, Trisha)
August 2, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by InteRebar Fabricators LLC. Lunda Construction Company served on 7/29/2021, answer due 8/19/2021. (Erickson, Lars)
August 2, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by InteRebar Fabricators LLC. Lunda/C.S. McCrossan Joint Venture served on 7/30/2021, answer due 8/20/2021. (Erickson, Lars)
August 2, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by InteRebar Fabricators LLC. C.S. McCrossan Construction, Inc. served on 7/30/2021, answer due 8/20/2021. (Erickson, Lars)
August 2, 2021 Filing 8 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - WILL REFILE - AFFIDAVIT of Service by InteRebar Fabricators LLC re #4 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, on Lunda Construction Company (Erickson, Lars) Modified text on 8/2/2021 (MMP).
July 29, 2021 Filing 7 CORRECTED CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint, filed by C.S. McCrossan Construction, Inc., Lunda Construction Company, Lunda/C.S. McCrossan Joint Venture filed by InteRebar Fabricators LLC. (Coleman, Jeffrey) Modified text on 7/29/2021 (KDS).
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER in re Dispositive Motion Practice in cases assigned to The Hon. Paul A. Magnuson. (LLM)
July 26, 2021 Filing 5 (Text-Only) Notice to Attorneys: Please use the updated case number 21-cv-01685 PAM-JFD. (KLS)
July 23, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to C.S. McCrossan Construction, Inc., Lunda Construction Company, Lunda/C.S. McCrossan Joint Venture. (kt)
July 23, 2021 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Paul A. Magnuson per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge John F Docherty. Please use case number 21-cv-1685 PAM/JFD. (kt) Modified text on 7/26/2021 (kt).
July 22, 2021 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff InteRebar Fabricators LLC. (Coleman, Jeffrey)
July 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8900010) filed by InteRebar Fabricators LLC. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 FILED IN ERROR - REFILED. Civil Cover Sheet) (Coleman, Jeffrey) Modified text on 7/29/2021 (KDS).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: InteRebar Fabricators LLC v. Lunda/C.S. McCrossan Joint Venture et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: InteRebar Fabricators LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey W Coleman
Represented By: Lars C Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JRC Opco LLC, successor-in-interest to Metal Partners Rebar, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey W Coleman
Represented By: Lars C Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lunda/C.S. McCrossan Joint Venture
Represented By: Jeffrey A Wieland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lunda Construction Company
Represented By: Jeffrey A Wieland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.S. McCrossan Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey A Wieland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?