A. J. T. v. Osseo Area Schools, Independent School District No. 279
Plaintiff: A. J. T.
Defendant: Osseo Area Schools, Independent School District No. 279 and Osseo School Board
Case Number: 0:2021cv01760
Filed: August 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: John F Docherty
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2021 Filing 10 (Text-Only) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 10/1/2021. Scheduling order to issue. (TJS)
September 24, 2021 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Osseo Area Schools, Independent School District No. 279, Osseo School Board. Jointly Signed by A.J.T. a minor child, by and through her parents, A.T. and G.T,.(Booth, Laura)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER/NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Parties are directed to Meet and Confer by 9/24/2021. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/24/2021. Confidential letters to Court due by 9/24/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 10/1/2021 at 11:00 AM by Telephone Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 9/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 26(f) Template, #2 Consent Form)(TJS)
September 1, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Tubbs Booth on behalf of Osseo Area Schools, Independent School District No. 279, Osseo School Board. (Booth, Laura)
August 31, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Osseo Area Schools, Independent School District No. 279. (Booth, Laura)
August 16, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by A. J. T.. Osseo Area Schools, Independent School District No. 279 served on 8/10/2021, answer due 8/31/2021; Osseo School Board served on 8/10/2021, answer due 8/31/2021. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service Board Chair)(Goetz, Amy)
August 3, 2021 Filing 4 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these practice pointers, in addition to the District of Minnesota's Local Rules and Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (TJS)
August 3, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Osseo Area Schools, Independent School District No. 279, Osseo School Board. (MKB)
August 3, 2021 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per Civil (3rd, 4th - Civil Rights: Housing/Accommodations, ADA Other) list, referred to Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty. Please use case number 21-cv-1760 (ECT/JFD). (MKB)
August 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Osseo Area Schools, Independent School District No. 279 (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8928077) filed by A. J. T.. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Goetz, Amy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A. J. T. v. Osseo Area Schools, Independent School District No. 279
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. J. T.
Represented By: Amy J Goetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Osseo Area Schools, Independent School District No. 279
Represented By: Elizabeth M Meske
Represented By: Laura Tubbs Booth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Osseo School Board
Represented By: Elizabeth M Meske
Represented By: Laura Tubbs Booth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?