Elliott v. JBM Patrol and Protection
Plaintiff: Lee Elliott
Defendant: JBM Patrol and Protection
Case Number: 0:2021cv02001
Filed: September 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Paul A Magnuson
Referring Judge: David T Schultz
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER/NOTICE FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Parties are directed to Meet and Confer by 12/14/2021. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/14/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 12/21/2021 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 10/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (TJB)
October 20, 2021 Filing 16 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #13 Motion to Dismiss/General. (Johanningmeier, Joshua)
October 20, 2021 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support re #13 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by JBM Patrol and Protection.(Johanningmeier, Joshua)
October 20, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #13 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Amended Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 1/4/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7D (STP) before Judge Paul A. Magnuson. (Johanningmeier, Joshua)
October 20, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by JBM Patrol and Protection. (Johanningmeier, Joshua)
October 8, 2021 Filing 12 **TEXT ONLY** In light of the Amended Complaint filed in this matter, the Motion Hearing #6 #7 scheduled in this matter for Wednesday, November 10, 2021, at 1:00 p.m., is CANCELLED. Please contact chambers for a new hearing date at your convenience. (LLM)
October 7, 2021 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against JBM Patrol and Protection. filed by Lee Elliott. No summons requested. (Miller, Bryce)
September 16, 2021 Filing 10 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #6 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by JBM Patrol and Protection.(Johanningmeier, Joshua)
September 16, 2021 Filing 9 Declaration of Peighton Myrie in Support of #6 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by JBM Patrol and Protection. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - April 15, 2020 Email)(Johanningmeier, Joshua)
September 16, 2021 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by JBM Patrol and Protection.(Johanningmeier, Joshua)
September 16, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #6 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 11/10/2021 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 7D (STP) before Judge Paul A. Magnuson. (Johanningmeier, Joshua)
September 16, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by JBM Patrol and Protection. (Johanningmeier, Joshua)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER in re Dispositive Motion Practice in cases assigned to The Hon. Paul A. Magnuson. (LLM)
September 9, 2021 Filing 4 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Paul A. Magnuson per 3rd 4th Civil Rights list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 21-cv-2001 (PAM/DTS). (MMP)
September 9, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by JBM Patrol and Protection re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement (Johanningmeier, Joshua)
September 9, 2021 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant JBM Patrol and Protection. (Johanningmeier, Joshua)
September 9, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9011167) filed by JBM Patrol and Protection. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Johanningmeier, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elliott v. JBM Patrol and Protection
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Elliott
Represented By: Bryce M Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JBM Patrol and Protection
Represented By: Joshua L Johanningmeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?