Hicks v. Smith et al
Plaintiff: Hicks
Defendant: Daniel Isaac Smith and Endurance Broadcasting
Case Number: 0:2021cv01957
Filed: August 31, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David T Schultz
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2021 (Text-Only) Mail Returned as Undeliverable #9 . Mail sent to Hicks at 14032 Kennington Park Drive, Suite 207 Brown, Raleigh, NC 27614, but was returned marked "undeliverable as addressed." Mail not re-sent to Hicks as address is unknown. (CLK) DOCUMENT QC'd by KT on 10/28/21. (kt)
September 22, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Endurance Broadcasting, Daniel Isaac Smith. cc: Hicks w/ Information Sheet #2. (CLK) Modified text on 9/22/2021 (CLK).
September 17, 2021 Filing 8 RECEIPT number 44641111917 in the amount of $402.00 issued to L. Hicks. (CLK)
September 16, 2021 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Endurance Broadcasting, Daniel Isaac Smith. filed by Hicks. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Cover Letter, #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Envelope) (CLK)
September 7, 2021 Filing 6 LETTER from Clerk's Office to Hicks returning summons. (kt)
September 1, 2021 Filing 5 LETTER from Clerk's Office to re: Filing Fee, enclosing (AO 239) Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs cc: Hicks (JGK)
August 31, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hicks re #1 Complaint, #3 MOTION AGENCY STAY (JGK)
August 31, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION FOR AGENCY STAY filed by Hicks. (JGK)
August 31, 2021 Filing 2 LETTER TO CLERK'S OFFICE from L. Hicks. (JGK)
August 31, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Endurance Broadcasting, Daniel Isaac Smith filed by Hicks. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Part 1 of 2, #2 Exhibit(s) Part 2 of 2, #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Envelope) (JGK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hicks v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Isaac Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endurance Broadcasting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?