Mays et al v. Sherburne County Jail
Plaintiff: Otis Mays, Sienemah Gaye, M. Montgomery, Marlon M. Winborn, Tyice Phillips, Justin Lindsey and Clifton Walker
Defendant: Sherburne County Jail
Case Number: 0:2021cv02078
Filed: September 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2021 (Text-Only) Mail Returned as Undeliverable as addressed unable to forward re: #14 . Mail sent to Marlon M. Winborn at Sherburne County Jail, 13880 Business Center Drive, Elk River, MN 55330 address was returned. Mail not re-sent to Mr. Winborn as addressed is unknown. Per BOP inmate locator website Mr. Winborn is in a reentry program. (MMP) Document QC'd on 11/11/2021 (MTP).
September 30, 2021 Filing 14 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Marlon M. Winborn. (MMP) Document QCd on 11/8/2021 (MMG).
September 30, 2021 Filing 13 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Clifton Walker. (MMP) Document QCd on 11/8/2021 (MMG).
September 30, 2021 Filing 12 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Justin Lindsey. (MMP) Document QCd on 11/8/2021 (MMG).
September 30, 2021 Filing 11 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Otis Mays. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MMP) Document QCd on 11/8/2021 (MMG).
September 29, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Change of Address by Otis Mays. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kt) Document QCd on 11/9/2021 (MMG).
September 21, 2021 Filing 9 LETTER from Clerk's Office to Clifton Walker re: Filing Fee, enclosing (AO 239) Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs cc: Walker. (NAH)
September 21, 2021 Filing 8 LETTER from Clerk's Office to Justin Lindsey re: Filing Fee, enclosing (AO 239) Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs cc: Lindsey. (NAH)
September 21, 2021 Filing 7 LETTER from Clerk's Office to Tyice Phillips re: Filing Fee, enclosing (AO 239) Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs cc: Phillips. (NAH)
September 21, 2021 Filing 6 LETTER from Clerk's Office to Marlon M. Winborn re: Filing Fee, enclosing (AO 239) Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs cc: Winborn. (NAH)
September 21, 2021 Filing 5 LETTER from Clerk's Office to M. Montgomery re: Filing Fee, enclosing (AO 239) Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs cc: Montgomery. (NAH)
September 21, 2021 Filing 4 LETTER from Clerk's Office to Sienemah Gaye re: Filing Fee, enclosing (AO 239) Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs cc: Gaye. (NAH)
September 21, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
September 21, 2021 Filing 2 LETTER from Clerk's Office to Otis Mays re: Filing Fee, enclosing (AO 239) Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs cc: Mays (NAH)
September 20, 2021 Filing 1 42 USC 1983 COMPLAINT against Sherburne County Jail filed by Justin Lindsey, M. Montgomery, Clifton Walker, Sienemah Gaye, Otis Mays, Marlon M. Winborn, Tyice Phillips. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 3rd/4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (NAH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mays et al v. Sherburne County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Otis Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sienemah Gaye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlon M. Winborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyice Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Lindsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifton Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherburne County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?