Michels Pipeline, Inc. v. United Association Of Journeymen And Apprentices Of The Plumbing And Pipe Fitting Industry Of The United States And Canada, AFL-CIO et al
Plaintiff: Michels Pipeline, Inc.
Defendant: United Association Of Journeymen And Apprentices Of The Plumbing And Pipe Fitting Industry Of The United States And Canada, AFL-CIO and Pipe Line Contractors Association
Case Number: 0:2021cv02006
Filed: September 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Nancy E Brasel
2 Judge: Tony N Leung
3 Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER on #28 Stipulation. The time for Plaintiff Michels Pipeline, Inc. to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Counterclaim of Defendant Pipe Line Contractors Association and the Counterclaim of Defendant United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipe Fitting Industry of the United States and Canada, AFL-CIO is extended to November 12, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 10/29/2021. (HAM)
October 27, 2021 Filing 29 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #28 Stipulation,. (Cummins, Brendan)
October 27, 2021 Filing 28 STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR PLAINTIFF TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COUNTERCLAIMS by United Association Of Journeymen And Apprentices Of The Plumbing And Pipe Fitting Industry Of The United States And Canada, AFL-CIO. Jointly Signed by Michels Pipeline, Inc. and Pipe Line Contractors Association. (Cummins, Brendan)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE OF AND ORDER FOR PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 12/10/2021 at 10:00 AM, by Telephone Conference, before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 10/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (HAM)
October 15, 2021 Filing 26 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM To Enforce Arbitration Award against Michels Pipeline, Inc.. filed by Pipe Line Contractors Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D) (Easley, Brian)
October 14, 2021 Filing 25 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM TO ENFORCE ARBITRATION AWARD against Michels Pipeline, Inc.. filed by United Association Of Journeymen And Apprentices Of The Plumbing And Pipe Fitting Industry Of The United States And Canada, AFL-CIO. (Cummins, Brendan)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #23 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Ellen O. Boardman for United Association Of Journeymen And Apprentices Of The Plumbing And Pipe Fitting Industry Of The United States And Canada, AFL-CIO. Approved by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 10/5/2021. (NAH)
September 30, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ellen O. Boardman. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9052906 filed by United Association Of Journeymen And Apprentices Of The Plumbing And Pipe Fitting Industry Of The United States And Canada, AFL-CIO. (Cummins, Brendan)
September 29, 2021 Filing 22 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Ellen O. Boardman as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (CLK)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER on #18 Stipulation. Pipe Line Contractors Association answer due 10/15/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 9/28/2021. (HAM)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER on #16 Stipulation. United Association Of Journeymen And Apprentices Of The Plumbing And Pipe Fitting Industry Of The United States And Canada, AFL-CIO answer due 10/15/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 9/28/2021. (HAM)
September 28, 2021 Filing 19 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #18 Stipulation. (Easley, Brian)
September 28, 2021 Filing 18 STIPULATION to Extend Deadline for Def Pipe Line Contractors Association's Response by Pipe Line Contractors Association. Jointly Signed by Michels Pipeline, Inc. (Easley, Brian)
September 28, 2021 Filing 17 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #16 Stipulation,. (Cummins, Brendan)
September 28, 2021 Filing 16 STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANT UNITED ASSOCIATION TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND by United Association Of Journeymen And Apprentices Of The Plumbing And Pipe Fitting Industry Of The United States And Canada, AFL-CIO. Jointly Signed by Michels Pipeline, Inc.. (Cummins, Brendan)
September 27, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian West Easley on behalf of Pipe Line Contractors Association. (Easley, Brian)
September 27, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily M Peterson on behalf of Pipe Line Contractors Association. (Peterson, Emily)
September 27, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristin Simonet on behalf of Pipe Line Contractors Association. (Simonet, Kristin)
September 27, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Courtney Lynn Burks on behalf of Pipe Line Contractors Association. (Burks, Courtney)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jonathan O Levine for Michels Pipeline, Inc..; granting #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Mike S. Yellin for Michels Pipeline, Inc.. Approved by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 9/23/2021. (JGK)
September 21, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael S. Yellin. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9033026 filed by Michels Pipeline, Inc.. (Lipschultz, Noah)
September 21, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jonathan O. Levine. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9033012 filed by Michels Pipeline, Inc.. (Lipschultz, Noah)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES. This case is reassigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz and Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung for all further proceedings. Judge Nancy E. Brasel, Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 21-cv-2006 PJS/TNL. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz and Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 9/20/2021.(MTP)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Keith Bolek for United Association Of Journeymen And Apprentices Of The Plumbing And Pipe Fitting Industry Of The United States And Canada, AFL-CIO. Approved by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 9/20/2021. (NAH)
September 15, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Keith R. Bolek. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9022154 filed by United Association Of Journeymen And Apprentices Of The Plumbing And Pipe Fitting Industry Of The United States And Canada, AFL-CIO. (Cummins, Brendan)
September 15, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Brendan D Cummins on behalf of United Association Of Journeymen And Apprentices Of The Plumbing And Pipe Fitting Industry Of The United States And Canada, AFL-CIO. (Cummins, Brendan)
September 13, 2021 Filing 4 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (LNP)
September 10, 2021 Filing 3 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Jon Levine, Michael Yellin as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (MTP) Modified text on 9/10/2021 (MTP).
September 10, 2021 Filing 2 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per Civil (3rd/4th Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 21-cv-02006 NEB/HB. (MTP)
September 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award against Pipe Line Contractors Association, United Association Of Journeymen And Apprentices Of The Plumbing And Pipe Fitting Industry Of The United States And Canada, AFL-CIO (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9012282) filed by Michels Pipeline, Inc.. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Lipschultz, Noah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michels Pipeline, Inc. v. United Association Of Journeymen And Apprentices Of The Plumbing And Pipe Fitting Industry Of The United States And Canada, AFL-CIO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michels Pipeline, Inc.
Represented By: Noah G Lipschultz
Represented By: Jonathan O Levine
Represented By: Mike S. Yellin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Association Of Journeymen And Apprentices Of The Plumbing And Pipe Fitting Industry Of The United States And Canada, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Brendan D Cummins
Represented By: Ellen O. Boardman
Represented By: Keith Bolek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pipe Line Contractors Association
Represented By: Brian West Easley
Represented By: Courtney Lynn Burks
Represented By: Emily M Peterson
Represented By: Kristin Simonet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?