United States of America v. $150,000 in U.S. Currency et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $150,000 in U.S. Currency and $190,000 in U.S. Currency
Claimant: Ying Chen, Jing Chen and Fenglan Wu
Case Number: 0:2021cv02040
Filed: September 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2021 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ying Chen re #16 Answer to Complaint (Brandl, Jean)
October 29, 2021 Filing 16 Ying Chen's ANSWER to Complaint filed by Ying Chen. (Brandl, Jean)
October 22, 2021 Filing 15 WARRANT Returned Executed as to $150,000 in U.S. Currency; $190,000 in U.S. Currency. (MKB)
October 22, 2021 Filing 14 VERIFIED CLAIM filed by Fenglan Wu. (Campoli, Lauren) Modified text on 10/22/2021 (MMP).
October 12, 2021 Filing 13 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #6 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Ying Chen.(Brandl, Jean)
October 12, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ying Chen re #11 First MOTION for Joinder and Adoption by Reference of Motion to Dismiss (Brandl, Jean)
October 12, 2021 Filing 11 First MOTION for Joinder and Adoption by Reference of #6 Motion to Dismiss #8 Memorandum filed by Ying Chen. (Brandl, Jean) Modified text on 10/13/2021 (MMP).
October 12, 2021 Filing 10 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #6 MOTION to Dismiss/General Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) filed by $150,000 in U.S. Currency, $190,000 in U.S. Currency.(Campoli, Lauren)
October 12, 2021 Filing 9 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #6 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by $150,000 in U.S. Currency, $190,000 in U.S. Currency.(Campoli, Lauren)
October 12, 2021 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION to Dismiss/General Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) filed by $150,000 in U.S. Currency, $190,000 in U.S. Currency. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Campoli, Lauren)
October 12, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #6 MOTION to Dismiss/General Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) : Motion Hearing set for 1/4/2022 at 09:30 AM in Video Conference (no courtroom) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (Campoli, Lauren)
October 12, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss/General Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) filed by $150,000 in U.S. Currency, $190,000 in U.S. Currency. (Campoli, Lauren)
October 12, 2021 Filing 5 VERIFIED CLAIM CONTESTING SEIZURE by $150,000 in U.S. Currency, $190,000 in U.S. Currency. (Campoli, Lauren) Modified text on 10/13/2021 (MMP).
October 9, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by $190,000 in U.S. Currency re #3 Claim Contesting Seizure (Brandl, Jean)
October 9, 2021 Filing 3 CLAIM Verified Claim Contesting Seizure filed by $190,000 in U.S. Currency. (Brandl, Jean)
September 15, 2021 Filing 2 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 21-cv-2040 (SRN/ECW). (MKB)
September 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture In Rem against $150,000 in U.S. Currency, $190,000 in U.S. Currency filed by United States of America. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Baune, Craig)
September 15, 2021 WARRANT OF ARREST AND NOTICE IN REM issued. (kt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $150,000 in U.S. Currency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Laura M Provinzino
Represented By: Craig R Baune
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $150,000 in U.S. Currency
Represented By: Lauren Campoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $190,000 in U.S. Currency
Represented By: Lauren Campoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Ying Chen
Represented By: Jean M Brandl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Jing Chen
Represented By: Lauren Campoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Fenglan Wu
Represented By: Lauren Campoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?