Caballero v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Gloria Caballero
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 0:2021cv01858
Filed: August 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: John F Docherty
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 0405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to USA by Gloria Caballero. (MMP)
September 9, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to USA by Gloria Caballero. Kilolo Kijakazi served on 9/9/2021, answer due 11/8/2021. (MMP) Document QC'd on 9/29/2021 (MTP).
August 20, 2021 Filing 8 (Text-Only) Notice to Parties: The clerk's office has prepared and sent the service packets to the U.S. Marshal Service for service of process per #6 Order. Plaintiff does not need to file a Summons Returned Executed. (lmb)
August 20, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Kilolo Kijakazi. (lmb)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs and Ordering Service. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 8/19/2021. (TJS)
August 18, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES: Social Security Case Assignment Form Issued. Per #Local Rule 7.2, this form must be submitted to the clerk in paper on or before the answer due date. Please mail the completed form to:U.S. District Court for the District of MinnesotaClerks Office300 South Fourth Street, Suite 202Minneapolis, MN 55415 (MMG)
August 18, 2021 Filing 4 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty per Social Security List. Please use case number 21-cv-1858 JFD. (MMG)
August 18, 2021 Filing 3 EXHIBIT A re #1 Complaint filed by Gloria Caballero. (Olson, Edward) Modified text on 8/18/2021 (kt).
August 18, 2021 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Gloria Caballero. (Olson, Edward)
August 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi filed by Gloria Caballero. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Olson, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caballero v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Caballero
Represented By: Edward C. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?