Larson v. Birkholz
Petitioner: Robert C. Larson
Respondent: Warden B. Birkholz
Case Number: 0:2021cv01990
Filed: September 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2021 Filing 8 REPLY re #5 Response. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Envelope)(MKB)
September 27, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by B. Birkholz re #6 Declaration, #5 Response (Rau, Kristen)
September 27, 2021 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Kyia Winger re #5 Response by B. Birkholz . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Rau, Kristen)
September 27, 2021 Filing 5 RESPONSE re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by B. Birkholz.(Rau, Kristen)
September 16, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen Elise Rau on behalf of B. Birkholz. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rau, Kristen)
September 8, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (LNP)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 9/8/2021.(LNP)
September 7, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (filing fee $5, receipt number 4-111784) filed by Robert C. Larson. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per 5th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope) (JGK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Larson v. Birkholz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert C. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden B. Birkholz
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Kristen Elise Rau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?