Carlstrom v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Gayla J. Carlstrom
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 0:2021cv01687
Filed: July 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Tony N Leung
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Kizuwanda Curtis on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi. (Curtis, Kizuwanda)
August 9, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to USA by Gayla J. Carlstrom. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Summons - Regional Counsel)(Farrell, Clifford)
August 9, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to USA by Gayla J. Carlstrom. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Summons - Attorney General)(Farrell, Clifford)
August 9, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to USA by Gayla J. Carlstrom. Kilolo Kijakazi served on 7/30/2021, answer due 9/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Summons - US Attorney)(Farrell, Clifford)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #2 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Clifford Michael Farrell for Gayla J. Carlstrom. Approved by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 7/23/2021. (NAH)
July 22, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES: Social Security Case Assignment Form Issued. Per #Local Rule 7.2, this form must be submitted to the clerk in paper on or before the answer due date. Please mail the completed form to:U.S. District Court for the District of MinnesotaClerks Office300 South Fourth Street, Suite 202Minneapolis, MN 55415 (CLK)
July 22, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Kilolo Kijakazi. (CLK)
July 22, 2021 Filing 3 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung per Social Security List. Please use case number 21-cv-1687 TNL. (CLK)
July 22, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Clifford M. Farrell. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8901031 filed by Gayla J. Carlstrom. (Olson, Edward)
July 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8900978) filed by Gayla J. Carlstrom. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Olson, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carlstrom v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gayla J. Carlstrom
Represented By: Edward C. Olson
Represented By: Clifford Michael Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Kizuwanda Curtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?