Hogquist v. Mercy Hospital et al
Petitioner: Michelle Hogquist
Respondent: Mercy Hospital, Anoka County Police Departments, Anoka County Sheriff's Office, Anoka County District Courts & Offices and Anoka County Public Defenders Office
Case Number: 0:2021cv02080
Filed: September 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Tony N Leung
Referring Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for #7 Report and Recommendation. The petition for a writ of habeas corpus of petitioner Michelle Hogquist [Doc. No. 1] is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. This matter is DISMISSED. No certificate of appealability shall issue. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 10/29/2021. (SMD)
October 18, 2021 (Text-Only) Mail Returned as Undeliverable #7 . Mail sent to Michelle Hogquist at P.O. Box 565, Bemidji, MN 56619 returned as undeliverable. No forwarding address available mail not resent. (MKB)Document QC'd on 10/28/2021 (JME).
October 12, 2021 Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Michelle Hogquist. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 10/12/2021. (EB)
October 5, 2021 (Text-Only) Mail Returned as Undeliverable #5 . Mail sent to Michelle Hogquist at P.O. Box 563, Bemidji, MN 56619 address was returned to sender. Did not re-send #5 as Michelle Hogquist's address is unknown. (MMP) Document QC'd on 11/5/2021 (MTP).
September 24, 2021 Filing 6 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Anoka County District Courts & Offices, Anoka County Police Departments, Anoka County Public Defenders Office, Anoka County Sheriff's Office, Mercy Hospital Attorney Substitution. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter Attorney Substitution)(Stockmeyer, Edwin)
September 21, 2021 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Nebraska; Case Number 8:21-cv-00302. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case assigned to District Judge Susan Richard Nelson and referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung per Sixth Division Prisoner List.
September 21, 2021 Case transferred to District of USDC - Minnesota. Original electronic file sent. (LKO) [Transferred from Nebraska on 9/21/2021.]
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (filing #2 ) is granted. This case is transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota. This case is terminated in this district. The Clerk of Court is directed to take all necessary steps to transfer this matter to the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LKO) [Transferred from Nebraska on 9/21/2021.]
August 11, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO) [Transferred from Nebraska on 9/21/2021.]
August 6, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf of Plaintiff Michelle Hogquist. (LKO) [Transferred from Nebraska on 9/21/2021.]
August 6, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed on behalf of pro se plaintiff Michelle Hogquist. (LKO) [Transferred from Nebraska on 9/21/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hogquist v. Mercy Hospital et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michelle Hogquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mercy Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Frank
Represented By: Edwin William Stockmeyer, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Anoka County Police Departments
Represented By: Matthew Frank
Represented By: Edwin William Stockmeyer, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Anoka County Sheriff's Office
Represented By: Matthew Frank
Represented By: Edwin William Stockmeyer, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Anoka County District Courts & Offices
Represented By: Matthew Frank
Represented By: Edwin William Stockmeyer, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Anoka County Public Defenders Office
Represented By: Matthew Frank
Represented By: Edwin William Stockmeyer, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?