Kulane v. Great American Assurance Company
Plaintiff: Abdikrim Kulane and Abdikarim Kulane
Defendant: Great American Assurance Company
Case Number: 0:2021cv02052
Filed: September 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: John F Docherty
Referring Judge: Paul A Magnuson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 11, 2021 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Support re #11 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Abdikarim Kulane. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Barber, Matthew)
October 28, 2021 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT of Stuart D. Campbell in OPPOSITION TO #11 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Great American Assurance Company.(Campbell, Stuart)
October 28, 2021 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT of Earlen Ritter in OPPOSITION TO #11 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Great American Assurance Company.(Campbell, Stuart)
October 28, 2021 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #11 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Great American Assurance Company. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Campbell, Stuart)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: Fact Discovery due by 5/6/2022. Expert Discovery due by 6/17/2022. Joinder of Parties due by 12/15/2021. Motions (non-disp) due 7/15/2022. Motions (disp) due by 8/19/2022. Ready for trial due by 10/14/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 10/14/2021.(TJS)
October 12, 2021 Filing 17 (Text-Only) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 10/12/2021. Appearances: Matthew Barber for Plaintiff, Stuart Campbell for Defendant. Scheduling order to issue. (TJS)
October 12, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian A Wood on behalf of All Defendants. (Wood, Brian)
October 7, 2021 Filing 15 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #11 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Abdikarim Kulane, Abdikarim Kulane.(Barber, Matthew)
October 7, 2021 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Matthew J. Barber in SUPPORT OF #11 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Abdikarim Kulane, Abdikarim Kulane. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 6)(Barber, Matthew)
October 7, 2021 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Abdikarim Kulane, Abdikarim Kulane. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Barber, Matthew)
October 7, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #11 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment : Motion Hearing set for 11/30/2021 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 7D (STP) before Judge Paul A. Magnuson. (Barber, Matthew)
October 7, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Abdikarim Kulane, Abdikarim Kulane. (Barber, Matthew)
October 4, 2021 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Great American Assurance Company. Jointly Signed by Abdikarim Kulane.(Wood, Brian) Modified text on 10/5/2021 (CLK).
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER in re Dispositive Motion Practice for cases assigned to The Hon. Paul A. Magnuson. (LLM)
September 20, 2021 Filing 8 REPLY to Counterclaim filed by Abdikarim Kulane. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Barber, Matthew) Modified text on 9/20/2021 (MMP).
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER/NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Parties are directed to Meet and Confer by 10/5/2021. Rule 26 Meeting Report and confidential letters due by 10/5/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 10/12/2021 at 03:00 PM via Telephone Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 9/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 26(f) Template, #2 Consent Form)(TJS)
September 17, 2021 Filing 6 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Paul A. Magnuson per 3rd 4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty. Please use case number 21-cv-2052 (PAM/JFD). (MMP)
September 17, 2021 Filing 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Great American Assurance Company. (Wood, Brian)
September 17, 2021 Filing 4 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Abdikarim Kulane. filed by Great American Assurance Company. (Wood, Brian) Modified text on 9/17/2021 (MMP). Modified text on 9/20/2021 (MMP).
September 17, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Great American Assurance Company filed by Great American Assurance Company. (Wood, Brian)
September 17, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Great American Assurance Company (Wood, Brian) Modified text on 9/20/2021 (CLK).
September 17, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County, case number 27-cv-21-10453 (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9027377) filed by Great American Assurance Company. No summons requested. (Wood, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kulane v. Great American Assurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abdikrim Kulane
Represented By: Cole J Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abdikarim Kulane
Represented By: Cole J Dixon
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great American Assurance Company
Represented By: Brian A Wood
Represented By: Stuart D. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?