Petkoff et al v. Nationwide Life and Annuity Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Richard T Petkoff, Jared Leagjed, Richard T. Petkoff and Jared Leagjeld
Defendant: Nationwide Life and Annuity Insurance Company
Case Number: 0:2021cv01843
Filed: August 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Donovan W Frank
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 10/12/2021.(TMA)
October 7, 2021 Filing 16 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #15 Stipulation,. (Baga, Cb)
October 7, 2021 Filing 15 STIPULATION re #14 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Nationwide Life and Annuity Insurance Company. Jointly Signed by Richard T. Petkoff, Jared Leagjeld, and Trustees on Behalf of the Edlund Children's Trust Agreement. (Baga, Cb)
October 7, 2021 Filing 14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Nationwide Life and Annuity Insurance Company. Jointly Signed by Richard T. Petkoff, Jared Leagjeld, and Trustees on Behalf of the Edlund Children's Trust Agreement.(Baga, Cb)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER/NOTICE: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/7/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 10/14/2021 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 9/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(TMA)
September 15, 2021 Filing 12 Nation Wide Life and Annuity Insurance Company's ANSWER to Complaint (First Amended Complaint) filed by Nationwide Life and Annuity Insurance Company. (Hedlund, Jeffrey)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney John Michael Bloor for Nationwide Life and Annuity Insurance Company; granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Nicole C. Wixted for Nationwide Life and Annuity Insurance Company. Approved by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 8/24/2021. (NAH)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER on #8 Stipulation. Nationwide Life and Annuity Insurance Company response due 9/15/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 8/20/2021.(TMA)
August 19, 2021 Filing 9 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #8 Stipulation. (Baga, Cb)
August 19, 2021 Filing 8 STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to First Amended Complaint by Nationwide Life and Annuity Insurance Company. Jointly Signed by Richard T. Petkoff, et al.. (Baga, Cb)
August 18, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Nicole C. Wixted. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8959272 filed by Nationwide Life and Annuity Insurance Company. (Baga, Cb)
August 18, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John M. Bloor. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8959230 filed by Nationwide Life and Annuity Insurance Company. (Baga, Cb)
August 17, 2021 Filing 5 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Nicole C. Wixted, John Bloor as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (CLK)
August 17, 2021 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 21-cv-1843 DWF/ECW. (CLK)
August 16, 2021 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant Nationwide Life and Annuity Insurance Company. (Hedlund, Jeffrey)
August 16, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Washington County, case number 82-cv-21-3019 (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8954321) filed by Nationwide Life and Annuity Insurance Company. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit(s) A, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hedlund, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Petkoff et al v. Nationwide Life and Annuity Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard T Petkoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jared Leagjed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard T. Petkoff
Represented By: Craig W Baumann
Represented By: Donald R. McNeil, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jared Leagjeld
Represented By: Craig W Baumann
Represented By: Donald R. McNeil, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Life and Annuity Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeffrey D Hedlund
Represented By: Cb Baga
Represented By: John Michael Bloor
Represented By: Nicole C. Wixted
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?