Prisk v. Travelers Indemnity Company of America
Plaintiff: James Prisk
Defendant: Travelers Indemnity Company of America
Case Number: 0:2021cv01723
Filed: July 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2021 Filing 12 STATEMENT OF CASE as to Travelers Indemnity Company of America. (Thornsjo, Dale)
September 9, 2021 Filing 11 STATEMENT OF CASE as to James Prisk. (Montpetit, Jeffrey)
September 9, 2021 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by James Prisk. Jointly Signed by The Travelers Indemnity Company of America.(Montpetit, Jeffrey)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER WHILE DISTRICT OF MINNESOTA IS UNDER GENERAL ORDER RELATED TO COVID-19: See Notice and Order for document submission deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 8/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(JLB)
August 10, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey M Montpetit on behalf of James Prisk. (Montpetit, Jeffrey)
August 10, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey M Montpetit on behalf of James Prisk. (Montpetit, Jeffrey)
August 5, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Travelers Indemnity Company of America. (Meyer, Lance)
July 29, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Travelers Indemnity Company of America re #1 Notice of Removal, [1-1] Summons and Complaint, [1-2] Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, [1-3] Civil Cover Sheet (Meyer, Lance)
July 29, 2021 Filing 4 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
July 29, 2021 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant Travelers Indemnity Company of America. (Meyer, Lance)
July 29, 2021 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per Civil (5th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 21-cv-1723 (WMW/LIB). (lmb)
July 29, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis County District Court, case number (to be determined) (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8918638) filed by Travelers Indemnity Company of America. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Meyer, Lance)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prisk v. Travelers Indemnity Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Prisk
Represented By: Jeffrey M Montpetit
Represented By: Marcia K Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Indemnity Company of America
Represented By: Dale O. Thornsjo
Represented By: Lance D Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?