BITRO Group Inc. v. ASP Holdings, Inc.
Plaintiff: BITRO Group Inc.
Defendant: ASP Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2021cv02106
Filed: September 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason M Zucchi on behalf of ASP Holdings, Inc.. (Zucchi, Jason)
September 24, 2021 Filing 22 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Michael Sarney, Jeremy Saks, Kyle Fleming as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (kt) cc: Michael Sarney, Jeremy Thomas Saks, Kyle J Fleming.
September 24, 2021 Filing 21 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:21-cv-06144. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz and referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer per 3rd/4th Patent List.
September 17, 2021 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of District of Minnesota. (ate) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/24/2021.]
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that this case is transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this matter and transfer the case to the District of Minnesota. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 9/17/2021) (ate) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/24/2021.]
September 16, 2021 Filing 19 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Jeremy T. Saks dated September 16, 2021 re: Corrected Pre-motion Reply Letter Requesting Leave to File a Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by ASP Holdings, Inc...(Saks, Jeremy) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/24/2021.]
September 16, 2021 Filing 18 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Jeremy T. Saks dated September 16, 2021 re: Pre-motion Reply Letter Requesting Leave to File a Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by ASP Holdings, Inc...(Saks, Jeremy) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/24/2021.]
September 16, 2021 Filing 17 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Michael F. Sarney dated September 16, 2021 re: Initial Pre-Trial Conference. Document filed by BITRO Group Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Patent Case Management Plan).(Sarney, Michael) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/24/2021.]
September 14, 2021 Filing 16 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Michael F. Sarney dated September 14, 2021 re: Response to Defendant's Letter Regarding Venue. Document filed by BITRO Group Inc...(Sarney, Michael) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/24/2021.]
September 7, 2021 Filing 15 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #14 Letter filed by ASP Holdings, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: By September 14, 2021, Plaintiff shall file a responsive letter on the venue issue, not to exceed three pages. Defendant shall file any reply letter by September 16, 2021, not to exceed two pages. The Court likely will construe the letters as a motion to dismiss or transfer for improper venue and rule orally at the September 23, 2021, conference. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 9/7/2021) (cf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/24/2021.]
September 3, 2021 Filing 14 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Jeremy T. Saks dated September 3, 2021 re: Pre-motion Letter Requesting Leave to File a Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by ASP Holdings, Inc...(Saks, Jeremy) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/24/2021.]
August 24, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #13 MOTION for Jason M. Zucchi to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24966753. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/24/2021.]
August 23, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Jason M. Zucchi to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24966753. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by ASP Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Zucchi, Jason) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/24/2021.]
August 23, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #12 MOTION for Kyle J. Fleming to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24963676. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/24/2021.]
August 20, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Kyle J. Fleming to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24963676. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by ASP Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kyle J. Fleming ISO Motion PHV, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Fleming, Kyle) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/24/2021.]
August 19, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeremy Thomas Saks on behalf of ASP Holdings, Inc...(Saks, Jeremy) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/24/2021.]
August 18, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Order served on ASP Holdings, Inc. on August 16, 2021. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by BITRO Group Inc...(Sarney, Michael) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/24/2021.]
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Initial Conference set for 9/23/2021 at 10:40 AM in Courtroom 1106, Thurgood Marshal Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 8/12/2021) (vfr) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/24/2021.]
July 21, 2021 Filing 8 AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)..(jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/24/2021.]
July 21, 2021 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to ASP Holdings, Inc...(jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/24/2021.]
July 20, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ASP Holdings, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by BITRO Group Inc...(Sarney, Michael) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/24/2021.]
July 20, 2021 Filing 5 AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Sarney, Michael) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/24/2021.]
July 20, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/24/2021.]
July 20, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/24/2021.]
July 20, 2021 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/24/2021.]
July 20, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PATENT FORM. Notice to Attorney Michael F Sarney to RE-FILE re: Document No. #4 AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the Plaintiff field on the AO 120 Patent/Trademark form was not completed by the attorney; the Defendant field on the AO 120 Patent/Trademark form was not completed by the attorney;.. Re-file the document using the event type AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct AO 120 Patent/Trademark PDF form. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/24/2021.]
July 19, 2021 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Sarney, Michael) Modified on 7/20/2021 (pc). [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/24/2021.]
July 19, 2021 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by BITRO Group Inc...(Sarney, Michael) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/24/2021.]
July 19, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Sarney, Michael) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/24/2021.]
July 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ASP Holdings, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24809985)Document filed by BITRO Group Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B).(Sarney, Michael) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/24/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BITRO Group Inc. v. ASP Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BITRO Group Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASP Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Jason Zucchi
Represented By: Jason M Zucchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?