Quay v. Monarch Healthcare Management LLC.
Plaintiff: April Quay
Defendant: Monarch Healthcare Management LLC and Monarch Healthcare Management LLC.
Case Number: 0:2021cv01796
Filed: August 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Tony N Leung
Referring Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF AND ORDER FOR PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 10/22/2021 at 11:00 AM, by Telephone Conference, before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 8/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (HAM)
August 25, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Cory Genelin on behalf of Monarch Healthcare Management LLC.. (Genelin, Cory)
August 25, 2021 Filing 10 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint filed by Monarch Healthcare Management LLC.. (Genelin, Cory)
August 17, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by April Quay. Monarch Healthcare Management LLC. served on 8/11/2021, answer due 9/1/2021. (Fisher, Michele)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Austin Winters Anderson for April Quay; granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney William Clifton Alexander for April Quay. Approved by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 8/16/2021. (NAH)
August 11, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney William Clifton "Clif" Alexander. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8945890 filed by April Quay. (Fisher, Michele)
August 11, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Austin W. Anderson. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8945718 filed by April Quay. (Fisher, Michele)
August 11, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING CONSENTS TO JOIN as to Tammi Carlin, Kelsey Jo Cash, Miranda Finnegan, Lrraine Hargenrader, Kayla Kolb, Jamie Schiell, Joy M. Shearrow, by April Quay. (Attachments: #1 Consents (7))(Fisher, Michele) Modified text on 8/11/2021 (lmb).
August 6, 2021 Filing 4 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Clif Alexander, Austin W. Anderson as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (MTP)
August 6, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Monarch Healthcare Management LLC. (MTP)
August 6, 2021 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per Civil (3rd/4th Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 21-cv-01796 JRT/TNL. (MTP)
August 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Monarch Healthcare Management LLC (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8936117) filed by April Quay. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A Consent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Fisher, Michele)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quay v. Monarch Healthcare Management LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April Quay
Represented By: Michele R Fisher
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monarch Healthcare Management LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monarch Healthcare Management LLC.
Represented By: Cory Genelin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?