Craft v. Birkholz
Petitioner: Charles Craft
Respondent: Warden B. Birkholz
Case Number: 0:2021cv01917
Filed: August 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Michael J Davis
Referring Judge: John F Docherty
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2021 Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that Petitioner's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus #1 be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 10/20/2021.(JLD)
August 26, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Ann M Bildtsen on behalf of B. Birkholz. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bildtsen, Ann)
August 25, 2021 Filing 2 LETTER from Clerk's Office to re: Filing Fee, enclosing (AO 239) Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs cc: Charles Craft (JGK)
August 24, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Charles Craft. Case assigned to Judge Michael J. Davis per 5th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope) (JGK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Craft v. Birkholz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Charles Craft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden B. Birkholz
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Ann M Bildtsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?