Dahir v. Cresco Capital, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ali Dahir
Defendant: Cresco Capital, Inc. and Lone Mountain Truck Leasing, LLC
Case Number: 0:2021cv01700
Filed: July 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Referring Judge: Becky R Thorson
2 Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 LETTER from Hennepin County District Court acknowledging receipt of #37 Order. (MKB)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 LETTER from Clerk's Office to Hennepin County District Court enclosing #37 Order of Remand. c/c: Hennepin County District Court. (MMP)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 OPINION AND ORDER: The case shall be remanded to Minnesota District Court, Fourth Judicial District (Hennepin County) pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c). Defendants' Motion to Dismiss #19 is DENIED AS MOOT. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 5/31/2022. (RMM)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re #33 Briefing Order filed by Ali Dahir. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Strauss, Adam) Modified text on 4/4/2022 (kt).
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 DECLARATION of Henry Pfutzenreuter by Cresco Capital, Inc. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibits 1 and 2)(Pfutzenreuter, R)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 BRIEF re #33 Briefing Order . (Pfutzenreuter, R)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER re: Motion to Dismiss #19 regarding additional briefing. See Order for dates and details. Signed by Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 3/17/2022.(RMM)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Eric C. Tostrud: Motion Hearing held on 2/14/2022 re #19 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Cresco Capital, Inc., Lone Mountain Truck Leasing, LLC. (Court Reporter Tim Willette) (RMM)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 REPLY re #19 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Cresco Capital, Inc., Lone Mountain Truck Leasing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Pfutzenreuter, R)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 (Text-Only) NOTICE of Rescheduling of Hearing: The hearing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss #19 is rescheduled for 2/14/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8E (MPLS) before Judge Eric C. Tostrud. Location change only.(RMM)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Ali Dahir. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Strauss, Adam)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 TEXT ENTRY ONLY NOTICE: Due to the pending motion to dismiss, there is good cause to delay setting a pretrial conference before Magistrate Judge Thorson at this time. (MSK)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 (Text-only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Due to the elevation of Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez to District Judge, this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. NOTE: the new case number is 21-cv-1700 ECT/BRT. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Note: the current hearings and deadlines in these cases may be reset (if necessary) by the new MJ Courtroom Deputy. (kt)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER on #24 Stipulation for a Modified Briefing Schedule. Responses due by 1/7/2022. Replies due by 1/21/2022. Signed by Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 12/9/2021.(RMM)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #24 Stipulation. (Pfutzenreuter, R)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION for Modified Briefing Schedule by Cresco Capital, Inc., Lone Mountain Truck Leasing, LLC. Jointly Signed by Ali Dahir, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated. (Pfutzenreuter, R)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #19 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Cresco Capital, Inc., Lone Mountain Truck Leasing, LLC.(Pfutzenreuter, R)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Second Declaration of Pat Corrigan in Support of #19 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Cresco Capital, Inc., Lone Mountain Truck Leasing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-C)(Pfutzenreuter, R)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Support re #19 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Cresco Capital, Inc., Lone Mountain Truck Leasing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Pfutzenreuter, R)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #19 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 2/14/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3B (STP) before Judge Eric C. Tostrud. (Pfutzenreuter, R)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Cresco Capital, Inc., Lone Mountain Truck Leasing, LLC. (Pfutzenreuter, R)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 (Text-Only) ORDER granting #16 Stipulation of time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Cresco Capital, Inc. answer due 11/30/2021; Lone Mountain Truck Leasing, LLC answer due 11/30/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 10/12/2021. (KAT)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #16 Stipulation. (Pfutzenreuter, R)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION of time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Cresco Capital, Inc., Lone Mountain Truck Leasing, LLC. Jointly Signed by Ali Dahir, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated. (Pfutzenreuter, R)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J Lyons, Jr on behalf of Ali Dahir. (Lyons, Thomas)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Defendants' motion to dismiss #6 is DENIED AS MOOT. The hearing on the motion #11 is CANCELED. Signed by Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 10/6/2021. (RMM)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Cresco Capital, Inc., Lone Mountain Truck Leasing, LLC. (MMP)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Cresco Capital, Inc., Lone Mountain Truck Leasing, LLC. filed by Ali Dahir. Filer requests summons issued. (Strauss, Adam)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: #6 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 11/29/2021 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3B (STP) before Judge Eric C. Tostrud. (Pfutzenreuter, R)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #6 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Cresco Capital, Inc., Lone Mountain Truck Leasing, LLC.(Pfutzenreuter, R)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Declaration of Pat Corrigan in Support of #6 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Cresco Capital, Inc., Lone Mountain Truck Leasing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-B)(Pfutzenreuter, R)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Cresco Capital, Inc., Lone Mountain Truck Leasing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Pfutzenreuter, R)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #6 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Date and time to be determined. (Pfutzenreuter, R)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Cresco Capital, Inc., Lone Mountain Truck Leasing, LLC. (Pfutzenreuter, R)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (Text-Only) ORDER granting #3 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. Cresco Capital, Inc. answer due 9/14/2021; Lone Mountain Truck Leasing, LLC answer due 9/14/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 8/6/2021. (KAT)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #3 Stipulation. (Pfutzenreuter, R)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STIPULATION (Joint) for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Cresco Capital, Inc., Lone Mountain Truck Leasing, LLC. (Pfutzenreuter, R)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 21-cv-1700 (ECT/KMM). (MKB)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Minnesota District Court, County of Hennepin (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8909554) filed by Lone Mountain Truck Leasing, LLC, Cresco Capital, Inc.. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-1, #2 Exhibit(s) A-2, #3 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Pfutzenreuter, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dahir v. Cresco Capital, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ali Dahir
Represented By: Adam R Strauss
Represented By: Benjamin William Tarshish
Represented By: Thomas J Lyons, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cresco Capital, Inc.
Represented By: R Henry Pfutzenreuter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lone Mountain Truck Leasing, LLC
Represented By: R Henry Pfutzenreuter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?