Fireman's Fund Insurance Company v. Airgroup Corporation
Plaintiff: Fireman's Fund Insurance Company as Subrogee of Damron Production Services Corp. and Fireman's Fund Insurance Company
Defendant: Airgroup Corporation a/k/a Radiant Global Logistics, Inc., Airgroup Corporation, Radiant Global Logistics, Inc. and Land Air Express, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2021cv01702
Filed: July 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2021 Filing 26 Third Party Defendant's Amended ANSWER to Third Party Complaint filed by Land Air Express, Inc.. (Savaloja, Daniel)
September 23, 2021 Filing 25 Defendant's Amended ANSWER to #17 Amended Complaint filed by Land Air Express, Inc.. (Savaloja, Daniel)
September 23, 2021 Filing 24 ANSWER to Third Party Complaint filed by Land Air Express, Inc.. (Savaloja, Daniel)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/14/2021. Confidential settlement letter due by 10/14/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 10/21/2021 at 09:00 AM by Telephone Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 9/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(LNP)
September 22, 2021 Filing 22 ANSWER to Third Party Complaint filed by Land Air Express, Inc.. (Savaloja, Daniel)
September 22, 2021 Filing 21 ANSWER to #17 Amended Complaint filed by Land Air Express, Inc.. (Savaloja, Daniel)
September 17, 2021 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Airgroup Corporation (Jordan, Kenderick)
September 8, 2021 Filing 19 Summons Issued as to Airgroup Corporation, Land Air Express, Inc. (CLK)
September 7, 2021 Filing 18 Third Party Summons Issued as to Third Party Defendant Land Air Express, Inc. (lmb)
September 7, 2021 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. filed by Fireman's Fund Insurance Company. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B) (Levy, Jonathan)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ONLY ORDER: This matter is before the Court on Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint Instanter. (ECF No. #15 .) Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a)(1)(B), Plaintiff may amend its complaint "once as a matter of course" without seeking leave of Court or consent of the opposing party provided (as pertinent here) it does so within 21 days after receiving a responsive pleading. Plaintiff has not previously amended its complaint, and Defendant Airgroup Corporation's answer was filed on September 3, 2021 (ECF No. #13 ). Therefore, Rule 15(a)(1)(B) authorizes Plaintiff "as a matter of course" to file its First Amended Complaint no later than September 24, 2021 (although the Court would encourage it to do so at its earliest opportunity). Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 9/7/2021. (LNP)
September 4, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings Instanter filed by Fireman's Fund Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) First Amended Complaint - Clean, #2 Exhibit(s) First Amended Complaint - Redlined)(Levy, Jonathan)
September 3, 2021 Filing 14 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Land Air Express, Inc., filed by Airgroup Corporation. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2) (Pryor, Mark) Modified text on 9/3/2021 (lmb).
September 3, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Airgroup Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Pryor, Mark) Modified text/link on 9/3/2021 (lmb).
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Kenderick Mason Jordan for Airgroup Corporation. Approved by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 8/12/2021. (NAH)
August 10, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kendrick M. Jordan. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8943368 filed by Airgroup Corporation. (Pryor, Mark)
August 5, 2021 Filing 10 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kendrick M. Jordan. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8936043 filed by Airgroup Corporation. (Pryor, Mark) Modified text on 8/10/2021 (NAH).
August 2, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Fireman's Fund Insurance Company. Airgroup Corporation waiver sent on 7/27/2021, answer due 9/27/2021. (Levy, Jonathan)
July 30, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark G Pryor on behalf of Airgroup Corporation. (Pryor, Mark)
July 28, 2021 Filing 7 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (LNP)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jonathan M Levy for Fireman's Fund Insurance Company. Approved by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 7/28/2021. (NAH)
July 27, 2021 Filing 5 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
July 27, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jonathan M. Levy. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8912668 filed by Fireman's Fund Insurance Company. (Marx, Heather)
July 27, 2021 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Plaintiff Fireman's Fund Insurance Company. (Marx, Heather)
July 27, 2021 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 21-cv-1702 (WMW/HB). (lmb)
July 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Airgroup Corporation. (filing fee $402, receipt number AMNDC-8909824) filed by Fireman's Fund Insurance Company. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Marx, Heather) Modified text on 7/27/2021 (lmb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fireman's Fund Insurance Company v. Airgroup Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fireman's Fund Insurance Company as Subrogee of Damron Production Services Corp.
Represented By: Heather L Marx
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fireman's Fund Insurance Company
Represented By: Heather L Marx
Represented By: Jonathan M Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Airgroup Corporation a/k/a Radiant Global Logistics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Airgroup Corporation
Represented By: Kenderick Mason Jordan
Represented By: Mark G Pryor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Radiant Global Logistics, Inc.
Represented By: Kenderick Mason Jordan
Represented By: Mark G Pryor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Land Air Express, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel R Savaloja
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?