Mays v. Kne et al
Plaintiff: Otis Mays
Defendant: Caroylyn Kne, City of Bloomington, The, Bloomington Police Department, John Doe, Jane Doe and Hennepin County Adult Dention Center
Case Number: 0:2021cv02075
Filed: September 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: John F Docherty
Referring Judge: David T Schultz
2 Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2021 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Otis Mays. Hennepin County Adult Dention Center served on 11/12/2021, answer due 12/3/2021. (kt)
November 10, 2021 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Otis Mays. Bloomington Police Department served on 11/8/2021, answer due 11/29/2021; City of Bloomington, The served on 11/10/2021, answer due 12/1/2021; Caroylyn Kne served on 11/5/2021, answer due 11/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Summons Returned Executed as to the City of Bloomington)(kt)
November 8, 2021 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Caroylyn Kne. Caroylyn Kne waiver sent on 10/21/2021, answer due 12/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kelly, Julia)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT-ONLY ORDER: Plaintiff's letter request #15 for early discovery is DENIED. Plaintiff shall fill out for USM forms for defendants who are known at this time. As the case proceeds and the identity of any John or Jane Doe is discovered, Plaintiff may request filing of an amended complaint. Ordered by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 10/26/2021. (TJB)
October 21, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE OF LAWSUIT AND REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service for Defendant Carolyn Kne. Documents have been mailed to all listed defendants: Order Granting IFP, Complaint, two Waiver of Services (AO 399), and one Prepaid Envelope. Waiver of Service due by 11/22/2021. (kt)
October 20, 2021 Filing 15 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE AND MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Otis Mays. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kt) Document QC'd on 11/3/2021 (JME).
October 20, 2021 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Bloomington Police Department, City of Bloomington, The, Hennepin County Adult Dention Center, Caroylyn Kne. (CLK)
October 12, 2021 Filing 12 LETTER from Clerk's Office to Prison Authorities re: Filing Fee Due as to Otis Mays, enclosing #10 Order on Application on Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. cc: Prison Authorities, Sherburne County Jail. (lmb)
October 12, 2021 Filing 11 LETTER from Clerk's Office to Otis Mays re: #10 Order Granting IFP and USM Forms to Complete. cc: Otis Mays. (lmb)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 10/8/2021. (TJB)
October 6, 2021 Filing 9 EXHIBIT re #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Otis Mays filed by Otis Mays. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Sherburne County Jail )(kt) DOCUMENT QC'd by KT on 10/25/21. (kt)
October 6, 2021 Filing 8 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Otis Mays. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kt) DOCUMENT QC'd by KT on 10/25/21. (kt)
October 4, 2021 Filing 7 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE AND MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Otis Mays. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Envelope)(kt) Document QC'd on 11/4/2021 (MTP).
September 29, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address by Otis Mays. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kt) Document QCd on 11/9/2021 (MMG).
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 9/28/2021. (TJB)
September 21, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 21-cv-2075 WMW/DTS. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 9/21/2021.(kt)
September 20, 2021 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Otis Mays. (JGK)
September 20, 2021 Filing 1 42 USC 1983 COMPLAINT against Bloomington Police Department, City of Bloomington, The, Jane Doe, John Doe, Hennepin County Adult Dention Center, Caroylyn Kne filed by Otis Mays. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 3rd/4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope) (JGK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mays v. Kne et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Otis Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caroylyn Kne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Bloomington, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bloomington Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hennepin County Adult Dention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?